Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:23-bk-40150

New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Jil Mazer-Marino
Case #: 1:23-ap-01088
Nature of Suit67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
41 Bankruptcy - Objection / revocation of discharge - §727(c),(d),(e)
Case Filed:Oct 09, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
David Rusi
177 Benedict Rd.
Staten Island, NY 10304
Represented By
David Rusi
contact info
Plaintiff
Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund
3180 Fairview Park Drive, Suite 400
Falls Church, VA 22042
Represented By
Heather Mooneyham
Sheet Metal Workers National Pension Fund (smwnpf)
contact info
Plaintiff
International Training Institute For The Sheet Metal And Air Conditioning Industry
3180 Fairview Park Drive, Suite 400
Falls Church, VA 22042
Represented By
Heather Mooneyham
Sheet Metal Workers National Pension Fund (smwnpf)
contact info
Plaintiff
Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust
3180 Fairview Park Drive, Suite 400
Falls Church, VA 22042
Represented By
Heather Mooneyham
Sheet Metal Workers National Pension Fund (smwnpf)
contact info
Plaintiff
National Energy Management Institute Committee
3180 Fairview Park Drive, Suite 400
Falls Church, VA 22042
Represented By
Heather Mooneyham
Sheet Metal Workers National Pension Fund (smwnpf)
contact info
Plaintiff
National Stabilization Agreement of the Sheet Metal Industry Trust Fund
3180 Fairview Park Drive, Suite 400
Falls Church, VA 22042
Represented By
Heather Mooneyham
Sheet Metal Workers National Pension Fund (smwnpf)
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
41 41 answer Response Tue 04/08 12:07 PM
Response TO DEFENDANTS OBJECTION TO ADMISSIBILITY OF EXHIBIT BF TO PLAINTIFFS SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION Filed by J. Logan Rappaport on behalf of Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust, Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund Related [+] (Rappaport, J.)
Related: [-] 40 Objection filed by Defendant David Rusi
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
40 40 answer Objection Wed 04/02 4:02 PM
Objection to Plaintiffs' Exhibit BF Filed by John J Macron on behalf of David Rusi Related [+] (Macron, John)
Related: [-] 21 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff National Stabilization Agreement of the Sheet Metal Industry Trust Fund, Plaintiff National Energy Management Institute Committee, Plaintiff Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust, Plaintiff International Training Institute For The Sheet Metal And Air Conditioning Industry, Plaintiff Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund
Saturday, March 29, 2025
39 39 misc Letter Sat 03/29 4:10 PM
Letter to extend dates regarding submissions as to Exhibit BF by 5 days Filed by John J Macron on behalf of David Rusi Related [+] (Macron, John)
Related: [-] 21 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff National Stabilization Agreement of the Sheet Metal Industry Trust Fund, Plaintiff National Energy Management Institute Committee, Plaintiff Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust, Plaintiff International Training Institute For The Sheet Metal And Air Conditioning Industry, Plaintiff Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Document BK & AP) Fri 04/25 2:47 PM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Hearing scheduled for 06/17/2025 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 3529 (Judge Mazer-Marino), Brooklyn, NY Related [+] - response by March 28, 2025, support/reply by April 4, 2025. (tml)
Related: [-] 21 Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by Plaintiff National Energy Management Institute Committee, Plaintiff International Training Institute For The Sheet Metal And Air Conditioning Industry, Plaintiff National Stabilization Agreement of the Sheet Metal Industry Trust Fund, Plaintiff Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund, Plaintiff Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Withdrawn/Denied/Marked Off Without Hearing - Text (Document BK & AP) Fri 04/25 2:51 PM
Marked Off Without Hearing - Related [+]
Related: [-] 20 Consent Order Extending Dispositive Motion Deadline. (RE: related document(s)19 Order to Extend Time, Stipulation and Order) - Motion filed (tml
Thursday, March 06, 2025
38 38 answer Memorandum of Law in Support Thu 03/06 3:33 PM
Memorandum of Law in Support PLAINTIFFS REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION SEEKING SUMMARY JUDGMEN Filed by Heather Mooneyham, J. Logan Rappaport on behalf of Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund Related [+] (Rappaport, J.)
