Cuyahoga County v. Eli Lilly and Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:23-md-03080
Lead case: 2:23-md-03080
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Brian R Martinotti |
Referred: | Rukhsanah L Singh |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-21082 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Oct 11, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Ohio Northern, 1:23-cv-01740 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 08, 2024 4:32 AM EDT |
Defendant
EXPRESS SCRIPTS ADMINISTRATORS LLC.
|
|
Defendant
UnitedHealth Group, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. L.L.C.
|
|
Defendant
Optumrx Inc.
|
|
Defendant
OptumInsight Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Optum Inc.
|
|
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK INC.
|
|
Defendant
MEDCO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.
|
|
Defendant
Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Express Scripts Inc.
1 Express Way
St. Louis, MO 63121 |
|
Defendant
EVERNORTH HEALTH INC.
|
|
Defendant
ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
|
|
Defendant
CVS PHARMACY INC.
|
|
Defendant
CVS HEALTH CORPORATION
|
|
Defendant
CAREMARK RX L.L.C.
|
|
Defendant
CAREMARK PCS HEALTH, LLC
|
|
Defendant
CAREMARK L.L.C.
|
|
In Re
INSULIN PRICING LITIGATION
|
|
Plaintiff
Cuyahoga County
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Thursday, January 02, 2025 | ||
26 | 26
![]() Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney John J. Spellacy terminated. (CHAMBERS REICHARD, JOYCE) |
|
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
![]() AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by Cuyahoga County.(CHAMBERS REICHARD, JOYCE) |
|
Wednesday, October 11, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
![]() Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Ohio Northern; Case Number 1:23-cv-01740. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
23 | 23
![]() Conditional Transfer Order (CTO 3) by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. In re: MDL No. 3080 Insulin Pricing Litigation. Case transferred to District of New Jersey and assigned to the Honorable Brian R. Martinotti. (M,CE) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Wed 10/11 3:24 PM
Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh added. (krg, ) |
||
mdl
MDL Direct File
Wed 10/11 3:25 PM
Member Case Direct File on 10/11/2023, for MDL 3080 INSULIN PRICING LITIGATION. (krg) |
||
order
Case Management Order
Wed 10/11 3:26 PM
This case is part of MDL 3080. Parties are expected to review and abide by all prior orders entered in this MDL, which can be found[LINK:here] . (krg, ) |
||
Friday, September 22, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
![]() |
|
21 | 21
![]() |
|
20 | 20
![]() |
|
19 | 19
![]() |
|
18 | 18
![]() |
|
17 | 17
![]() |
|
16 | 16
![]() |
|
15 | 15
![]() |
|
14 | 14
![]() |
|
13 | 13
![]() |
|
12 | 12
![]() |
|
11 | 11
![]() |
|
10 | 10
![]() |
|
9 | 9
![]() |
|
8 | 8
![]() |
|
7 | 7
![]() |
|
6 | 6
![]() |
|
5 | 5
![]() |
|
Wednesday, September 06, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
3 | 3
![]() |
|
2 | 2
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan assigned to case. (F,AW) | ||
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (F,AW) |