Minnesota District Court
Judge:Eric C Tostrud
Referred: John F Docherty
Case #: 0:23-cv-03124
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Oct 09, 2023
Terminated:Jan 24, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 06, 2024 4:24 AM CDT
Defendant
Pacific Personnel Services
Represented By
Jacqueline E. Kalk
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Defendant
Red Tail Acquisitions, LLC
Represented By
Jacqueline E. Kalk
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Plaintiff
Dario Perkins-Gardner
Represented By
A. L. Brown
Capitol City Law Group, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, January 24, 2025
21 21 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 01/24 5:24 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 1/24/2025.(RMM)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Proposed Order to Judge re Stipulation Fri 01/24 9:50 AM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re19 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Kalk, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 01/24 8:56 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Pacific Personnel Services, Red Tail Acquisitions, LLC. Jointly Signed by Dario Perkins. (Kalk, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
18 18 misc Status Report Mon 12/02 1:46 PM
STATUS REPORT JOINT by Pacific Personnel Services, Red Tail Acquisitions, LLC. (Kalk, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
17 17 misc Status Report Mon 09/23 2:23 PM
STATUS REPORT (Fifth) by Pacific Personnel Services, Red Tail Acquisitions, LLC. (Kalk, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
16 16 misc Status Report Mon 07/29 10:27 AM
STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Pacific Personnel Services, Red Tail Acquisitions, LLC. (Kalk, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
15 15 misc Status Report Tue 05/28 4:50 PM
STATUS REPORT (JOINTLY SIGNED) by Pacific Personnel Services, Red Tail Acquisitions, LLC. (Kalk, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
14 14 misc Status Report Tue 03/26 1:15 PM
STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Pacific Personnel Services, Red Tail Acquisitions, LLC. (Kalk, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
13 13 misc Status Report Tue 01/30 7:45 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint by Pacific Personnel Services, Red Tail Acquisitions, LLC. (Kalk, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
12 12 1 pgs order Order Staying Case Mon 11/27 11:31 AM
ORDER STAYING CASE. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 11/22/2023.(TJS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
11 11 misc Proposed Order to Judge re Stipulation Tue 11/21 4:22 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re10 Stipulation. (Kalk, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Stipulation Tue 11/21 4:21 PM
STIPULATION to Stay Action in Lieu of Arbitration by Pacific Personnel Services, Red Tail Acquisitions, LLC. (Kalk, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 16, 2023
9 9 order Scheduling Order Thu 11/16 9:48 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 1/31/2024. Joinder of Parties due by 1/31/2024. Fact Discovery due by 6/30/2024. Expert Discovery due by 5/31/2024. Motions (non-disp) due 6/30/2024. Motions (disp) due by 8/30/2024. Ready for trial due by 12/30/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 11/16/2023.(TJS)
Related: [-]
8 8 minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Thu 11/16 9:41 AM
(Text-Only) MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 11/16/2023: Rule 16 Pretrial Conference. No Digital Recording Time: 9:00-9:12 AM Total Time: 12 minutes APPEARANCES: For Plaintiff(s): A.L. Brown For Defendant(s): Jacqueline Kalk PROCEEDINGS: Pretrial Scheduling Order to be issued. (TJS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
7 7 misc Rule 26(f) Report Wed 11/15 6:03 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Pacific Personnel Services, Red Tail Acquisitions, LLC.(Kalk, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
6 6 order Order for Party to File Document/Respond to Court Mon 11/13 3:56 PM
(Text-Only) ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT. A Rule 16 conference is scheduled for this Thursday, and the Court intends to move forward with it. The parties shall have their 26(f) Report filed by Wednesday, 11/15/23. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 11/13/2023.(TJS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
5 5 order Order/Notice of Hearing/Deadlines (Setting/Resetting) Wed 10/18 9:10 AM
ORDER/NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/9/2023. Pretrial Conference set for 11/16/2023 at 09:00 AM via Audio-only Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 10/18/2023.(TJS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 26(f) Template,
Att: 2 Consent Form
Monday, October 16, 2023
4 4 discov Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement Mon 10/16 3:10 PM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or subsidiary reported for Pacific Personnel Services, Red Tail Acquisitions, LLC. (Kalk, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 10/16 3:03 PM
Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses filed by Pacific Personnel Services, Red Tail Acquisitions, LLC. (Kalk, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
2 2 notice Notice of Initial Case Assignment Thu 10/12 4:57 PM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty. Please use case number 23-cv-3124 ECT/JFD. Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (MMG)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 09, 2023
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Mon 10/09 4:25 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County District Court (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-10586038) filed by Red Tail Acquisitions, LLC, Pacific Personnel Services. No summons requested. (Kalk, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons and Complaint,
Att: 2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Certificate of Service