Related: [-] 31 Affirmation in Opposition filed by Defendant David Rusi,32 Memorandum of Law in Opposition filed by Defendant David Rusi,33 Response filed by Defendant David Rusi
37 37 answer Reply Thu 03/06 3:24 PM
Reply DECLARATION IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Filed by Heather Mooneyham, J. Logan Rappaport on behalf of Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund Related [+] (Rappaport, J.)
Related: [-] 31 Affirmation in Opposition filed by Defendant David Rusi,32 Memorandum of Law in Opposition filed by Defendant David Rusi,33 Response filed by Defendant David Rusi
Att: 1 Exhibit BF - Summary of the Diversions from Fahrenheit Mechanicals bank accounts and Plaintiffs trust funds
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
36 36 misc Declaration Wed 03/05 1:52 PM
Declaration Filed by J. Logan Rappaport on behalf of Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund Related [+] (Rappaport, J.)
Related: [-] 21 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff National Stabilization Agreement of the Sheet Metal Industry Trust Fund, Plaintiff National Energy Management Institute Committee, Plaintiff Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust, Plaintiff International Training Institute For The Sheet Metal And Air Conditioning Industry, Plaintiff Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund
35 35 misc Letter Wed 03/05 10:23 AM
Letter Explaining Second Amended Declaration Filed by Heather Mooneyham on behalf of International Training Institute For The Sheet Metal And Air Conditioning Industry, National Energy Management Institute Committee, National Stabilization Agreement of the Sheet Metal Industry Trust Fund, Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust, Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund Related [+] (Mooneyham, Heather)
Related: [-] 22 Amended Notice of Motion/Presentment filed by Plaintiff Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund
Att: 1 Affidavit Second Amended Declaration
Monday, March 03, 2025
34 34 order Extend Time Mon 03/03 12:09 PM
Order Extending Pleading Submission Dates. Defendant's opposition to the motion is extended on consent to February 12, 2025. Plaintiffs time to file a Reply is extended on consent to March 6, 2025. The pre-trial conference, presently scheduled for March 11, 2025 at 2:30 pm, will proceed as scheduled. Related [+]. (nop)
Related: [-] 20 Stipulation and Order
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
33 33 answer Response Wed 02/12 7:35 PM
Response and counterstatement to statement of undisputed facts. Filed by John J Macron on behalf of David Rusi (Macron, John). Related document(s)30 Statement of Undisputed Facts filed by Plaintiff National Stabilization Agreement of the Sheet Metal Industry Trust Fund, Plaintiff National Energy Management Institute Committee, Plaintiff Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust, Plaintiff International Training Institute For The Sheet Metal And Air Conditioning Industry, Plaintiff Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund. Modified on 2/13/2025- to add linkage to docket no. 30 (dng)
Related: [-]
32 32 answer Memorandum of Law in Opposition Wed 02/12 7:32 PM
Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment. Filed by John J Macron on behalf of David Rusi (Macron, John)
Related: [-]
31 31 answer Affirmation in Opposition Wed 02/12 7:30 PM
Affirmation in Opposition Filed by John J Macron on behalf of David Rusi Related [+] (Macron, John)
Related: [-] 21 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff National Stabilization Agreement of the Sheet Metal Industry Trust Fund, Plaintiff National Energy Management Institute Committee, Plaintiff Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust, Plaintiff International Training Institute For The Sheet Metal And Air Conditioning Industry, Plaintiff Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
30 30 misc Statement of Undisputed Facts Wed 01/29 11:43 AM
Statement of Undisputed Facts , Amended Filed by Heather Mooneyham on behalf of International Training Institute For The Sheet Metal And Air Conditioning Industry, National Energy Management Institute Committee, National Stabilization Agreement of the Sheet Metal Industry Trust Fund, Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust, Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund (Mooneyham, Heather)
Related: [-]
29 29 misc Statement of Undisputed Facts Wed 01/29 10:31 AM
Statement of Undisputed Facts Filed by Heather Mooneyham on behalf of International Training Institute For The Sheet Metal And Air Conditioning Industry, National Energy Management Institute Committee, National Stabilization Agreement of the Sheet Metal Industry Trust Fund, Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust, Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund (Mooneyham, Heather)
Related: [-]
28 28 misc Exhibit Wed 01/29 10:27 AM
