Louisiana Eastern District Court
Judge:Jay C Zainey
Referred: Karen Wells Roby
Case #: 2:23-cv-05922
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:0216(b) Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Oct 10, 2023
Terminated:Feb 06, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Apr 07, 2024 4:28 PM CDT
Defendant
Grass Gator Lawn Care Company, LLC
Represented By
Brandon Anthony Naquin
Stanley, Reuter, Thornton, Alford, L.L.C.
contact info
Kathryn Munson
Stanley, Reuter, Ross, Thornton & Alford, Llc (new Orleans)
contact info
Plaintiff
Phillip J. Roberson, Jr.
Represented By
Kenneth Warren DeJean
Kenneth W. Dejean, Attorney At Law
contact info
Adam Russell Credeur
Law Offices Of Kenneth W. Dejean
contact info
Natalie M. DeJean
Law Offices Of Kenneth W. Dejean
contact info


Docket last updated: 37 minutes ago
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
6 6 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 02/06 3:24 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Phillip J. Roberson, Jr (DeJean, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
5 5 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 01/11 10:33 AM
ORDER granting4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer1 Complaint, as to Grass Gator Lawn Care Company, LLC answer due 1/30/2024. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 1/10/2024. (mmm)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
4 4 motion Extension of Time to Answer Fri 01/05 3:43 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint, by Grass Gator Lawn Care Company, LLC.Attorney Brandon Anthony Naquin added to party Grass Gator Lawn Care Company, LLC(pty:dft).(Naquin, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, October 12, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 10/12 2:54 PM
Summons Issued as to Grass Gator Lawn Care Company, LLC. (jls)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
2 2 misc Initial Case Assignment Tue 10/10 11:31 AM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (kls)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 10/10 10:53 AM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against Grass Gator Lawn Care Company, LLC (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-10205572) filed by Phillip John Roberson, Jr.Attorney Kenneth Warren DeJean added to party Phillip John Roberson, Jr(pty:pla).(DeJean, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Summons