Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Wendy Beetlestone
Case #: 2:23-cv-03918
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity - Misappropriation of Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Oct 10, 2023
Terminated:Jan 18, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Apr 07, 2024 5:03 PM EDT
Defendant
PROSPECT MEDICAL HOLDINGS, INC.
Plaintiff
FLOWER ORTHOPEDICS CORPORATION
Represented By
LESLEY M. GROSSBERG
Ice Miller LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, January 18, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 01/18 2:20 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by FLOWER ORTHOPEDICS CORPORATION (GROSSBERG, LESLEY)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 01/17 2:56 PM
NOTICE OF ZOOM VIDEO PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 1/30/2024 02:00 PM BEFORE HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE. THE PARTIES SHALL CONFER AS TO WHO WILL SCHEDULE AND CIRCULATE ZOOM INFORMATION TO CHAMBERS AT chambers_of_judge_beetlestone@paed.uscourts.gov NO LATER THAN FIVE DAYS PRIOR TO CONFERENCE.(amw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 ELECTRONIC DISCOVERY ORDER,
Att: 2 JOINT REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 10/18 9:24 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by FLOWER ORTHOPEDICS CORPORATION re: D.L.S., Inc. served Summons and Complaint upon PROSPECT MEDICAL HOLDINGS, INC. by Personal. PROSPECT MEDICAL HOLDINGS, INC. served on 10/13/2023, answer due 11/3/2023. (GROSSBERG, LESLEY)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 10/12 3:06 PM
Summons Issued as to PROSPECT MEDICAL HOLDINGS, INC.. (amas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
2 2 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Tue 10/10 1:07 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Conventus Orthopaedics, Inc. by FLOWER ORTHOPEDICS CORPORATION.(GROSSBERG, LESLEY)
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney) Tue 10/10 12:49 PM
COMPLAINT against PROSPECT MEDICAL HOLDINGS, INC. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16998492.), filed by FLOWER ORTHOPEDICS CORPORATION.(GROSSBERG, LESLEY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Designation Form,
Att: 3 Exhibit A,
Att: 4 Exhibit B