Request to Produce AC Filed by Heather Mooneyham on behalf of International Training Institute For The Sheet Metal And Air Conditioning Industry, National Energy Management Institute Committee, National Stabilization Agreement of the Sheet Metal Industry Trust Fund, Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust, Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund Related [+] (Mooneyham, Heather)Modified on 1/29/2025- to add description of document (dng)
Related: [-] 21 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff National Stabilization Agreement of the Sheet Metal Industry Trust Fund, Plaintiff National Energy Management Institute Committee, Plaintiff Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust, Plaintiff International Training Institute For The Sheet Metal And Air Conditioning Industry, Plaintiff Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund,22 Amended Notice of Motion/Presentment filed by Plaintiff Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund,23 Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Plaintiff Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund,24 Exhibit filed by Plaintiff National Stabilization Agreement of the Sheet Metal Industry Trust Fund, Plaintiff National Energy Management Institute Committee, Plaintiff Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust, Plaintiff International Training Institute For The Sheet Metal And Air Conditioning Industry, Plaintiff Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund,25 Exhibit filed by Plaintiff National Stabilization Agreement of the Sheet Metal Industry Trust Fund, Plaintiff National Energy Management Institute Committee, Plaintiff Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust, Plaintiff International Training Institute For The Sheet Metal And Air Conditioning Industry, Plaintiff Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund,26 Exhibit filed by Plaintiff National Stabilization Agreement of the Sheet Metal Industry Trust Fund, Plaintiff National Energy Management Institute Committee, Plaintiff Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust, Plaintiff International Training Institute For The Sheet Metal And Air Conditioning Industry, Plaintiff Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund
Monday, January 27, 2025
27 27 misc Affidavit/Certificate of Service Mon 01/27 1:40 PM
Affidavit/Certificate of Service Filed by J. Logan Rappaport on behalf of Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund Related [+] (Rappaport, J.)
Related: [-] 21 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff National Stabilization Agreement of the Sheet Metal Industry Trust Fund, Plaintiff National Energy Management Institute Committee, Plaintiff Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust, Plaintiff International Training Institute For The Sheet Metal And Air Conditioning Industry, Plaintiff Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund,22 Amended Notice of Motion/Presentment filed by Plaintiff Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund,23 Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Plaintiff Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund,24 Exhibit filed by Plaintiff National Stabilization Agreement of the Sheet Metal Industry Trust Fund, Plaintiff National Energy Management Institute Committee, Plaintiff Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust, Plaintiff International Training Institute For The Sheet Metal And Air Conditioning Industry, Plaintiff Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund,26 Exhibit filed by Plaintiff National Stabilization Agreement of the Sheet Metal Industry Trust Fund, Plaintiff National Energy Management Institute Committee, Plaintiff Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust, Plaintiff International Training Institute For The Sheet Metal And Air Conditioning Industry, Plaintiff Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund
Thursday, January 23, 2025
26 26 misc Exhibit Thu 01/23 2:51 PM
Exhibit Filed by Heather Mooneyham on behalf of International Training Institute For The Sheet Metal And Air Conditioning Industry, National Energy Management Institute Committee, National Stabilization Agreement of the Sheet Metal Industry Trust Fund, Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust, Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund Related [+] (Mooneyham, Heather)
Related: [-] 21 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff National Stabilization Agreement of the Sheet Metal Industry Trust Fund, Plaintiff National Energy Management Institute Committee, Plaintiff Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust, Plaintiff International Training Institute For The Sheet Metal And Air Conditioning Industry, Plaintiff Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund,22 Amended Notice of Motion/Presentment filed by Plaintiff Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund,23 Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Plaintiff Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund,24 Exhibit filed by Plaintiff National Stabilization Agreement of the Sheet Metal Industry Trust Fund, Plaintiff National Energy Management Institute Committee, Plaintiff Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust, Plaintiff International Training Institute For The Sheet Metal And Air Conditioning Industry, Plaintiff Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund,25 Exhibit filed by Plaintiff National Stabilization Agreement of the Sheet Metal Industry Trust Fund, Plaintiff National Energy Management Institute Committee, Plaintiff Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust, Plaintiff International Training Institute For The Sheet Metal And Air Conditioning Industry, Plaintiff Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund
