Michigan Western District Court
Judge:Hala Y Jarbou
Referred: Phillip J Green
Case #: 1:23-cv-01078
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Auto Negligence
Case Filed:Oct 11, 2023
Terminated:Jul 25, 2024
Case in other court:Ionia County Circuit Court, 23-35942-NI
Last checked: Monday Apr 08, 2024 4:22 AM EDT
defendant
Grace Transport, Inc.
a Foreign Insurance Company, Jointly and Severally Dickie McCamey & Chilcote, PC 89 Kercheval Suite 200
Grosse Pointe Farms, MI 48236
Represented By
Timothy S. Groustra
Dickie, Mccamey & Chilcote, P.C.
contact info
defendant
Nelson Stuart Arnold
Represented By
Timothy S. Groustra
Dickie, Mccamey & Chilcote, P.C.
contact info
mediator
Facilitative Mediator
Represented By
Mona K. Majzoub
Mona K. Majzoub Dispute Resolutions PLLC
contact info
plaintiff
Cody Joseph Baxter
Represented By
Kujtim Sulolli
Goodman Acker PC
contact info
Barry J. Goodman
Goodman Acker, P.C.
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
defendant
Progressive Michigan Insurance Company
Terminated: 10/11/2023


Docket last updated: 75 minutes ago
Thursday, July 25, 2024
34 34 order Stipulation and Order Thu 07/25 9:13 AM
STIPULATED ORDER dismissing with prejudice; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (bgs)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
33 33 motion Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 07/24 12:59 PM
STIPULATION of dismissal by plaintiff Cody Joseph Baxter (Sulolli, Kujtim)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
32 32 1 pgs order Order Regarding Dismissal Papers Mon 07/08 1:52 PM
ORDER requiring dismissal papers to be submitted by 7/22/2024; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (bgs)
Related: [-]
31 31 adr Facilitative Mediation Report Mon 07/08 10:55 AM
REPORT of facilitative mediation held June 7, 2024; mediation is complete; case is settled, (kmd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
30 30 service Proof of Service Wed 05/29 9:01 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Cody Joseph Baxter for Rule 26(a)(2)(A) Disclosure (Sulolli, Kujtim)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
adr Facilitative Mediation - Fee Received Fri 03/08 2:35 PM
VFM FEE RECEIVED in the amount of $25.00, check number 330137 as to defendants Nelson Stuart Arnold, Grace Transport, Inc., Progressive Michigan Insurance Company (jmw)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
adr Facilitative Mediation - Fee Received Mon 03/04 3:44 PM
VFM FEE RECEIVED in the amount of $25.00, check number 81688 as to plaintiff Cody Joseph Baxter (jmw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
29 29 adr Facilitative Mediation - Notice of Appointment of Facilitative Mediator Wed 02/28 3:30 PM
NOTICE of appointment of Facilitative Mediator Mona K. Majzoub; plaintiff VFM fee to be submitted by 3/6/2024 defendant VFM fee to be submitted by 3/6/2024 (kmd)
Related: [-]
28 28 adr Facilitative Mediation - Notice of Selection of Facilitative Mediator Wed 02/28 3:10 PM
SELECTION of Mona K. Mazjoub as facilitative mediator by plaintiff Cody Joseph Baxter (Sulolli, Kujtim)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2024
27 27 order Case Management Order Mon 01/29 4:47 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: discovery to be completed by 7/29/2024; dispositive motions due by 8/29/2024; settlement conference set for 3/4/2025 at 1:00 PM at 499 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green; final pretrial conference set for 4/1/2025 at 10:30 AM at 128 Federal Building, Lansing, MI before Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou; jury trial set for 4/28/2025 at 9:00 AM at 128 Federal Building, Lansing, MI before Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (bgs)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
26 26 misc Joint Status Report (Rule 16) Fri 01/26 4:15 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT (Groustra, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 29, 2023
25 25 5 pgs order Order Regarding Preparation of Joint Status Report Fri 12/29 3:31 PM
ORDER regarding preparation of joint status report: status report due by 1/26/2024; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (bgs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 26, 2023
24 24 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Tue 12/26 6:07 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint21 with affirmative defenses and jury demand by Nelson Stuart Arnold, Grace Transport, Inc. (Groustra, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 22, 2023
23 23 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 12/22 2:42 PM
SUMMONS returned executed; Nelson Stuart Arnold served on 12/13/2023, answer due 1/3/2024 (Sulolli, Kujtim)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
22 22 service Summons Issued Tue 12/05 2:12 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Nelson Stuart Arnold (mlc)
Related: [-]
21 21 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 12/05 12:35 PM
Corrected First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Nelson Stuart Arnold and Grace Transport, Inc. filed by Cody Joseph Baxter (Sulolli, Kujtim) Modified text on 12/5/2023, this document replaces20 (jlg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
20 20 cmp Amended Third Party Complaint Tue 12/05 12:09 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Nelson Stuart Arnold filed by Cody Joseph Baxter (Sulolli, Kujtim) Modified text on 12/5/2023 (mlc)
Related: [-]
