Colorado District Court
Judge:Gordon P Gallagher
Referred: Michael E Hegarty
Case #: 1:23-cv-02624
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Oct 09, 2023
Terminated:Oct 11, 2023
Case in other court:District Court, Jefferson County, Colorado, 2023CV31306
Last checked: Saturday Apr 06, 2024 3:16 AM MDT
Defendant
Marlys Nash
Represented By
Emily Fontelle Keimig
Venable LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Transamerica Financial Advisors, Inc.


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
16 16 misc Certificate of Mailing/Service Tue 10/17 4:48 PM
CERTIFICATE of Mailing/Service re14 Order on Motion to Remand. (schap, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
15 15 order Judgment ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Wed 10/11 4:17 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT remanding case back to Jefferson County District Court, Jefferson County, Colorado and parties to bear their own costs. Civil Case Terminated. Entered by the Clerk on 10/11/2023. (dclem)
Related: [-]
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Remand Wed 10/11 4:13 PM
ORDER granting13 Motion to Remand case back to Jefferson County District Court, Jefferson County, Colorado. by District Judge Gordon P Gallagher on 10/11/2023.(dclem)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Remand Wed 10/11 3:24 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Remand by Defendant Marlys Nash.(Keimig, Emily)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only)
12 12 order Order Wed 10/11 11:14 AM
ORDER RE JOINT STATUS REPORT. It is ordered that - no later than October 18, 2023 - the parties jointly update the Court on the following issues: (1) the status of the expedited discovery ordered by Judge Vriesman; (2) the parties' positions on Plaintiff's request for a preliminary injunction (including when the parties may want a hearing on this issue and how much time the parties anticipate needing to present their arguments and evidence); (3) the parties' positions on a new or extended temporary restraining order; and (4) any other matters the parties believe the Court should be aware of. By District Judge Gordon P Gallagher on 10/11/2023. Text Only Entry (schap, )
Related: [-]
11 11 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Wed 10/11 10:03 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other specifically-referred motions, and (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By District Judge Gordon P Gallagher on 10/11/2023. Text Only Entry (schap, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
10 10 misc Magistrate Judge Consent Form Tue 10/10 5:00 PM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (tgall, )
Related: [-]
9 9 2 pgs misc Order - State Court Tue 10/10 4:59 PM
STATE COURT ORDER re Order for Expedited Discovery by Todd L. Vriesman,District Court Judge, Jefferson County, on 10/05/2023. (tgall, )
Related: [-]
8 8 3 pgs misc Order - State Court Tue 10/10 4:57 PM
STATE COURT ORDER re Temporary RestrainingOrder Issued by Todd L. Vriesman, District Court Judge, Jefferson County, on 10/05/2023. (tgall, )
Related: [-]
7 7 cmp Complaint Tue 10/10 4:46 PM
COMPLAINT For Injunctive Relief against Marlys Nash, filed by Transamerica Financial Advisors, Inc..(tgall, )
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Case Assigned to Judge Tue 10/10 4:44 PM
Case assigned to District Judge Gordon P Gallagher and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (tgall, )
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Notice to Attorney(s) in Removed, Transferred or Other Cases Tue 10/10 4:41 PM
FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry). (tgall, )
Related: [-]
Monday, October 09, 2023
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Mon 10/09 10:01 PM
NOTICE re1 Notice of Removal, State Court Register of Actions by Defendant Marlys Nash(Keimig, Emily)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Civil Case Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Exhibit Summons,
Att: 4 Exhibit Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Plaintiff's Motion for TRO,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Plaintiff's Motion for TRO,
Att: 7 Exhibit Declaration of Loiseau,
Att: 8 Exhibit Declaration of Schaad,
Att: 9 Exhibit Proposed Order re: Plaintiff's Motion for TRO,
Att: 10 Exhibit Plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Discovery,
Att: 11 Exhibit Proposed Order re: Plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Discovery,
Att: 12 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Discovery,
Att: 13 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Discovery,
Att: 14 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Discovery,
Att: 15 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Discovery,
Att: 16 Exhibit Exhibit 5 to Plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Discovery,
Att: 17 Exhibit Exhibit 6 to Plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Discovery,
Att: 18 Exhibit Minute Order,
Att: 19 Exhibit Hyne's Pro Hac Vice Motion,
Att: 20 Exhibit Declaration of Hynes,
Att: 21 Exhibit Proposed Order re: Hyne's Pro Hac Vice Motion,
Att: 22 Exhibit Valdez's Pro Hac Vice Motion,
Att: 23 Exhibit Declaration of Valdez,
Att: 24 Exhibit Proposed Order re: Valdez's Motion for Proc Hac Vice,
Att: 25 Exhibit Entries of Appearance for Defendants,
Att: 26 Exhibit Minute Order,
Att: 27 Exhibit Temporary Restraining Order,
Att: 28 Exhibit Order for Expedited Discovery,
Att: 29 Exhibit Declaration of Messick,
Att: 30 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Messick,
Att: 31 Exhibit Notice of Related Cases,
Att: 32 Exhibit Notice of Posting Cash Bond,
Att: 33 Exhibit Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Suppress,
Att: 34 Exhibit Proposed Order re: Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Suppress,
Att: 35 Exhibit Order Granting Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Suppress
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 10/09 6:05 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Keimig, Emily)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice (Other) Mon 10/09 5:40 PM
NOTICE re1 Notice of Removal, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET by Defendant Marlys Nash (Keimig, Emily)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Mon 10/09 5:31 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Marlys Nash from District Court, Jefferson County, Colorado, Case Number 2023CV31306. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number ACODC-9334060), filed by Marlys Nash.(Keimig, Emily)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4