New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Elizabeth S Stong
Case #: 1:23-bk-43673
Case Filed:Oct 10, 2023
Creditor Meeting:Nov 21, 2023
Dismissed:Mar 19, 2024
Terminated:Apr 08, 2024

Debtor
71 Pilling Project LLC
71 Pilling St
Brooklyn, NY 11207-1608
Represented By
71 Pilling Project LLC
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Debra Kramer
Debra Kramer, PLLC 10 Pantigo Road Suite 1
East Hampton, NY 11937
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee
Eastern District of NY (Brooklyn) Alexander Hamilton Custom House One Bowling Green Room 510
New York, NY 10004


Docket last updated: 10/11/2023 12:03 AM EDT
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
court Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic Auto Tue 10/10 7:30 PM
Receipt of Chapter 7 Filing Fee - $338.00. Receipt Number 10332227. (JF) (admin)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Tue 10/10 3:45 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non Individuals. Fee Amount $ 338 Filed by 71 pilling project LLC (jjf)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Judge - Trustee - 341 Meeting Assignment (Chapter 7 Business No Asset) (Auto Assign) Tue 10/10 3:48 PM
Notice of Chapter 7 Business Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee, Kramer, Debra, with 341(a) Meeting to be held on 11/21/2023 at 09:30 AM at Zoom.us/join - Kramer: Meeting ID 421 655 0672, Passcode 6019615054, Phone 1 (631)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Deficient Filing Chapter 7 Tue 10/10 3:54 PM
Deficient Filing Chapter 7: Statement Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1073-2b due by 10/10/2023. Corporate Resolution Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1074-1(a) due by 10/10/2023. Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FBR 1007(a)(1) due 10/10/2023. Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FBR 1073-3 due 10/10/2023. Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals Official Form 206Sum due by 10/24/2023. Schedule A/B due 10/24/2023. Schedule D due 10/24/2023. Schedule E/F due 10/24/2023. Schedule G due 10/24/2023. Schedule H due 10/24/2023. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non Individual Debtors Official Form 202 due 10/24/2023. Statement of Financial Affairs Non-Ind Form 207 due 10/24/2023. Incomplete Filings due by 10/24/2023. (jjf)
Related: [-]