Att: 1 Exhibit AN, Part 5
Att: 2 Exhibit AO
Att: 3 Exhibit AP
Att: 4 Exhibit AQ, Part 1
Att: 5 Exhibit AQ, Part 2
Att: 6 Exhibit AR through AW
Att: 7 Exhibit AX-BE
25 25 misc Exhibit Thu 01/23 2:47 PM
Exhibit Filed by Heather Mooneyham on behalf of International Training Institute For The Sheet Metal And Air Conditioning Industry, National Energy Management Institute Committee, National Stabilization Agreement of the Sheet Metal Industry Trust Fund, Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust, Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund Related [+] (Mooneyham, Heather)
Related: [-] 21 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff National Stabilization Agreement of the Sheet Metal Industry Trust Fund, Plaintiff National Energy Management Institute Committee, Plaintiff Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust, Plaintiff International Training Institute For The Sheet Metal And Air Conditioning Industry, Plaintiff Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund,22 Amended Notice of Motion/Presentment filed by Plaintiff Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund,23 Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Plaintiff Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund,24 Exhibit filed by Plaintiff National Stabilization Agreement of the Sheet Metal Industry Trust Fund, Plaintiff National Energy Management Institute Committee, Plaintiff Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust, Plaintiff International Training Institute For The Sheet Metal And Air Conditioning Industry, Plaintiff Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund
Att: 1 Exhibit Y
Att: 2 Exhibit Z
Att: 3 Exhibit AA
Att: 4 Exhibit AB
Att: 5 Exhibit AD
Att: 6 Exhibit AE
Att: 7 Exhibit AF
Att: 8 Exhibit AG
Att: 9 Exhibit AH
Att: 10 Exhibit AI
Att: 11 Exhibit AJ
Att: 12 Exhibit AK
Att: 13 Exhibit AL
Att: 14 Exhibit AM
Att: 15 Exhibit AN, Part 1
Att: 16 Exhibit AN, Part 2
Att: 17 Exhibit AN, Part 3
Att: 18 Exhibit AN, Part 4
24 24 misc Exhibit Thu 01/23 2:36 PM
Exhibit Filed by Heather Mooneyham on behalf of International Training Institute For The Sheet Metal And Air Conditioning Industry, National Energy Management Institute Committee, National Stabilization Agreement of the Sheet Metal Industry Trust Fund, Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust, Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund Related [+] (Mooneyham, Heather)
Related: [-] 21 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff National Stabilization Agreement of the Sheet Metal Industry Trust Fund, Plaintiff National Energy Management Institute Committee, Plaintiff Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust, Plaintiff International Training Institute For The Sheet Metal And Air Conditioning Industry, Plaintiff Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund
Att: 1 Exhibit E
Att: 2 Exhibit N, Part 1
Att: 3 Exhibit N, Part 2
Att: 4 Exhibit O
Att: 5 Exhibit P
Att: 6 Exhibit Q
Att: 7 Exhibit R
Att: 8 Exhibit S
Att: 9 Exhibit T, Part 1
Att: 10 Exhibit T, Part 2
Att: 11 Exhibit T, Part 3
Att: 12 Exhibit T, Part 4
Att: 13 Exhibit U
Att: 14 Exhibit V
Att: 15 Exhibit W
Att: 16 Exhibit X
23 23 answer Memorandum of Law in Support Thu 01/23 12:33 PM
Memorandum of Law in Support Filed by Heather Mooneyham, J. Logan Rappaport on behalf of Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund Related [+] (Rappaport, J.)
Related: [-] 21 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff National Stabilization Agreement of the Sheet Metal Industry Trust Fund, Plaintiff National Energy Management Institute Committee, Plaintiff Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust, Plaintiff International Training Institute For The Sheet Metal And Air Conditioning Industry, Plaintiff Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund,22 Amended Notice of Motion/Presentment filed by Plaintiff Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund
22 22 notice Amended Notice of Motion/Presentment (use to correct date, time or location of a presentment / heari Thu 01/23 12:28 PM
Amended Notice of Motion/Presentment for Summary Judgment . Objections to be filed on February 10, 2025. Filed by Heather Mooneyham, J. Logan Rappaport on behalf of Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 3/11/2025 at 02:30 PM at Courtroom 3529 (Judge Mazer-Marino), Brooklyn, NY. (Rappaport, J.)
