Consolidated
Lead case: 1:23-md-03076

Florida Southern District Court
Judge:K Michael Moore
Case #: 1:23-cv-23871
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:Oct 11, 2023
Terminated:Oct 11, 2023
Case in other court:New Jersey, 2:23-cv-00389
Last checked: Monday Apr 08, 2024 4:17 AM EDT
Defendant
Armanino LLC
Represented By
Torsten M. Kracht
Hunton Andrews Kurth, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Prager Metis LLP
Interested Party
arbnwk
Interested Party
Thomas R. Waskom
Interested Party
Joanna R. Travalini
Interested Party
Edward Eugene Lehman
Interested Party
Tommy Hoyt
Interested Party
Bruce R. Braun
Interested Party
Jacob Wilson Blacklock
Interested Party
Matthew P. Bosher
Plaintiff
Loods B.V.
Plaintiff
L Zhao
Plaintiff
How Yuan
Plaintiff
Khoo Wing
Plaintiff
J Bell
Plaintiff
Justin Berk
Plaintiff
Sunli
Plaintiff
S. Roberts
Plaintiff
Morebet, Ltd.
Plaintiff
Lucky D
Plaintiff
K David
Plaintiff
Nickle Lee
Plaintiff
B Ken
Plaintiff
Jong R.D.
Plaintiff
S Jong
Plaintiff
Edward Johns
Plaintiff
Nurse S. James
Plaintiff
Yang How
Plaintiff
Drake HK
Plaintiff
P Devin


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
52 52 order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Order Staying Case Wed 10/11 11:37 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER STAYING CASE. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon a sua sponte review of the record. The Court notes that this case is a member case in In Re: FTX Cryptocurrency Exchange Collapse Litigation, 1:23-md-03076-KMM. In the interests of judicial economy, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that this case is STAYED. The Clerk of the Court is instructed to administratively close this case for statistical purposes, while the claims proceed under 1:23-md-03076-KMM. The Court shall retain jurisdiction and the case shall be restored to the active docket upon motion of a party if circumstances change so that the action may proceed to final disposition. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 10/11/2023. (rfr) (jas)
Related: [-]
51 51 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Wed 10/11 11:06 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge K. Michael Moore. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jas)
Related: [-]
50 50 transfer MDL Tag-Along/Transfer In Case Receipt Wed 10/11 10:53 AM
MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of New Jersey. Case Number 23-cv-00389 with documents 1 - 48. Assigned FLSD Case Number 23-cv-23871. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 23-md-3076. Clerks Note: JPML notified. (jas)
Related: [-]
49 49 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer - CV - NO FEE Wed 10/11 10:24 AM
Case transferred in from New Jersey; Case Number 2:23-cv-00389. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(jas).
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
48 48 Order of MDL Panel transferring case to the District of Southern District of Florida. (krg, )
Related: [-]