California Central District Court
Judge:Stephen V Wilson
Referred: Margo A Rocconi
Case #: 2:23-cv-08536
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Case Filed:Oct 10, 2023
Terminated:Jul 31, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Apr 07, 2024 2:00 PM PDT
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
Represented By
Matthew Errett Graham
Keats Gatien LLP
contact info
Erika Patricia Sanchez
Keats Gatien LLP
contact info
Konrad Karl Gatien
Keats Gatien LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Alsa Refinish LLC
Represented By
Karthik Krishna Murthy
Murthy Patent Law Inc.
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
42 42 misc Report of Determination of Patent/Trademark Action (CLOSE) (AO 120) Wed 07/31 9:09 AM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (aco)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Judgment
41 41 judgmentCV Judgment Wed 07/31 9:05 AM
JUDGMENT by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Judgment is entered for Defendant and against Plaintiff, pursuant to the Court's order dated July 31, 2024. RE: MINUTES OF ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT,40 . (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (aco)
Related: [-]
40 40 order Summary Judgment Wed 07/31 8:49 AM
MINUTES OF ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT21 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. For the foregoing reasons, Defendant's motion is GRANTED. (See document for further details).; granting21 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to dimissing plaintiff's causes of action . (aco)
Related: [-]
Sunday, July 14, 2024
39 39 misc Response Sun 07/14 11:48 AM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Alsa Refinish LLCto Generic Text Only Entry,,, 36(Murthy, Karthik)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit
Thursday, June 13, 2024
38 38 2 pgs order Order Thu 06/13 1:26 PM
ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR THIRTY DAYSFOR PLAINTIFF ALSA REFINISH LLC TO RESPOND TO 45-DAY DEADLINE ON JUNE 14, 2024, TO CONDUCT DISCOVERY. by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. The Court hereby extends the time for thirty days, until July 15, 2024, only so that Walmart may conclude its search for documents responsive to Alsa's First Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things, and so that Alsa may complete its review Walmart's responses before responding to the Court's April 30 Order. RE: Stipulation for Extension of Time to File37 . (aco)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
37 37 stip Extension of Time to File Document Tue 06/11 1:08 PM
First STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File documents based on discovery filed by plaintiff Alsa Refinish LLC.(Murthy, Karthik)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
36 36 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Tue 04/30 9:47 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY - The Court grants Plaintiff 45 days to conduct the discovery that Plaintiff alleges it needs. See Dkt.29 at 2 (Although only 1 example of paid advertising has been found, it suggests there are more sponsored search results and paid advertising, which will have to be uncovered in discovery. Furthermore, in order to reach the top of search results, it typically takes a lot of effort involving search engine optimization techniques. Defendant may very well have engaged in this activity, and Plaintiff can only find out through discovery.); Dkt.31 (Plaintiff also does not agree with Undisputed Fact numbers 43, 44, 45, 46, 47, 48, 49, 50, 51, 53, 54, 56, 57, 58, 69 and 70 because Plaintiff does not know whether these statements are true or not. Plaintiff requires discovery in order to make that determination, and so there is a dispute of fact.). THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dta)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
35 35 minutes Motion Hearing Wed 04/03 2:01 PM
MINUTES OF Hearing on MOTION for Summary Judgment as to dismissing plaintiff's causes of action filed by Defendant21 held before Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The motion is submitted. Order to issue. Attorney for Plaintiff(s): Karthik K. Murthy. Attorney for Defendant(s):Konrad K. Gatien, Matthew E. Graham. Courtroom Deputy: Paul M. Cruz. Time in Court: 15 mins. Court Reporter: Maria Bustillos. (pc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
34 34 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Wed 02/28 4:43 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: MOTION for Summary Judgment21 - The hearing previously scheduled for 03/11/2024 at 1:30 p.m. has been rescheduled to 4/1/2024 at 01:30 PM. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
33 33 respm Declaration (Motion related) Tue 02/27 12:24 PM
