South Carolina District Court
Judge:Richard M Gergel
Referred: Mary Gordon Baker
Case #: 2:23-cv-05075
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause29:2601 Family Medical Leave Act
Case Filed:Oct 10, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Apr 07, 2024 5:26 PM EDT
Defendant
Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC.
Represented By
Nikole Setzler Mergo
Maynard Nexsen PC
contact info
Raquel S Lord
Greenberg Traurig Llp (nj)
contact info
Alexandra Harrington Austin
Maynard Nexsen
contact info
Kristine J Feher
Greenberg Traurig Llp (nj)
contact info
Plaintiff
Burton L. Relethford
Represented By
Anthony Christopher Potts
Hitchcock And Potts
contact info


Docket last updated: 76 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
42 42 21 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Order on Motion to Compel Wed 04/23 1:39 PM
ORDER granting 36 Motion to Amend/Correct; granting 37 Motion to Compel. The discovery deadline is May 5, 2025, mediation deadline is May 19, 2025, and motions deadline is July 7, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 4/23/2025.(dgar)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
41 41 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 04/14 11:03 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re37 MOTION to Compel Response filed by Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC.. (Austin, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
40 40 4 pgs respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 04/07 4:05 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re37 MOTION to Compel Response filed by Burton L. Relethford.Reply to Response to Motion due by 4/14/2025 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Potts, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
39 39 order Order Mon 03/31 10:48 AM
TEXT ORDER. Plaintiff's response to Defendant's Motion to Compel (Dkt. No. 37) is due by Monday, April 7, 2025. IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 03/31/2025. (kman, Kendall)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
38 38 8 pgs respm Response in Support of Motion Wed 03/26 5:57 PM
RESPONSE in Support re37 MOTION to Compel ,36 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct30 Scheduling Order,, Terminate Motions, Response filed by Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC.. (Austin, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
37 37 6 pgs motion Compel Wed 03/26 5:53 PM
MOTION to Compel by Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC.. Response to Motion due by 4/9/2025. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker.(Austin, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Exhibit A Plaintiffs Responses to Defendants Requests for Production to Documents
Friday, March 21, 2025
36 36 4 pgs motion Amend/Correct Fri 03/21 2:08 PM
Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct30 Scheduling Order,, Terminate Motions, by Burton L. Relethford. Response to Motion due by 4/4/2025. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker.(Potts, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Proposed Order
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
35 35 order Order Tue 03/18 3:15 PM
TEXT ORDER. Informal call regarding continuation of Plaintiff's deposition. The parties agree that Plaintiff will appear at 8:00 am tomorrow, March 19, 2025, at the regularly scheduled spot for no more than two hours. IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 03/18/2025. (kman, Kendall)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
34 34 adr ADR Statement/Certification Fri 03/07 10:04 AM
ADR STATEMENT/CERTIFICATION by Burton L. Relethford(Potts, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
33 33 adr ADR Statement/Certification Wed 03/05 5:00 PM
ADR STATEMENT/CERTIFICATION by Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC.(Mergo, Nikole)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
32 32 order Order Fri 02/21 12:23 PM
TEXT ORDER. The Court clarifies that the deadline to file and serve affidavits of records custodians is March 21, 2025. IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 2/21/25. (akob, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
31 31 misc Letter Thu 02/20 7:18 PM
Letter from Defendant's counsel. (Austin, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
30 30 1 pgs order Scheduling Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Fri 01/17 1:23 PM
FOURTH AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 3/21/2025, Motions due by 4/21/2025, Mediation Due by 4/4/2025. Motion GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART: 29 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct 28 Scheduling Order, Terminate Motions, filed by Burton L. Relethford. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 1/17/2025. (dgar)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
29 29 4 pgs motion Amend/Correct Wed 01/15 11:37 AM
Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct28 Scheduling Order,, Terminate Motions, by Burton L. Relethford. Response to Motion due by 1/29/2025. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker.(Potts, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Amended Scheduling Order
Thursday, November 14, 2024
28 28 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Thu 11/14 10:19 AM
THIRD AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Records Custodian Affidavit due by 2/21/2025, Discovery due by 2/21/2025, Motions due by 4/7/2025, Mediation Due by 3/18/2025. Motion GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART: 27 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct 26 Scheduling Order, Terminate Motions, filed by Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 11/14/2024. (dgar)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
27 27 motion Amend/Correct Wed 11/13 4:54 PM
Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct26 Scheduling Order,, Terminate Motions, by Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC.. Response to Motion due by 12/2/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker.(Austin, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
26 26 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Wed 07/24 10:19 AM
SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Records Custodian Affidavit due by 11/23/2024, Discovery due by 12/23/2024, Motions due by 2/19/2025, Mediation Due by 1/20/2025. Motion GRANTED: 25 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct 18 Scheduling Order, filed by Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 7/24/2024. (dgar)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
25 25 motion Amend/Correct Tue 07/23 4:50 PM
Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct18 Scheduling Order, by Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC.. Response to Motion due by 8/6/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker.(Austin, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
24 24 notice Notice of Change of Case Number Thu 06/20 9:24 AM
