Texas Western District Court
Judge:Alan D Albright
Referred: Derek T Gilliland
Case #: 6:23-cv-00704
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Oct 10, 2023
Terminated:Jan 02, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Apr 07, 2024 4:21 PM CDT
Defendant
Weee! Inc.
Represented By
Cristina Guerrero
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani
contact info
Reid E. Dammann
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Alto Dynamics, LLC
Represented By
Jonathan L. Hardt
Rozier Hardt Mcdonough PLLC
contact info
Jonathan R. Miller
Rozier Hardt Mcdonough PLLC
contact info
Travis E. Lynch
Rozier Hardt Mcdonough PLLC
contact info
C. Matthew Rozier
Rozier Hardt Mcdonough PLLC
contact info
James F. McDonough
Rozier Hardt Mcdonough PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
25 25 misc Report on Patent/Trademark (AO-120) Tue 01/02 5:10 PM
Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (bot2)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 29, 2023
24 24 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 12/29 5:56 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Alto Dynamics, LLC (McDonough, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
23 23 4 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Wed 12/20 10:22 PM
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Alto Dynamics, LLC, re12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Weee! Inc. (McDonough, James)
Related: [-]
22 22 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 12/20 10:14 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Weee! Inc. amending1 Complaint,,., filed by Alto Dynamics, LLC.(McDonough, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A. U.S. Patent No. 7,392,160,
Att: 2 Exhibit B. U.S. Patent No. 8,051,098,
Att: 3 Exhibit C. U.S. Patent No. RE 46,513,
Att: 4 Exhibit D. U.S. Patent No. 7,657,531,
Att: 5 Exhibit E. U.S. Patent No. 7,152,018,
Att: 6 Exhibit F. Weee! Job Application Page,
Att: 7 Exhibit G. Weee! Privacy Policy,
Att: 8 Exhibit H. Weee! Website Log In,
Att: 9 Exhibit I. Weee! Login Profile,
Att: 10 Exhibit J. Declaration of Walter Gibson Overby (Overby Decl.)
21 21 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 12/20 1:13 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alto Dynamics, LLC. Weee! Inc. served on 10/25/2023, answer due 11/15/2023. (McDonough, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
20 20 14 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Mon 12/11 10:11 AM
ORDER GRANTING19 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2023
19 19 motion Protective Order Fri 12/08 5:24 PM
Joint MOTION for Confidentiality/Protective Order Joint Motion for Entry of Protective Order by Weee! Inc..(Guerrero, Cristina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
18 18 misc Stipulation Fri 12/08 5:20 PM
STIPULATION Second Joint Stipulation Regarding Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Weee! Inc.. (Guerrero, Cristina)
Related: [-]
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 12/08 4:02 PM
ORDER GRANTING16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Reid E. Dammann. Attorney added for Weee! Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District . Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bot1)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 07, 2023
16 16 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 12/07 5:06 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cristina Guerrero on Behalf of Reid E. Dammann ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-18182771) by on behalf of Weee! Inc.. (Guerrero, Cristina)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
15 15 misc Stipulation Tue 11/21 1:39 PM
STIPULATION Joint Stipulation Regarding Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Weee! Inc.. (Guerrero, Cristina)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2023
14 14 notice Notice Mon 11/20 9:36 PM
NOTICE of Venue/Jurisdictional Discovery by Alto Dynamics, LLC re11 Opposed MOTION to Transfer Case (McDonough, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 16, 2023
13 13 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7) Thu 11/16 5:19 PM
RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Weee! Inc.. (Guerrero, Cristina)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
12 12 motion Dismiss Wed 11/15 6:16 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Weee! Inc..(Guerrero, Cristina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
11 11 motion Transfer Case Wed 11/15 6:13 PM
Opposed MOTION to Transfer Case by Weee! Inc..(Guerrero, Cristina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Affidavit,
Att: 3 Affidavit,
Att: 4 Affidavit,
Att: 5 Proposed Order
Monday, October 16, 2023
10 10 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge Tue 10/17 9:42 AM
ORDER : CASE NO LONGER REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Derek T. Gilliland. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 13, 2023
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 10/13 1:15 PM
ORDER GRANTING8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney C. Matthew Rozier. Attorney added for Alto Dynamics, LLC. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District . Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (bot2)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
8 8 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 10/12 1:43 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by C. Matthew Rozier ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-17980178) by on behalf of Alto Dynamics, LLC.. Motions referred to Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (Rozier, C.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment to MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
7 7 service Summons Issued Wed 10/11 2:43 PM
Summons Issued as to Weee! Inc.. (ad3)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
6 6 notice Notice Tue 10/10 10:40 PM
NOTICE Of Related Cases by Alto Dynamics, LLC (McDonough, James)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 10/10 10:12 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James F. McDonough on behalf of Alto Dynamics, LLC. Attorney James F. McDonough added to party Alto Dynamics, LLC(pty:pla) (McDonough, James)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7) Tue 10/10 9:05 PM
RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Alto Dynamics, LLC. (Rozier, C.)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Tue 10/10 9:00 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Rozier, C.)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 10/10 8:55 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Alto Dynamics, LLC. (Rozier, C.)
Related: [-]
1 1 28 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 10/10 8:46 PM
COMPLAINT For Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-17971756), filed by Alto Dynamics, LLC.(Rozier, C.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A. U.S. Patent No. 7,392,160,
Att: 2 Exhibit B. U.S. Patent No. 8,051,098,
Att: 3 Exhibit C. U.S. Patent No. RE 46,513,
Att: 4 Exhibit D. U.S. Patent No. 7,657,531,
Att: 5 Exhibit E. U.S. Patent No. 7,152,018,
Att: 6 Exhibit F. Weee! Job Application Page,
Att: 7 Exhibit G. Weee! Privacy Policy,
Att: 8 Exhibit H. Weee! Website Log In,
Att: 9 Exhibit I. Weee! Login Profile,
Att: 10 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Case Referred to Magistrate Judge Wed 10/11 2:42 PM
Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright and CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Derek T. Gilliland. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (ad3)
Related: [-]