Texas Western District Court
Judge:Robert Pitman
Case #: 1:23-cv-01225
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:100 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Oct 10, 2023
Terminated:May 21, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Apr 07, 2024 4:20 PM CDT
Counter Defendant
Tableau Software, LLC
Represented By
Matthew C. Powers
Graves Dougherty Hearon & Moody PC
contact info
Ciara N Mchale
Tyz Law Group PC
contact info
Ryan A. Tyz
Tyz Law Group PC
contact info
Erin Jones
Tyz Law Group
contact info
Sean Apple
Tyz Law Group PC
contact info
Counter Plaintiff
Tableau Software, LLC
Represented By
Matthew C. Powers
Graves Dougherty Hearon & Moody PC
contact info
Ciara N Mchale
Tyz Law Group PC
contact info
Ryan A. Tyz
Tyz Law Group PC
contact info
Erin Jones
Tyz Law Group
contact info
Hailey L. Suggs
Graves Dougherty Hearon & Moody PC
contact info
Sean Apple
Tyz Law Group PC
contact info
Defendant
Tableau Software, LLC
Represented By
Matthew C. Powers
Graves Dougherty Hearon & Moody PC
contact info
Ciara N Mchale
Tyz Law Group PC
contact info
Ryan A. Tyz
Tyz Law Group PC
contact info
Erin Jones
Tyz Law Group
contact info
Hailey L. Suggs
Graves Dougherty Hearon & Moody PC
contact info
Sean Apple
Tyz Law Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
iCharts LLC
Dykema Gossett PLLC c/o Michael P. Adams 111 Congress Ave., Suite 1800
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
Fabio E. Marino
Womble Bond Dickinson (us) LLP
contact info
Daniel M. Grigore
Womble Bond Dickinson (us) LLP
contact info
Carrie Richey
Womble Bond Dickinson (us) LLP
contact info
Michael P. Adams
Dykema
contact info
Steven M. Levitan
Womble Bond Dickinson (us) LLP
contact info

GPO May 21 2024
ORDER GRANTING 29 Motion to Transfer Case to the Northern District of California; DENYING 31 Motion for Discovery; MOOTING 32 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response 39 GRANTING 39 Motion for Leave to File Sur-reply; MOOTING 44 Motion for Protective Order; DENYING 56 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dm)

Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Friday, May 24, 2024
misc Acknowledgment of District Case Transfer Fri 05/31 9:27 AM
Case transferred from TXWD has been received and opened in Northern District of California as case number 3:24-cv-03157. (dm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
63 63 misc Report on Patent/Trademark (AO-120) Tue 05/21 2:03 PM
Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (dm)
Related: [-]
62 62 respm Surreply to Motion Tue 05/21 1:59 PM
Sur-reply to Motion, filed by Tableau Software, LLC, re31 MOTION for Discovery - iCharts' Opposed Motion for Leave to Conduct Expedited Venue Discovery Prior to Responding to Defendant Tableau's Motion to Transfer Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) filed by Plaintiff iCharts LLC (dm)
Related: [-]
61 61 30+ pgs order Order on Motion to Transfer Case Order on Motion for Discovery Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Order on Motion for Leave to File Order on Motion for Protective Order Order on Motion to Strike Tue 05/21 1:50 PM
ORDER GRANTING29 Motion to Transfer Case to the Northern District of California; DENYING31 Motion for Discovery; MOOTING32 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response39 GRANTING39 Motion for Leave to File Sur-reply; MOOTING44 Motion for Protective Order; DENYING56 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dm)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 05/21 1:44 PM
Case reassigned to Judge Robert Pitman. Judge Docket II - Austin no longer assigned to the case. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dm)
Related: [-]