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF CASE NUMBER: New Case Number is 2:23-cv-05075-RMG-MGB. (agaz, )
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Case Reassigned CV Thu 06/20 8:40 AM
Case Reassigned to Judge Honorable Richard M Gergel. Judge Honorable Joseph Dawson, III no longer assigned to the case. (cwil, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
22 22 order Confidentiality Order Tue 03/19 7:56 AM
CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER: Whereas, the parties to this Consent Confidentiality Order (the "parties") have stipulated that certain discovery material is and should be treated as confidential and have agreed to the terms of this order; accordingly, it is this 19th day of March 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 3/19/2024. (dgar)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
21 21 motion Confidentiality Order Mon 03/18 5:22 PM
Joint MOTION for Confidentiality Order by Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC.. Response to Motion due by 4/1/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker.(Mergo, Nikole)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 10 pgs Proposed Order Proposed Confidentiality Order,
Att: 2 13 pgs Proposed Order Redlined Version of Confidentiality Order
Monday, February 19, 2024
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 02/19 4:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra Harrington Austin on behalf of Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC. (Austin, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
19 19 misc Case Reassigned CV Thu 02/08 10:20 AM
Case Reassigned to Judge Honorable Joseph Dawson, III. Judge Honorable Richard M Gergel no longer assigned to the case. (cwil, )
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
18 18 order Scheduling Order Fri 02/02 10:27 AM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 1/18/2024, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 2/1/2024, Rule 26 Report due by 2/1/2024, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 2/22/2024, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 7/23/2024, Discovery due by 9/24/2024, Motions due by 11/21/2024, Mediation Due by 10/22/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 2/2/2024. (dgar)
Related: [-]
17 17 discov Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories Fri 02/02 9:28 AM
Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Burton L. Relethford.(Potts, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
16 16 discov Rule 26 Discovery Plan Thu 02/01 8:24 PM
Joint Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC..(Mergo, Nikole)
Related: [-]
15 15 discov Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories Thu 02/01 8:23 PM
Defendant's Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC..(Mergo, Nikole)
Related: [-]
14 14 discov Rule 26(f) Report Thu 02/01 8:21 PM
Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC..(Mergo, Nikole)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 28, 2023
13 13 order Scheduling Order Thu 12/28 12:06 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 1/18/2024, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 2/1/2024, Rule 26 Report due by 2/1/2024, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 2/22/2024, Plaintiff's ID of Expert Witness due by 3/25/2024, Defendant's ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 4/24/2024, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 4/24/2024, Discovery due by 6/24/2024, Motions due by 8/23/2024, Mediation Due by 7/24/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 12/28/2023. (dgar)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 27, 2023
12 12 discov Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Wed 12/27 1:39 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC..(Mergo, Nikole)
Related: [-]
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 12/27 1:36 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC..(Mergo, Nikole)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 12/18 9:44 AM
ORDER granting pro hac vice admission as to Kristine J. Feher and Raquel S. Lord who represent Defendant Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 12/18/23.(cper, )
Related: [-]
Friday, December 15, 2023
9 9 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (only one attorney per motion) Fri 12/15 11:50 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Raquel S. Lord ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number ASCDC-11483658) by Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC.. Response to Motion due by 12/29/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker.(Mergo, Nikole)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Application for PHV Admission,
Att: 2 Envelope Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Proposed Order Proposed Order
8 8 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (only one attorney per motion) Fri 12/15 11:46 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kristine J. Feher ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number ASCDC-11483596) by Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC.. Response to Motion due by 12/29/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker.(Mergo, Nikole)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Application for PHV Admission,
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Monday, November 13, 2023
7 7 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 11/13 8:38 AM
TEXT ORDER granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant must answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint by December 27, 2023. Absent extraordinary circumstances, no further extensions will be granted. Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 11/13/23.(akob, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 09, 2023
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 11/09 2:33 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint or Otherwise Plead by Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC.. Response to Motion due by 11/27/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker.(Mergo, Nikole)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 23, 2023
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed - Complaint Served Mon 10/23 9:14 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Burton L. Relethford. Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC. served on 10/20/2023, answer due 11/13/2023.(Potts, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 10/11 10:59 AM
Summons Issued as to Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC.. Service due by 1/9/2024. (dgar)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
2 2 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Wed 10/11 10:58 AM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Burton L. Relethford.(dgar)
Related: [-]
1 1 34 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 10/11 10:55 AM
COMPLAINT against Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-11364102.), filed by Burton L. Relethford. Service due by 1/8/2024.(dgar)
Related: [-]