DECLARATION of Konrad Gatien in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to dimissing plaintiff's causes of action 21 Declaration of Konrad Gatien in Support of Walmart Inc.'s Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment Against Alsa Refinish LLC filed by Defendant Walmart Inc..(Gatien, Konrad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit MSJ Reply-Decl (Gatien) EXHS 10-11
32 32 respm Reply (Motion related) Tue 02/27 12:14 PM
REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to dimissing plaintiff's causes of action 21 filed by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Gatien, Konrad)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 19, 2024
31 31 respm Objection/Opposition (Motion related) Mon 02/19 8:43 PM
OPPOSITION in opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to dimissing plaintiff's causes of action 21 opposition to Defendant's statement of uncontroverted facts and law filed by Plaintiff Alsa Refinish LLC. (Murthy, Karthik)
Related: [-]
30 30 respm Declaration (Motion related) Mon 02/19 8:31 PM
DECLARATION of Isaac Banoun in opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to dimissing plaintiff's causes of action 21 filed by Plaintiff Alsa Refinish LLC. (Murthy, Karthik)
Related: [-]
29 29 respm Objection/Opposition (Motion related) Mon 02/19 8:29 PM
OPPOSITION opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to dimissing plaintiff's causes of action 21 filed by Plaintiff Alsa Refinish LLC.(Murthy, Karthik)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, February 12, 2024
28 28 notice Notice of Lodging Mon 02/12 2:21 PM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed by Defendant Walmart Inc. of [Proposed] JUDGMENT re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to dimissing plaintiff's causes of action 21(Gatien, Konrad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order MSJ-Proposed JUDGMENT
27 27 respm Statement (Motion related) Mon 02/12 2:12 PM
STATEMENT of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to dimissing plaintiff's causes of action 21 filed by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Gatien, Konrad)
Related: [-]
26 26 respm Declaration (Motion related) Mon 02/12 2:03 PM
DECLARATION of Konrad Gatien in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to dimissing plaintiff's causes of action 21 filed by Defendant Walmart Inc..(Gatien, Konrad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit MSJ-Decl (Gatien)-EXHS 7-9
25 25 respm Declaration (Motion related) Mon 02/12 1:51 PM
DECLARATION of Matt Kennedy in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to dimissing plaintiff's causes of action 21 filed by Defendant Walmart Inc..(Gatien, Konrad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit MSJ-Decl (Kennedy)-EXH 6
24 24 respm Declaration (Motion related) Mon 02/12 1:44 PM
DECLARATION of Elizabeth Snukst in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to dimissing plaintiff's causes of action 21 filed by Defendant Walmart Inc..(Gatien, Konrad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit MSJ-Decl (Snukst)-EXHS 4-5
23 23 respm Declaration (Motion related) Mon 02/12 1:37 PM
DECLARATION of Jeff Davis in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to dimissing plaintiff's causes of action 21 filed by Defendant Walmart Inc..(Gatien, Konrad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit MSJ-Decl (Davis)-EXHS 1-3
22 22 24 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Mon 02/12 1:29 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to dimissing plaintiff's causes of action 21 filed by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Gatien, Konrad)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Summary Judgment Mon 02/12 1:21 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to dimissing plaintiff's causes of action filed by Defendant Walmart Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 3/11/2024 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Gatien, Konrad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order MSJ-Proposed ORDER
Monday, February 05, 2024
20 20 textonly Notice of Filing Transcript Mon 02/05 8:34 AM
NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 1/29/2024 4:44 p.m. re Transcript19 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (apr)
Related: [-]
19 19 transcript -Transcript Mon 02/05 8:34 AM
TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 1/29/2024 4:44 p.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: LISA M. GONZALEZ, CSR No. 5920, CCRR, phone number csrlisag@aol.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 2/26/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/7/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/6/2024. (apr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
17 17 othcmp Amended Complaint/Petition Tue 01/30 10:31 PM
