Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873

South Carolina District Court
Judge:Richard M Gergel
Case #: 2:23-cv-05035
Nature of Suit245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability
Cause28:1442 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Oct 06, 2023
Case in other court:New York Northern, 6:23-cv-01139
Last checked: Saturday Apr 06, 2024 6:19 AM EDT
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341
Represented By
Peter C Condron
Crowell And Moring LLP
contact info
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
individually and as successor in interest to The Ansul Company One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143
Represented By
Thomas John Herten
Archer & Greiner P.C.
contact info
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
Defendant
The Chemours Company
Defendant
The 3M Company
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Keith Edward Smith
Greenberg Traurig LLP
contact info
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
Defendant
E I DuPont De Nemours Company Inc
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
Defendant
DuPont De Nemours Inc.
Defendant
Doe Defendants 1-20
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
Defendant
Corteva Inc
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
individually and as successor in interest to Sandoz Chemical Corporation 4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143
Represented By
Thomas John Herten
Archer & Greiner P.C.
contact info
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
Defendant
Carrier Fire & Security Corporation
Defendant
Carrier Fire & Security Americas Corporation
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086
Defendant
BASF Corporation
individually and as successor in interest to Ciba Inc. 100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932
Defendant
Arkema Inc
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
Plaintiff
Westmoreland Water District
Represented By
Nicholas H Mindicino
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
14 14 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 04/29 3:09 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by BASF Corporation.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Holian, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Friday, April 25, 2025
13 13 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 04/25 3:11 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice between Plaintiffs and Tyco, Chemguard, ChemDesign, and Released Parties by Tyco Fire Products LP.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Dukes, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Case List
Monday, July 08, 2024
12 12 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 07/08 4:37 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by The 3M Company, 3M Company, The, 3M Company, The 3M Company, The 3M Company, 3M Company, The 3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co). List of cases for dismissal)Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Bulger, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
11 11 service Summons Issued Tue 10/17 2:30 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
10 10 misc MDL Member Case Opened Tue 10/10 2:03 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: New York Northern (associated as of 10/6/2023), 6:23-cv-01139, Westmoreland Water District v. The 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-05035-RMG (sshe, )
Related: [-]
8 8 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Tue 10/10 2:00 PM
Case transferred in from District of New York Northern; Case Number 6:23-cv-01139. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
7 7 JPMDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (Certified Copy) (CTO-152): Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted as of 9/28/2023. ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the District of South Carolina and shall be assigned to Judge Gergel for inclusion into MDL-2873 regarding the Aqueous Film-Forming Foams Products Liability Litigation pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1407. Signed by Tiffaney D. Pete, Clerk of the Panel. (jmb) [Transferred from New York Northern on 10/10/2023.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 14, 2023
6 6 STIPULATION AND ORDER: Approving5 Letter Motion. Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 9/14/2023. (kmc) [Transferred from New York Northern on 10/10/2023.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
5 5 Letter Motion from Tyco Fire Products LP and Chemguard, Inc. for Chemguard Inc., Tyco Fire Products, LP requesting Entry of Consent Order Extending Time to Answer submitted to Judge Andrew T. Baxter, U.S.M.J. .(Herten, Thomas) [Transferred from New York Northern on 10/10/2023.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order/Judgment Executed Stipulation Requested to be So-Ordered
Wednesday, September 06, 2023
4 4 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 10/23/2023 at 11:00 AM by Telephone before US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 10/16/2023. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (mgh) [Transferred from New York Northern on 10/10/2023.]
Related: [-]
2 2 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Party Westmoreland Water District; Attorney Andrew Croner, Email address is acroner@napolilaw.com. Phone number is (212) 397-1000. Admissions due by 9/20/2023. (Notice of Admission Requirement and a courtesy copy of the GO 25 sent to Counsel via Email} (mgh) [Transferred from New York Northern on 10/10/2023.] (Entered: 09/06/2023)
Related: [-]
***Answer due date updated for Chemguard Inc. answer due 9/12/2023; Tyco Fire Products, LP answer due 9/12/2023. (mgh) [Transferred from New York Northern on 10/10/2023.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 05, 2023
3 3 STATE COURT COMPLAINT relating to1 Notice of Removal, filed by Plaintiff(s) in Oneida County Supreme Court. (mgh) [Transferred from New York Northern on 10/10/2023.]
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Oneida County Supreme Court, case number EFCA2023-001585 (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-6433960) filed by Chemguard Inc., Tyco Fire Products, LP.(mgh) [Transferred from New York Northern on 10/10/2023.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Proof of Service