Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:23-bk-54998

Georgia Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Sage M Sigler
Case #: 1:23-ap-05159
Nature of Suit62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Oct 10, 2023
Terminated:Nov 13, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Nafisa Bijani
2328 Grady Ridge Dr
Duluth, GA 30097
Represented By
Milton D. Jones
Milton D. Jones, Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Platinum Federal Credit Union
2 Sun Court Ste. 400
Peachtree Corners, GA 30092
Represented By
Michael Brian Pugh
Thompson, O'Brien, Kappler & Nasuti, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Monday, November 13, 2023
misc Adversary Closed Mon 11/13 10:52 AM
Adversary 1:23-ap-5159 Closed (yl)
Related: [-]
Saturday, November 11, 2023
7 7 misc Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Motion to Extend Time Sun 11/12 12:16 PM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Motion to Extend Time Notice Date 11/11/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 09, 2023
6 6 order Extend Time, Motion to Thu 11/09 2:13 PM
Order GRANTING Request to Extend Time. The deadline for Defendant to file an answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to November 27, 2023. Related [+] Service by BNC. Entered on 11/9/2023. (cws)
Related: [-] 4
5 5 misc Stipulation Thu 11/09 12:40 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice Filed by Michael Brian Pugh on behalf of Platinum Federal Credit Union. Related [+] (Pugh, Michael)
Related: [-] 1
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
4 4 motion Extend Time, Motion to Wed 11/08 2:09 PM
Motion to Extend Time to answer complaint filed by Milton D. Jones on behalf of Nafisa Bijani. (Jones, Milton). Related document(s)1 Complaint. Modified on 11/9/2023 (yl)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 13, 2023
3 3 misc Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint Fri 10/13 10:57 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint filed by Michael Brian Pugh on behalf of Platinum Federal Credit Union. Related [+] (Pugh, Michael)
Related: [-] 1 ,2
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
2 2 court Summons/Alias Summons Issued (auto) Wed 10/11 12:36 PM
Summons Issued on Nafisa Bijani Answer Due 11/13/2023 (yl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 10/10 4:23 PM
Adversary case 23-05159 Complaint against Nafisa Bijani to Determine Dischargeability of Debt Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 523(a)(2) , Fee Collected $ 350 62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud) Filed by Platinum Federal Credit Union (Pugh, Michael)
Related: [-]