New York Southern District Court
Judge:John G Koeltl
Case #: 1:23-cv-08938
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1401(b)(2) E.R.I.S.A.: Resolution of Disputes - Appeal of Arbitration Award
Case Filed:Oct 11, 2023
Terminated:Apr 17, 2024
Last checked: Monday Apr 08, 2024 4:37 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
ConvergeOne Dedicated Services, LLC
Represented By
Jacob Moshe Roth
Jones Day
contact info
David J. Feder
Jones Day
contact info
Counter Defendant
Pension, Hospitalization & Benefit Plan of the Electrical Industry
Represented By
Charles R. Virginia
Virginia & Ambinder, LLP
contact info
James Emmet Murphy
Virginia & Ambinder, LLP
contact info
Defendant
ConvergeOne Dedicated Services, LLC
Represented By
Jacob Moshe Roth
Jones Day
contact info
David J. Feder
Jones Day
contact info
Plaintiff
Pension, Hospitalization & Benefit Plan of the Electrical Industry
158-11 Harry Van Arsdale Jr. Avenue
Flushing, NY 11365
Represented By
Charles R. Virginia
Virginia & Ambinder, LLP
contact info
James Emmet Murphy
Virginia & Ambinder, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
34 34 order Judgment - Clerk Wed 04/17 9:57 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT re:33 Memorandum & Opinion in favor of ConvergeOne Dedicated Services, LLC against Pension, Hospitalization & Benefit Plan of the Electrical Industry. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Memorandum Opinion and Order dated April 16, 2024, ConvergeOne's motion for a judgment on the pleadings confirming the arbitration award, ECF No. 22, is granted and the cross motion by the Pension Plan to vacate the arbitrator's decision, ECF No. 24, is denied. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 4/17/2024) (tp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appeal Package
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
33 33 15 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion Wed 04/17 9:31 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re:22 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . filed by ConvergeOne Dedicated Services, LLC,24 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . filed by Pension, Hospitalization & Benefit Plan of the Electrical Industry. The Court has considered all the arguments of the parties. To the extent not specifically addressed above, the arguments are either moot or without merit. For the foregoing reasons, ConvergeOne's motion for a judgment on the pleadings confirming the arbitration award, ECF No. 22, is granted and the cross motion by the Penson Plan to vacate the arbitrator's decision, ECF No. 24, is denied. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment confirming the arbitrator's award. The Clerk is also directed to close all open motions in this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 4/16/2024) (tg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
minutes Telephone Conference Wed 03/27 12:17 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Telephone Conference held on 3/26/2024. (Fletcher, Donnie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
32 32 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 03/13 3:21 PM
ORDER: The parties are directed to appear for a telephone conference on March 26, 2024, at 2:30 p.m. Dial-in: 888-363-4749, with access code 8140049. SO ORDERED. ( Telephone Conference set for 3/26/2024 at 02:30 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl.) (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 3/13/2024) (tg)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2024
31 31 1 pgs order Order Mon 01/22 12:56 PM
ORDER The defendant is directed to provide the Court with paper courtesy copies of all papers filed in connection with the fully briefed motion for judgment on the pleadings. ECF No. 22. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 1/22/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
30 30 respm Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Fri 01/19 9:36 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:24 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . . Document filed by Pension, Hospitalization & Benefit Plan of the Electrical Industry..(Murphy, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2024
29 29 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 01/04 1:11 PM
ORDER granting28 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re28 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to19 Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference,24 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . Request for a two-week extension of time to file Plaintiff's reply. APPLICATION GRANTED SO ORDERED. Replies due by 1/19/2024.. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 1/4/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
28 28 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 01/03 4:26 PM
CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to19 Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference,24 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . Request for a two-week extension of time to file Plaintiff's reply to its cross-motion for judgment on the pleadings addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from James E. Murphy, Esq. dated January 3, 2024. Document filed by Pension, Hospitalization & Benefit Plan of the Electrical Industry..(Murphy, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 22, 2023
27 27 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 12/22 12:52 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re:24 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . . Document filed by ConvergeOne Dedicated Services, LLC..(Roth, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
26 26 respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Mon 12/04 11:43 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:24 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . and in opposition to Defendants' motion . Document filed by Pension, Hospitalization & Benefit Plan of the Electrical Industry..(Murphy, James)
Related: [-]
25 25 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Mon 12/04 11:41 PM
DECLARATION of James Emmet Murphy in Support re:24 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings .. Document filed by Pension, Hospitalization & Benefit Plan of the Electrical Industry..(Murphy, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Embassy Industries Decision,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Sotheby's Decision,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Structure Tone Decision,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - RAB Lighting Decision,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Widoff's Modern Bakery Decision,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - PBGC Amicus Brief,
Att: 7 Exhibit G - Proposed 29 C.F.R. § 4213
24 24 motion Judgment on the Pleadings Mon 12/04 11:29 PM
MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . Document filed by Pension, Hospitalization & Benefit Plan of the Electrical Industry..(Murphy, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
23 23 respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Mon 11/13 4:44 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:22 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . . Document filed by ConvergeOne Dedicated Services, LLC..(Roth, Jacob)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Judgment on the Pleadings Mon 11/13 4:42 PM
MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . Document filed by ConvergeOne Dedicated Services, LLC. Responses due by 12/4/2023.(Roth, Jacob)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 11/13 4:25 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Pension, Hospitalization & Benefit Plan of the Electrical Industry..(Murphy, James)
Related: [-]
20 20 answer Answer to Counterclaim Mon 11/13 4:22 PM
ANSWER to13 Counterclaim. Document filed by Pension, Hospitalization & Benefit Plan of the Electrical Industry..(Murphy, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 03, 2023
