Tennessee Eastern District Court
Judge:Travis R Mcdonough
Referred: Cynthia R Wyrick
Case #: 2:23-cv-00135
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Oct 11, 2023
Case in other court:Sullivan County Circuit Court, C3869(m)
Last checked: Monday Apr 08, 2024 4:40 AM EDT
Defendant
HSNi, LLC
Represented By
Mark E Stamelos
Fordharrison, Llp (nash)
contact info
Meredith Amber Box
Fordharrison LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Moniqua Ashianae Smiley
Represented By
Michael L Forrester
Hunter, Smith & Davis
contact info
Gregory K Haden
Hunter, Smith & Davis - Kingsport
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, October 25, 2024
19 19 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 10/25 4:52 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Case With Prejudice by HSNi, LLC. (Stamelos, Mark)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
18 18 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 08/27 11:03 AM
ORDER: The parties shall file a stipulation of dismissal pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) on or before October 25, 2024. The parties are ON NOTICE that, if no stipulation of dismissal is filed on or before the date specified in this Order, the Court will dismiss this action with prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(b).Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 8/27/24. (ABF)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
17 17 notice Notice of Settlement Mon 08/26 10:02 AM
NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT Joint by HSNi, LLC Trial Date: 12/9/24; Case Reported Settled By Defendant; Parties did not participate in mediation/arbitration. (Stamelos, Mark)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
16 16 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Mon 05/20 1:36 PM
ORDER granting 15 Motion to Amend/Correct. The parties have filed a Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order [Doc. 15], which the Court finds to be well-taken and it is GRANTED . See Order for amended Scheduling dates and details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia R Wyrick on 05/20/2024. (CAT)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
15 15 motion Amend/Revise Fri 05/17 11:30 AM
Joint MOTION to Amend/Revise12 Scheduling Order, by HSNi, LLC.(Stamelos, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Other Proposed Agreed Order
Monday, April 15, 2024
14 14 misc Status Report Mon 04/15 4:24 PM
STATUS REPORT JOINT RESOLUTION STATUS REPORT by HSNi, LLC. (Stamelos, Mark)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
13 13 notice Notice of Consent/Nonconsent Mon 11/27 6:28 PM
NOTICE OF NONCONSENT Joint by HSNi, LLC (Stamelos, Mark)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2023
12 12 order Scheduling Order Mon 11/20 9:38 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 12/9/2024 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 - Chattanooga before District Judge Travis R McDonough. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/25/2024 01:00 PM in Courtroom 3 - Chattanooga before District Judge Travis R McDonough.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 11/20/2023. (BJL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 14, 2023
11 11 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Tue 11/14 11:12 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Stamelos, Mark)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 24, 2023
10 10 order Order Tue 10/24 10:50 AM
ORDER The Telephonic Scheduling Conference is RESET to 11/14/2023 at 2:00PM. Dial-in instructions will be circulated via email. Signed by District Judge Travis R. McDonough on 10/24/2023. (WEL)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 20, 2023
9 9 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 10/20 11:54 AM
ORDER A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 11/7/2023 02:30 PM before District Judge Travis R. McDonough. Dial-in instructions will be circulated via email.Signed by District Judge Travis R. McDonough on 10/20/2023. (WEL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 10/17 10:05 AM
ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by HSNi, LLC.(Stamelos, Mark)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
7 7 misc Certificate of Corporate Interest Thu 10/12 2:52 PM
Certificate of Corporate Interest by HSNi, LLC. (Stamelos, Mark)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/11 4:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Meredith Amber Box on behalf of HSNi, LLC (Box, Meredith)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs order Order Regarding Availability of Magistrate Judge Wed 10/11 3:46 PM
ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on October 11, 2023. (SAC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent/Non-Consent Form(flatten/non-fillable when filing in ECF)
4 4 3 pgs order Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Wed 10/11 3:46 PM
Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on October 11, 2023. (SAC)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs order Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Wed 10/11 3:45 PM
Order Governing Motions To Dismiss.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on October 11, 2023. (SAC)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs order Order Governing Depositions Wed 10/11 3:44 PM
Order Governing Depositions.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on October 11, 2023. (SAC)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Wed 10/11 10:23 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sullivan County Circuit Court, case number C3869(m). (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNEDC-5495934), filed by HSNi, LLC.(Stamelos, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A: State Court Pleadings,
Att: 2 Exhibit B: Notice to State Court of Removal,
Att: 3 Other Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Other Defendant's Business Entity Disclosure
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 10/11 3:42 PM
District Judge Travis R McDonough and Magistrate Judge Cynthia R Wyrick added. (SAC)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Failure to File Certificate of Citizenship Wed 10/11 3:44 PM
NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Citizenship in a diversity case as required by FRCP 7.1. (SAC)
Related: [-]