|
GPO
Nov 07 2023
FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS on Plea of Guilty as to Caeland Delmon Ackerman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 11/7/2023. (JDH)
|
|
GPO
Nov 21 2023
ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS IN FULL AND SETTING SENTENCING as to Caeland Delmon Ackerman. ( Sentencing set for 3/8/2024 at 10:30 AM in Billings, MT before Judge Susan P. Watters.) Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 11/21/2023. (AMC)
|
|
GPO
Mar 08 2024
JUDGMENT as to Caeland Delmon Ackerman (1), Count(s) 1, The Defendant is SENTENCED ON COUNT 1 OF THE INDICTMENT TO THE CUSTODY OF THE B.O.P FOR A TERM OF 30 MONTHS. Ordered to run concurrent to Yellowstone County case DC 19-1322. Supervised release for a term of 3 years with standard and special conditions. Fine waived and a $100 special assessment due immediately Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 3/8/2024. (EMH)
|
|
GPO
May 01 2024
FINAL ORDER OF FORFEITURE. Order granting 39 Motion for Forfeiture of Property as to Caeland Delmon Ackerman (1). Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 5/1/2024. (EMH)
|