19 19 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Fri 11/03 4:25 PM
ORDER: granting17 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 11/03/2023) (ama)
Related: [-]
18 18 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 11/03 4:23 PM
ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting16 Motion for David J. Feder to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 11/03/2023) (ama)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 11/03 4:28 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Cross Motions due by 12/4/2023. Motions due by 11/13/2023. Responses due by 12/22/2023 Replies due by 1/5/2024. (ama)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 02, 2023
17 17 motion Adjourn Conference Thu 11/02 5:08 PM
LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference and Enter Proposed Briefing Schedule addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Yaakov M. Roth dated November 2, 2023. Document filed by ConvergeOne Dedicated Services, LLC..(Roth, Jacob)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 11/02 11:42 AM
MOTION for David J. Feder to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28514279. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by ConvergeOne Dedicated Services, LLC..(Feder, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Pro Hac Vice Motion,
Att: 2 Affidavit Local Rule 1.3 Affidavit,
Att: 3 Exhibit California State Bar Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 4 Exhibit California Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 5 Exhibit Washington, D.C. Bar Certificate of Good Standing
misc Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion Thu 11/02 2:36 PM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 16 MOTION for David J. Feder to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28514279. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (va)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
15 15 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 10/25 10:40 AM
AMENDED RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent ConvergeOne Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent CVC Capital Partners Fund for ConvergeOne Dedicated Services, LLC, ConvergeOne Dedicated Services, LLC. Document filed by ConvergeOne Dedicated Services, LLC..(Roth, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 24, 2023
14 14 order Order Tue 10/24 3:06 PM
ORDER: The parties are directed to file a Rule 26(f) report by November 8, 2023. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 10/24/2023) (ks)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 23, 2023
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Mon 10/23 4:41 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,., COUNTERCLAIM against Pension, Hospitalization & Benefit Plan of the Electrical Industry. Document filed by ConvergeOne Dedicated Services, LLC..(Roth, Jacob)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 10/23 4:37 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent ConvergeOne Systems Integration, Inc., Corporate Parent ConvergeOne, Inc. for ConvergeOne Dedicated Services, LLC. Document filed by ConvergeOne Dedicated Services, LLC..(Roth, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 20, 2023
11 11 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 10/20 3:16 PM
ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting10 Motion for Jacob ("Yaakov") M. Roth to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 10/20/2023) (ks)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2023
10 10 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 10/19 2:56 PM
MOTION for Jacob ("Yaakov") M. Roth to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by ConvergeOne Dedicated Services, LLC..(Roth, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Local Rule 1.3 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Exhibit Washington D.C. Certificate of Good Standing
9 9 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 10/19 10:38 AM
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Jacob ("Yaakov") M. Roth to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28447542. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by ConvergeOne Dedicated Services, LLC..(Roth, Jacob) Modified on 10/19/2023 (sgz)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Pro Hac Vice Motion,
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing
misc Notice Regarding Deficient Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 10/19 11:52 AM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. 9 MOTION for Jacob ("Yaakov") M. Roth to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28447542. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Notarized Affidavit;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (sgz)
Related: [-]
misc Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion Thu 10/19 4:54 PM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 10 MOTION for Jacob ("Yaakov") M. Roth to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
8 8 service Certificate of Service Other Wed 10/18 2:14 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Minute Entry issued by Judge Koeltl on October 17, 2023 served on counsel for Defendant, ConvergeOne Dedicated Services, LLC on October 18, 2023. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Pension, Hospitalization & Benefit Plan of the Electrical Industry..(Murphy, James)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 10/18 1:43 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. ConvergeOne Dedicated Services, LLC waiver sent on 10/13/2023, answer due 12/12/2023. Document filed by Pension, Hospitalization & Benefit Plan of the Electrical Industry..(Murphy, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
minutes ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 10/17 2:14 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Pretrial Conference set for 12/19/2023 at 12:00 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl. Dial-in: 888 363-4749, with access code 8140049. (Fletcher, Donnie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
6 6 service Summons Issued Thu 10/12 11:41 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to ConvergeOne Dedicated Services, LLC. (vf)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Thu 10/12 11:34 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney James Emmet Murphy. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Queens. (vf)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Thu 10/12 11:36 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Thu 10/12 11:37 AM
Magistrate Judge Jennifer Willis is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Thu 10/12 11:37 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/11 4:28 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Charles R. Virginia on behalf of Pension, Hospitalization & Benefit Plan of the Electrical Industry..(Virginia, Charles)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 10/11 4:26 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Pension, Hospitalization & Benefit Plan of the Electrical Industry..(Murphy, James)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 10/11 4:25 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ConvergeOne Dedicated Services, LLC, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Pension, Hospitalization & Benefit Plan of the Electrical Industry..(Murphy, James)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 10/11 4:23 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Murphy, James)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 10/11 4:20 PM
COMPLAINT against ConvergeOne Dedicated Services, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28411177)Document filed by Pension, Hospitalization & Benefit Plan of the Electrical Industry..(Murphy, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Arbitration Award