Related: [-] 21 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff National Stabilization Agreement of the Sheet Metal Industry Trust Fund, Plaintiff National Energy Management Institute Committee, Plaintiff Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust, Plaintiff International Training Institute For The Sheet Metal And Air Conditioning Industry, Plaintiff Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund
Att: 1 Affidavit AMENDED Affidavit Declaration of Heather Mooneyham
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
21 21 motion Summary Judgment Tue 01/21 11:24 PM
Motion For Summary Judgment . Objections to be filed on 2/10/25. Filed by Heather Mooneyham on behalf of International Training Institute For The Sheet Metal And Air Conditioning Industry, National Energy Management Institute Committee, National Stabilization Agreement of the Sheet Metal Industry Trust Fund, Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust, Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund. Hearing scheduled for 3/11/2025 at 02:30 PM at Courtroom 3529 Judge Mazer-Marino. (Mooneyham, Heather)Modified on 1/22/2025- to add courtroom location (dng)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Heather Mooneyham
Att: 2 Supplement Statement of Undisputed Material Facts
Att: 3 Exhibit A
Att: 4 Exhibit B
Att: 5 Exhibit C
Att: 6 Exhibit D
Att: 7 Exhibit F
Att: 8 Exhibit G
Att: 9 Exhibit H
Att: 10 Exhibit I
Att: 11 Exhibit J
Att: 12 Exhibit K
Att: 13 Exhibit L
Att: 14 Exhibit M
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
20 20 order Schedule Hearing (Generic) Wed 01/15 3:05 PM
Consent Order Extending Dispositive Motion Deadline. The dispositive motion deadline is hereby extended from January 13, 2025, up to and including January 21, 2025, without prejudice to the right of the Fund to seek a further extension or extensions of such time. The pre-trial conference hearing scheduled on February 5, 2025, at 2:00pm shall be adjourned to March 11, 2025, at 2:30pm. So Ordered. Related [+]. Signed on 1/15/2025 (dng)
Related: [-] 19 Order to Extend Time, Stipulation and Order
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned AP) Wed 11/20 1:10 PM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Appearances: J. Logan Rappaport Representing Plaintiff, John J Macron Representing Defendant, Heather Mooneyham Representing Defendant - Pre-Trial Conference set for 02/05/2025 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 3529 (Judge Mazer-Marino), Brooklyn, NY Related [+]
Related: [-] 2 Complaint by Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund, International Training Institute For The Sheet Metal And Air Conditioning Industry, Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust, National Energy Management Institute Committee, National Stabilization Agreement of the Sheet Metal Industry Trust Fund against David Rusi - Nature(s) of Suit: (41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e), (67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny) (tml
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held (Document BK & AP) Wed 11/20 1:11 PM
Hearing Held; Appearances: J. Logan Rappaport Representing Plaintiff, John J Macron Representing Defendant, Heather Mooneyham Representing Defendant - Related [+]
Related: [-] 11 Amended Motion to Compel and Extend Discovery Deadline Filed by Heather Mooneyham on behalf of International Training Institute For The Sheet Metal And Air Conditioning Industry, National Energy Management Institute Committee, National Stabilization Agreement of the Sheet Metal Industry Trust Fund, Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust, Sheet Metal Workers National Pension Fund (RE: related document(s)7 Motion to Compel) - Marked off in open court (tml)
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned AP) Wed 09/25 11:13 PM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Pre-Trial Conference set for 11/20/2024 at 11:30 AM at Courtroom 3529 (Judge Mazer-Marino), Brooklyn, NY Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Complaint by Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund, International Training Institute For The Sheet Metal And Air Conditioning Industry, Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust, National Energy Management Institute Committee, National Stabilization Agreement of the Sheet Metal Industry Trust Fund against David Rusi - Nature(s) of Suit: (41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e), (67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny) (tml
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Document BK & AP) Thu 10/24 4:06 PM
Adjourned Without Hearing - Hearing scheduled for 11/20/2024 at 11:30 AM at Courtroom 3529 (Judge Mazer-Marino), Brooklyn, NY Related [+]
Related: [-] 11 Amended Motion to Compel and Extend Discovery Deadline Filed by Heather Mooneyham on behalf of International Training Institute For The Sheet Metal And Air Conditioning Industry, National Energy Management Institute Committee, National Stabilization Agreement of the Sheet Metal Industry Trust Fund, Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust, Sheet Metal Workers National Pension Fund (RE: related document(s)7 Motion to Compel). (tml
Thursday, September 19, 2024
19 19 order Extend Time Thu 09/19 4:00 PM