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Walmart Inc. amending Amended Complaint/Petition,12 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 , filed by plaintiff Alsa Refinish LLC(Murthy, Karthik)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Exhibit,
Att: 8 Exhibit,
Att: 9 Exhibit,
Att: 10 Exhibit,
Att: 11 Exhibit,
Att: 12 Exhibit,
Att: 13 Exhibit,
Att: 14 Exhibit,
Att: 15 Exhibit,
Att: 16 Exhibit,
Att: 17 Exhibit,
Att: 18 Exhibit,
Att: 19 Exhibit,
Att: 20 Exhibit,
Att: 21 Exhibit,
Att: 22 Exhibit
16 16 transcript -Transcript Order Form (G-120) Tue 01/30 6:23 PM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Walmart Inc. for Court Reporter. Court will contact Erika P. Sanchez at Erika@keatsgatien.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Sanchez, Erika)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2024
18 18 minutes Status Conference - optional html form Thu 02/01 8:59 AM
MINUTES OF New Case Status Conference held before Judge Stephen V. Wilson: Filing of Motion for Summary Judgment shall be February 12, 2024. The opposition shall be due on February 20, 2024. The reply will be filed no later than February 27, 2024. The hearing is scheduled for March 11, 2024 at 1:30 p.m. Attorney for Plaintiff(s): Karthik K. Murthy. Attorney for Defendant(s): Konrad K. Gatien, Erika P. Sanchez. Courtroom Deputy: Paul M. Cruz. Time in Court: 15 mins. Court Reporter: Lisa Gonzalez. (pc) Modified on 2/1/2024 (pc)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 15, 2023
15 15 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Fri 12/15 3:16 PM
ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE for 1/29/2024 AT 3:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
14 14 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 12/11 4:20 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Walmart Inc., identifying Walmart Inc.. (Gatien, Konrad)
Related: [-]
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 12/11 4:16 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,12 Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Defendant Walmart Inc. to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Walmart Inc..(Attorney Konrad Karl Gatien added to party Walmart Inc.(pty:dft))(Gatien, Konrad)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2023
12 12 othcmp Amended Complaint/Petition Mon 11/20 9:22 AM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Walmart Inc. amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 , filed by plaintiff Alsa Refinish LLC(Murthy, Karthik)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Exhibit,
Att: 8 Exhibit,
Att: 9 Exhibit,
Att: 10 Exhibit,
Att: 11 Exhibit,
Att: 12 Exhibit,
Att: 13 Exhibit,
Att: 14 Exhibit,
Att: 15 Exhibit,
Att: 16 Exhibit,
Att: 17 Exhibit,
Att: 18 Exhibit,
Att: 19 Exhibit,
Att: 20 Exhibit
Monday, October 23, 2023
11 11 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 10/23 9:28 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Alsa Refinish LLC. upon Walmart Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/17/2023, answer due 12/18/2023. Waiver of Service signed by Jenna Johnson. (Murthy, Karthik)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 13, 2023
10 10 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Fri 10/13 1:49 PM
NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
9 9 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 10/12 2:21 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant Walmart Inc. (car)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Thu 10/12 2:06 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
Related: [-]
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Thu 10/12 2:05 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Thu 10/12 2:05 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (car)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
5 5 notice Summons Request Tue 10/10 2:04 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by plaintiff ALSA REFINISH LLC. (Murthy, Karthik)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification) (AO 120) Tue 10/10 2:01 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by ALSA REFINISH LLC. (Murthy, Karthik)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 10/10 1:58 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff ALSA REFINISH LLC, (Murthy, Karthik)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Tue 10/10 1:54 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff ALSA REFINISH LLC. (Murthy, Karthik)
Related: [-]
1 1 12 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 10/10 1:51 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-36192097 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff ALSA REFINISH LLC. (Attorney Karthik Krishna Murthy added to party ALSA REFINISH LLC(pty:pla))(Murthy, Karthik)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Exhibit,
Att: 8 Exhibit,
Att: 9 Exhibit,
Att: 10 Exhibit,
Att: 11 Exhibit