Louisiana Western District Court
Judge:David C Joseph
Referred: David J Ayo
Case #: 6:23-cv-01443
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12181 Americans with Disabilities Act - Public Accommodations
Case Filed:Oct 11, 2023
Terminated:Dec 07, 2023
Last checked: Monday Apr 08, 2024 3:19 AM CDT
Defendant
A D T Pizza L L C
Represented By
Hunter Jacob Schoen
Adams & Reese (no)
contact info
Lauren Lopresto Tafaro
Adams & Reese (no)
contact info
Plaintiff
Annette Tyler
Represented By
Andrew David Bizer
Bizer & Dereus
contact info
Garret Scott DeReus
Bizer & Dereus
contact info
Annika K Mengisen
Bizer & Dereus
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss/Joint or Voluntary Wed 01/03 11:23 AM
ORDER: Granting8 Joint Motion to Dismiss. IT IS ORDERED that this lawsuit and all claims asserted herein by Plaintiff, Annette Tyler against Defendants, ADT Pizza, LLC are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, with each party to bear their own attorney's fees and court costs. Signed by Judge David C Joseph on 1/3/2024. (crt,LaCombe, L)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 29, 2023
8 8 motion Dismiss/Joint or Voluntary Fri 12/29 12:22 PM
JOINT MOTION to Dismiss Defendant with Prejudice by A D T Pizza L L C, Annette Tyler. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/29/2023.(aty,Schoen, Hunter) Modified filers on 12/29/2023 (Chavis, J)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed order
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 12/06 8:55 AM
ORDER: Granting6 Motion/Request for 60-Day Dismissal Order. IT IS ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED, without prejudice to the right, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days of the signing of this Order, to reopen the action if settlement is not consummated. The Clerk is now requested to close this case. Signed by Judge David C Joseph on 12/6/2023. (crt,LaCombe, L)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
6 6 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 12/05 10:46 AM
MOTION for 60 Order of Dismissal filed entitled NOTICE of Settlement and Request for 60-Day Dismissal Order by Annette Tyler(aty,Bizer, Andrew) Modified event and docket text on 12/5/2023 (Bunting, M)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed order
utility Motions Transferred Tue 12/05 11:03 AM
Motions Transferred regarding6 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. Motions referred to Judge David C Joseph. (crt,Bunting, M)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
5 5 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 11/08 11:25 AM
ORDER granting4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint. A D T Pizza L L C answer due 11/27/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J Ayo on 11/8/2023. (crt,Chicola, C)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 06, 2023
4 4 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 11/06 2:50 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, with consent by A D T Pizza L L C. Motions referred to David J Ayo. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/6/2023.(Attorney Hunter Jacob Schoen added to party A D T Pizza L L C(pty:dft))(aty,Schoen, Hunter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed order
Monday, October 30, 2023
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 10/30 2:26 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Annette Tyler. A D T Pizza L L C served on 10/16/2023, answer due 11/6/2023. (aty,Bizer, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
2 2 service Summons Issued - All (Form Included) Thu 10/12 10:40 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to A D T Pizza L L C. (crt,Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 10/11 4:53 PM
COMPLAINT against ADT PIZZA, LLC (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5721968) filed by Annette Tyler.(Attorney Andrew David Bizer added to party Annette Tyler(pty:pla))(aty,Bizer, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil cover sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed summons/writ
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 10/12 10:39 AM
CASE Assigned to Judge David C Joseph and Magistrate Judge David J Ayo. (crt,Thomas, T)
Related: [-]