Stipulation and Order Extending Various Deadlines. The Discovery Deadline is hereby extended from September 10, 2024, up to and including October 25, 2024. Deadline for filing dispositive motions is hereby extended from November 22, 2024, up to and including January 6, 2025. The hearing scheduled on September 24, 2024 at 11:30 a.m. shall be adjourned to November 12, 2024, at 11:30 a.m. with respect to the status of the Adversary Proceeding. Related [+]. Signed on 9/19/2024 (dng)
Related: [-] 16 Notice of Proposed Stipulation filed by Plaintiff National Stabilization Agreement of the Sheet Metal Industry Trust Fund, Plaintiff National Energy Management Institute Committee, Plaintiff Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust, Plaintiff International Training Institute For The Sheet Metal And Air Conditioning Industry, Plaintiff Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
18 18 misc Letter of Adjournment - (Do not use to adjourn 341 meetings) Tue 09/10 2:13 PM
Letter of Adjournment: Hearing rescheduled from September 24, 2024 at 11:30am to November 12, 2024 at 11:30am Filed by Heather Mooneyham on behalf of International Training Institute For The Sheet Metal And Air Conditioning Industry, National Energy Management Institute Committee, National Stabilization Agreement of the Sheet Metal Industry Trust Fund, Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust, Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund Related [+] (Mooneyham, Heather)
Related: [-] Hearing Held and Adjourned (Document BK & AP)
17 17 misc Letter Tue 09/10 2:08 PM
Letter to Judge and Certificate of Service Filed by Heather Mooneyham on behalf of International Training Institute For The Sheet Metal And Air Conditioning Industry, National Energy Management Institute Committee, National Stabilization Agreement of the Sheet Metal Industry Trust Fund, Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust, Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund Related [+] (Mooneyham, Heather)
Related: [-] 16 Notice of Proposed Stipulation filed by Plaintiff National Stabilization Agreement of the Sheet Metal Industry Trust Fund, Plaintiff National Energy Management Institute Committee, Plaintiff Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust, Plaintiff International Training Institute For The Sheet Metal And Air Conditioning Industry, Plaintiff Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service
16 16 notice Notice of Proposed Stipulation Tue 09/10 2:03 PM
Notice of Proposed Stipulation By and Between Plaintiffs and Defendant to Extension of Various Deadlines Filed by Heather Mooneyham on behalf of International Training Institute For The Sheet Metal And Air Conditioning Industry, National Energy Management Institute Committee, National Stabilization Agreement of the Sheet Metal Industry Trust Fund, Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust, Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund (Mooneyham, Heather)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
15 15 order Generic Order Wed 05/22 11:47 AM
Order Resolving Plaintiff's Motion to Compel and Extending Various Discovery and Motion Deadlines. The Motion is granted in part in accordance with the terms hereof. Defendant shall serve upon Plaintiffs, through their counsel, his responses and objections to the Document Demand and Interrogatories by May 30, 2024. Defendant shall appear for a deposition by Plaintiffs by July 15, 2024 at the office of Plaintiffs counsel located at 156 West 56th Street, Suite 703, New York, New York 10019. Fact discovery deadline in this Adversary Proceeding shall be September 10, 2024 without prejudice. Deadline for filing dispositive motions in this Adversary Proceeding shall be November 22, 2024 without prejudice. A hearing shall be held on September 24, 2024 at 11:30 a.m. with respect to the status of the Adversary Proceeding, including any discovery dispute that may arise and any potential dispositive motions either party may anticipate making. Fee Request is neither granted nor denied and in the event that Defendant fails to abide by this Order or otherwise fails to timely and fully comply with the Document Demand and/or Interrogatories, Plaintiffs shall file a notice with the Court to restore the Motion and Fee Request to the Courts calendar at least fourteen (14) days prior to the Hearing and Defendant shall be entitled to file an opposition to the Fee Request at least seven (7) days prior to the Hearing Related [+]. Signed on 5/22/2024 (dnb)
Related: [-] 11 Motion to Compel
Thursday, May 16, 2024
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned AP) Fri 05/17 1:41 PM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Appearances: J. Logan Rappaport Representing Plaintiff, Heather Mooneyham Representing Plaintiff, John J Macron Representing Defendant - Pre-Trial Conference set for 09/24/2024 at 11:30 AM at Courtroom 3529 (Judge Mazer-Marino), Brooklyn, NY. - Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Complaint by Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund, International Training Institute For The Sheet Metal And Air Conditioning Industry, Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust, National Energy Management Institute Committee, National Stabilization Agreement of the Sheet Metal Industry Trust Fund against David Rusi - Nature(s) of Suit: (41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e), (67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny) - Parties to submit Scheduling Order (tml