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Tue 12/05 11:21 AM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part17 motion to file first amended complaint; directing Plaintiff to file their first amended complaint; directing clerk of court to amend case caption; expiration of summons remains 12/29/2023; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (bgs)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Notify Attorney Notice Tue 12/05 8:51 AM
(DISREGARD) NOTICE to attorney Kujtim Sulolli regarding recent filing17 (mlc) Modified text on 12/5/2023 (mlc)
Related: [-]
utility Remark - public Tue 12/05 10:25 AM
Remark: Document17 filed by attorney Kujtim Sulolli was filed correctly; Clerk's Notice18 has been disregarded (mlc)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
17 17 motion Amend/Correct Mon 12/04 2:32 PM
MOTION to amend/correct Party Name and Extend Summons by plaintiff Cody Joseph Baxter; (Sulolli, Kujtim)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
utility Copies Mailed Wed 11/15 8:54 AM
Copy of Stipulation and Order16 sent via U.S. Mail to barry J. Goodman (jjm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 14, 2023
16 16 order Stipulation and Order Tue 11/14 4:04 PM
STIPULATED ORDER for Substitution of Plaintiff's Counsel; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (bgs)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order (separate documents) Tue 11/14 12:09 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for substitution of plaintiff's counsel by plaintiff Cody Joseph Baxter [Attorney Kujtim Sulolli added to party Cody Joseph Baxter(pty:pla)] (Sulolli, Kujtim) Modified text on 11/14/2023 (mlc)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
14 14 misc Attorney Admission Letter (Second Notice) Mon 11/13 1:39 PM
ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER - SECOND NOTICE sent to attorney Barry J. Goodman; attorney admission deadline set for 12/11/2023; (mkc)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 06, 2023
13 13 1 pgs motion Order Mon 11/06 12:48 PM
STATE COURT DOCUMENTS by defendant Grace Transport, Inc.; (Groustra, Timothy) Modified text on 11/6/2023 (mlc)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Stipulation Mon 11/06 11:58 AM
STATE COURT DOCUMENTS by defendant Grace Transport, Inc. (Groustra, Timothy) Modified text on 11/6/2023 (mlc)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 11/06 11:57 AM
STATE COURT DOCUMENTS by defendant Grace Transport, Inc. (Groustra, Timothy) Modified text on 11/6/2023 (mlc)
Related: [-]
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint (Petition for Removal) Mon 11/06 11:53 AM
ANSWER to complaint1 with affirmative defenses and jury demand by Grace Transport, Inc. (Groustra, Timothy)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice (Other) Mon 11/06 11:51 AM
NOTICE by defendant Grace Transport, Inc. (Groustra, Timothy)
Related: [-]
notice Attorney Appearance Mon 11/06 11:54 AM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Timothy S. Groustra on behalf of defendant Grace Transport, Inc. (Groustra, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 27, 2023
8 8 service Certificate of Service Fri 10/27 1:34 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant Grace Transport, Inc. re Notice of Removal1 to the Clerk of Court for Ionia County Circuit Court (Groustra, Timothy) Modified text on 10/27/2023 (mlc)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Certificate of Service Fri 10/27 1:33 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant Grace Transport, Inc. re Notice of Removal1 to Attorneys for Plaintiff (Groustra, Timothy) Modified text on 10/27/2023 (mlc)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 23, 2023
utility Copies Mailed Mon 10/23 11:34 AM
Copy of Order6 sent via U.S. Mail to Barry J. Goodman (mlc)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 20, 2023
6 6 1 pgs order Order Fri 10/20 2:28 PM
ORDER Requiring Removing Defendants to File Copies of all Records and Proceedings of the State court by 11/3/2023; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (bgs)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
5 5 misc Attorney Admission Letter Wed 10/11 3:02 PM
ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER sent to attorney Barry J. Goodman; attorney admission deadline set for 11/8/2023; (mlc)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Notice Regarding Assignment of Case Wed 10/11 2:43 PM
NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Hala Y. Jarbou (mlc)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Receipt of Case Notice Wed 10/11 2:39 PM
(DISREGARD) NOTICE of receipt of case (mlc) Modified text on 10/11/2023 (mlc)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 10/11 1:35 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Grace Transport, Inc. (Groustra, Timothy)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Wed 10/11 1:28 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ionia County Circuit Court case number 23-35942 NI filed by Grace Transport, Inc. (Groustra, Timothy) Modified on text 10/11/2023 (mlc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit A, Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit B, Dismissal Order; Progressive MI Insurance Company,
Att: 4 Exhibit C, Notice of Filing Notice of Removal
misc Filing Fee (Civil Case) - Credit Card Payment Wed 10/11 1:31 PM
FILING FEE PAID re1 by defendant Grace Transport, Inc. in the amount of $402, receipt number AMIWDC-7185831 (Groustra, Timothy)
Related: [-]
utility Error Correction Wed 10/11 2:45 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) NOTICE that Receipt of Case Notice3 was filed in error and should be disregarded (mlc)
Related: [-]
utility Copies Mailed Wed 10/11 2:50 PM
Copy of Notice Regarding Assignment of Case4 sent via U.S. Mail to Barry J. Goodman (mlc)
Related: [-]