New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Robert E Grossman
Case #: 8:23-bk-73767
Case Filed:Oct 10, 2023
Creditor Meeting:Nov 21, 2023
Dismissed:Dec 19, 2023
Terminated:Jan 08, 2024

Debtor
369 Vanderbilt Parkway Corporation
369 Vanderbilt Pkwy
Dix Hills, NY 11746-5820
Represented By
369 Vanderbilt Parkway Corporation
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Marc A. Pergament
Marc A. Pergament, Trustee 400 Garden City Plaza Ste 309
Garden City, NY 11530
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Long Island Federal Courthouse 560 Federal Plaza - Room 560
Central Islip, NY 11722


Docket last updated: 10/11/2023 12:03 AM EDT
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Tue 10/10 4:19 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non Individuals. Fee Amount $0.00 Filed by 369 Vanderbilt Parkway Corporation Filed via Electronic Dropbox (dng)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Judge - Trustee - 341 Meeting Assignment (Chapter 7 Business No Asset) (Auto Assign) Tue 10/10 4:20 PM
Notice of Chapter 7 Business Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee, Pergament, Marc A., with 341(a) Meeting to be held on 11/21/2023 at 09:00 AM at Zoom.us/join - Pergament: Meeting ID 626 617 2846, Passcode 3244273243, Phone 1 (516)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Deficient Filing Chapter 7 Tue 10/10 4:28 PM
Deficient Filing Chapter 7: Filing fee for commencing a bankruptcy case pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1930a due by 10/10/2023. Corporate Resolution Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1074-1(a) due by 10/10/2023. Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FBR 1007(a)(1) due 10/10/2023. Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FBR 1073-3 due 10/10/2023. Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals Official Form 206Sum due by 10/24/2023. Schedule A/B due 10/24/2023. Schedule E/F due 10/24/2023. Schedule G due 10/24/2023. Schedule H due 10/24/2023. Statement of Financial Affairs Non-Ind Form 207 due 10/24/2023. Incomplete Filings due by 10/24/2023. (dng)
Related: [-]
5 5 court Document Tue 10/10 4:32 PM
Deed for real property located at 369 Vanderbilt Parkway, Dix Hills, NY 11746 Filed by Debtor 369 Vanderbilt Parkway Corporation Filed via Electronic Dropbox (dng)
Related: [-]