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Document BK & AP) Fri 05/17 1:44 PM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Appearances: J. Logan Rappaport Representing Plaintiff, Heather Mooneyham Representing Plaintiff, John J Macron Representing Defendant -Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2024 at 11:30 AM at Courtroom 3529 (Judge Mazer-Marino), Brooklyn, NY Related [+]
Related: [-] 11 Amended Motion to Compel and Extend Discovery Deadline Filed by Heather Mooneyham on behalf of International Training Institute For The Sheet Metal And Air Conditioning Industry, National Energy Management Institute Committee, National Stabilization Agreement of the Sheet Metal Industry Trust Fund, Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust, Sheet Metal Workers National Pension Fund (RE: related document(s)7 Motion to Compel). - Granted in Part Adjourned in reference to attorney cost (tml
Thursday, May 09, 2024
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Document BK & AP) Sat 05/11 10:56 PM
Adjourned Without Hearing - Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2024 at 11:00 AM at Brooklyn Office Related [+]
Related: [-] 11 Amended Motion to Compel and Extend Discovery Deadline Filed by Heather Mooneyham on behalf of International Training Institute For The Sheet Metal And Air Conditioning Industry, National Energy Management Institute Committee, National Stabilization Agreement of the Sheet Metal Industry Trust Fund, Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust, Sheet Metal Workers National Pension Fund (RE: related document(s)7 Motion to Compel filed by Plaintiff National Stabilization Agreement of the Sheet Metal Industry Trust Fund, Plaintiff National Energy Management Institute Committee, Plaintiff Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust, Plaintiff International Training Institute For The Sheet Metal And Air Conditioning Industry, Plaintiff Sheet Metal Workers National Pension Fund). (tml
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
14 14 misc Letter Wed 05/08 9:58 AM
Letter Filed by J. Logan Rappaport on behalf of Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund Related [+] (Rappaport, J.)
Related: [-] 11 Motion to Compel filed by Plaintiff National Stabilization Agreement of the Sheet Metal Industry Trust Fund, Plaintiff National Energy Management Institute Committee, Plaintiff Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust, Plaintiff International Training Institute For The Sheet Metal And Air Conditioning Industry, Plaintiff Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund
Monday, May 06, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 05/06 2:07 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by J. Logan Rappaport on behalf of Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund (Rappaport, J.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
12 12 misc Affidavit/Certificate of Service Tue 04/30 3:14 PM
Affidavit/Certificate of Service of Amended Notice of Motion to Compel Filed by Heather Mooneyham on behalf of International Training Institute For The Sheet Metal And Air Conditioning Industry, National Energy Management Institute Committee, National Stabilization Agreement of the Sheet Metal Industry Trust Fund, Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust, Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund Related [+] (Mooneyham, Heather)
Related: [-] 11 Motion to Compel filed by Plaintiff National Stabilization Agreement of the Sheet Metal Industry Trust Fund, Plaintiff National Energy Management Institute Committee, Plaintiff Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust, Plaintiff International Training Institute For The Sheet Metal And Air Conditioning Industry, Plaintiff Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund
11 11 motion Compel Tue 04/30 2:38 PM
Amended Motion to Compel and Extend Discovery Deadline Filed by Heather Mooneyham on behalf of International Training Institute For The Sheet Metal And Air Conditioning Industry, National Energy Management Institute Committee, National Stabilization Agreement of the Sheet Metal Industry Trust Fund, Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust, Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 5/9/2024 at 11:00 AM at Brooklyn Office.Order to be presented for signature on 5/9/2024. (Mooneyham, Heather)
Related: [-] 7 Motion to Compel filed by Plaintiff National Stabilization Agreement of the Sheet Metal Industry Trust Fund, Plaintiff National Energy Management Institute Committee, Plaintiff Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust, Plaintiff International Training Institute For The Sheet Metal And Air Conditioning Industry, Plaintiff Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund
Att: 1 Affidavit Mooneyham
Att: 2 Supplement Memorandum
Att: 3 Proposed Order
10 10 misc Letter Tue 04/30 9:01 AM
Letter Request Pre-Hearing Conference Filed by Heather Mooneyham on behalf of International Training Institute For The Sheet Metal And Air Conditioning Industry, National Energy Management Institute Committee, National Stabilization Agreement of the Sheet Metal Industry Trust Fund, Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust, Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund (Mooneyham, Heather)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Affidavit/Certificate of Service Tue 04/30 8:59 AM
