Shift Technologies, Inc.
California Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Hannah L Blumenstiel |
Case #: | 3:23-bk-30687 |
Case Filed: | Oct 09, 2023 |
Creditor Meeting: | Nov 07, 2023 |
Claims Deadline: | Feb 05, 2024 |
Debtor
Shift Technologies, Inc., Debtor
290 Division St
San Francisco, CA 94103-4882 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Not Assigned - SF
|
|
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee / SF
Phillip J. Burton Federal Building 450 Golden Gate Ave. 5th Fl., #05-0153
San Francisco, CA 94102 |
1. | Shift Technologies Shares Plunge 86% After Company Declares Bankruptcy (marketwatch.com) |
Submitted Tue 10/10/2023 | |
Docket last updated: 9 minutes ago |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
592 | 592
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 04/26 2:56 PM
Certificate of Service re: Motion of Debtors to Approve Settlement Agreement Between Debtors and Ally Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019 [Docket No. 582], Declaration of Ayman Moussa in Support of Motion of Debtors to Approve Settlement Agreement Between Debtors and Ally Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019 [Docket No. 583], Notice and Opportunity for Hearing on Motion of Debtors to Approve Settlement Agreement Between Debtors and Ally Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019 [Docket No. 584], Motion of Debtors to Approve Settlement Agreement Between Debtors and Tesla Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019 [Docket No. 585], Declaration of Ayman Moussa in Support of Motion of Debtors to Approve Settlement Agreement Between Debtors and Tesla Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019 [Docket No. 586], Notice and Opportunity for Hearing on Motion of Debtors to Approve Settlement Agreement Between Debtors and Tesla Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019 [Docket No. 587], Motion of Debtors to Approve Settlement Agreement Between Debtors and Cox Entities Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019 [Docket No. 588], Declaration of Ayman Moussa in Support of Motion of Debtors to Approve Settlement Agreement with Cox Entities Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019 [Docket No. 589], and Notice and Opportunity for Hearing on the Motion of Debtors to Approve Settlement Agreement Between Debtors and Cox Entities Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019 [Docket No. 590] Filed by Other Prof. Omni Agent Solutions . (Lowry, Randy) |
|
591 | 591
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 04/26 2:54 PM
Certificate of Service re: Status Conference Statement [Docket No. 581] Filed by Other Prof. Omni Agent Solutions . (Lowry, Randy) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
590 | 590
notice
Opportunity for Hearing
Thu 04/25 4:06 PM
Notice and Opportunity for Hearing on Motion of Debtors to Approve Settlement Agreement Between Debtors and Cox Entities Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019 . Filed by Debtor Shift Technologies, Inc. (Rupp, Thomas) |
|
589 | 589
misc
Declaration
Thu 04/25 4:03 PM
Declaration of Ayman Moussa in Support of Motion of Debtors to Approve Settlement Agreement Between Debtors and Cox Entities Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019 . Filed by Debtor Shift Technologies, Inc. (Rupp, Thomas) |
|
588 | 588
motion
Compromise Controversy
Thu 04/25 4:01 PM
Application to Compromise Controversy with Cox Entities Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019 Filed by Debtor Shift Technologies, Inc. (Rupp, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Agreement | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Master Agreement | ||
587 | 587
notice
Opportunity for Hearing
Thu 04/25 3:57 PM
Notice and Opportunity for Hearing on Motion of Debtors to Approve Settlement Agreement Between Debtors and Tesla Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019 . Filed by Debtor Shift Technologies, Inc. (Rupp, Thomas) |
|
586 | 586
misc
Declaration
Thu 04/25 3:53 PM
Declaration of Ayman Moussa in Support of Motion of Debtors to Approve Settlement Agreement Between Debtors and Tesla Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019 . Filed by Debtor Shift Technologies, Inc. (Rupp, Thomas) |
|
585 | 585
motion
Compromise Controversy
Thu 04/25 3:52 PM
Application to Compromise Controversy with Tesla Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019 Filed by Debtor Shift Technologies, Inc. (Rupp, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Agreement | ||
584 | 584
notice
Opportunity for Hearing
Thu 04/25 3:49 PM
Notice and Opportunity for Hearing on Motion of Debtors to Approve Settlement Agreement Between Debtors and Ally Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019 . Filed by Debtor Shift Technologies, Inc. (Rupp, Thomas) |
|
583 | 583
misc
Declaration
Thu 04/25 3:45 PM
Declaration of Ayman Moussa in Support of Motion of Debtors to Approve Settlement Agreement Between Debtors and Ally Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019 . Filed by Debtor Shift Technologies, Inc. (Rupp, Thomas) |
|
582 | 582
motion
Compromise Controversy
Thu 04/25 3:43 PM
Application to Compromise Controversy with Ally Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019 Filed by Debtor Shift Technologies, Inc. (Rupp, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Agreement | ||