Affidavit/Certificate of Service Filed by Heather Mooneyham on behalf of International Training Institute For The Sheet Metal And Air Conditioning Industry, National Energy Management Institute Committee, National Stabilization Agreement of the Sheet Metal Industry Trust Fund, Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust, Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund Related [+] (Mooneyham, Heather)
Related: [-] 7 Motion to Compel filed by Plaintiff National Stabilization Agreement of the Sheet Metal Industry Trust Fund, Plaintiff National Energy Management Institute Committee, Plaintiff Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust, Plaintiff International Training Institute For The Sheet Metal And Air Conditioning Industry, Plaintiff Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund
Monday, April 29, 2024
8 8 motion Compel Mon 04/29 12:29 PM
Motion to Compel , Certificate of Service Filed by Heather Mooneyham on behalf of International Training Institute For The Sheet Metal And Air Conditioning Industry, National Energy Management Institute Committee, National Stabilization Agreement of the Sheet Metal Industry Trust Fund, Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust, Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund Related [+]. (Mooneyham, Heather)
Related: [-] 7
Thursday, April 25, 2024
7 7 motion Compel Thu 04/25 9:30 PM
Motion to Compel and Extend Discovery Deadlines . Objections to be filed on 5/2/2024. Filed by Heather Mooneyham on behalf of International Training Institute For The Sheet Metal And Air Conditioning Industry, National Energy Management Institute Committee, National Stabilization Agreement of the Sheet Metal Industry Trust Fund, Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust, Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund. Hearing scheduled for 5/9/2024 at 11:00 AM at Brooklyn Office.Order to be presented for signature on 5/9/2024. (Mooneyham, Heather)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Mooneyham
Att: 2 Supplement Memorandum
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Wednesday, December 27, 2023
6 6 order Stipulation and Order Thu 12/28 12:40 PM
Stipulated Order. Discovery must be completed by May 10, 2024. The Pre-Trial Conference will be held on May 16, 2024, at 11:00 a.m. before the Honorable Jil Mazer-Marino. Related [+]. Signed on 12/27/2023 (drk)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto)
Thursday, December 07, 2023
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned AP) Fri 12/08 1:13 PM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Appearances: Heather Mooneyham Representing Plaintiff, John J Macron Representing Defendant - Pre-Trial Conference set for 05/16/2024 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3529 (Judge Mazer-Marino), Brooklyn, NY Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Complaint by Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund, International Training Institute For The Sheet Metal And Air Conditioning Industry, Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust, National Energy Management Institute Committee, National Stabilization Agreement of the Sheet Metal Industry Trust Fund against David Rusi - Nature(s) of Suit: (41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e), (67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny) - 5/10/24 Discovery Deadline (tml
Monday, November 20, 2023
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 11/20 12:21 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by John J Macron on behalf of David Rusi (Macron, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 11/15 11:08 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by John J Macron on behalf of David Rusi (Macron, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2023
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 10/19 3:21 PM
Summons Served on David Rusi 10/18/2023 and these additional parties: Melissa A. Pena, Esq., Bruce Wisotsky, Esq., David J. Doyaga, Trustee, US Trustee . (Clark, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
2 2 cmp Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto) Wed 10/11 8:51 AM
Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office against David Rusi Answer Due: 11/13/2023 Pre-Trial Conference set for 12/7/2023 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3529 (Judge Mazer-Marino), Brooklyn, NY. (ssw)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 09, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 10/09 4:02 PM
Adversary case 1 23-01088 Complaint by Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund, International Training Institute For The Sheet Metal And Air Conditioning Industry, Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust, National Energy Management Institute Committee, National Stabilization Agreement of the Sheet Metal Industry Trust Fund against David Rusi. Fee Amount $350. Nature(s) of Suit: (41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e))), (67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)). (Mooneyham, Heather)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Cover Sheet