581 | 581
misc
Status Conference Statement
Thu 04/25 11:37 AM
Status Conference Statement . Filed by Debtor Shift Technologies, Inc. (Keller, Tobias) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
580 | 580
misc
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report
Fri 04/19 6:54 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 23-30704 for the Month Ending: 03/31/2024 Filed by Debtor Shift Technologies, Inc. (Rupp, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Notes | ||
579 | 579
misc
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report
Fri 04/19 6:52 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 23-30703 for the Month Ending: 03/31/2024 Filed by Debtor Shift Technologies, Inc. (Rupp, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Notes | ||
578 | 578
misc
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report
Fri 04/19 6:51 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 23-30702 for the Month Ending: 03/31/2024 Filed by Debtor Shift Technologies, Inc. (Rupp, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Notes | ||
577 | 577
misc
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report
Fri 04/19 6:49 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 23-30701 for the Month Ending: 03/31/2024 Filed by Debtor Shift Technologies, Inc. (Rupp, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Notes | ||
576 | 576
misc
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report
Fri 04/19 6:48 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 23-30700 for the Month Ending: 03/31/2024 Filed by Debtor Shift Technologies, Inc. (Rupp, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Notes | ||
575 | 575
misc
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report
Fri 04/19 6:46 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 23-30699 for the Month Ending: 03/31/2024 Filed by Debtor Shift Technologies, Inc. (Rupp, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Notes | ||
574 | 574
misc
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report
Fri 04/19 6:45 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 23-30698 for the Month Ending: 03/31/2024 Filed by Debtor Shift Technologies, Inc. (Rupp, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Notes | ||
573 | 573
misc
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report
Fri 04/19 6:44 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 23-30697 for the Month Ending: 03/31/2024 Filed by Debtor Shift Technologies, Inc. (Rupp, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Notes | ||
572 | 572
misc
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report
Fri 04/19 6:42 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 23-30695 for the Month Ending: 03/31/2024 Filed by Debtor Shift Technologies, Inc. (Rupp, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Notes | ||
571 | 571
misc
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report
Fri 04/19 6:40 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 23-30694 for the Month Ending: 03/31/2024 Filed by Debtor Shift Technologies, Inc. (Rupp, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Notes | ||
570 | 570
misc
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report
Fri 04/19 6:38 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 23-30693 for the Month Ending: 03/31/2024 Filed by Debtor Shift Technologies, Inc. (Rupp, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Notes | ||
569 | 569
misc
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report
Fri 04/19 6:37 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 23-30692 for the Month Ending: 03/31/2024 Filed by Debtor Shift Technologies, Inc. (Rupp, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Notes | ||
568 | 568
misc
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report
Fri 04/19 6:35 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 23-30691 for the Month Ending: 03/31/2024 Filed by Debtor Shift Technologies, Inc. (Rupp, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Notes | ||
567 | 567
misc
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report
Fri 04/19 6:34 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 23-30690 for the Month Ending: 03/31/2024 Filed by Debtor Shift Technologies, Inc. (Rupp, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Notes | ||
566 | 566
misc
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report
Fri 04/19 6:33 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 23-30689 for the Month Ending: 03/31/2024 Filed by Debtor Shift Technologies, Inc. (Rupp, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Notes | ||
565 | 565
misc
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report
Fri 04/19 6:31 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 23-30688 for the Month Ending: 03/31/2024 Filed by Debtor Shift Technologies, Inc. (Rupp, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Notes | ||
564 | 564
misc
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report
Fri 04/19 6:30 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 03/31/2024 Filed by Debtor Shift Technologies, Inc. (Rupp, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Notes | ||
Att: 2 Additional Statements | ||
Att: 3 Bank Statements |