Oklahoma Western District Court
Judge:David L Russell
Case #: 5:23-cv-00910
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Oct 11, 2023
Terminated:Feb 27, 2024
Last checked: Monday Apr 08, 2024 3:23 AM CDT
Defendant
Bull City Financial Solutions Inc
Represented By
Cooper M Walker
Frost Echols LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Lawauna Brown
Represented By
Nkem Amadi House, Sr
House Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
16 16 order Administrative Closing Order Tue 02/27 10:10 AM
ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSING ORDER : This action is administratively terminated without prejudice to the rights of the parties to reopen for entry of any stipulation or order. If not reopened within 30 days to obtain final determination, action is deemed dismissed. Signed by Judge David L. Russell on 02/27/2024. (km)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Settlement Tue 02/27 9:05 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by Lawauna Brown (House, Nkem)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
14 14 misc Docket Thu 02/01 1:40 PM
STATUS/SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET : Scheduling Conference set for 3/5/2024 at 09:30 AM telephonically before Judge David L. Russell. Status Report due by 2/26/2024. Participation in this conference call by at least one attorney of record for each party is mandatory. Failure to appear may result in sanctions. (km)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
13 13 5 pgs order Order on Motion to Strike Wed 01/03 11:54 AM
ORDER :6 Plaintiff's First Motion to Strike is DENIED as moot and12 Plaintiff's Second Motion to Strike is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Signed by Judge David L. Russell on 01/03/2024. (km)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
12 12 motion Strike Wed 12/06 3:19 PM
SECOND MOTION to Strike by Lawauna Brown. (House, Nkem)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 01, 2023
11 11 respm Response to Motion Fri 12/01 3:39 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re6 MOTION to Strike filed by Bull City Financial Solutions Inc. (Walker, Cooper)
Related: [-]
10 10 respoth Amended Answer to Complaint Fri 12/01 3:30 PM
AMENDED ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Bull City Financial Solutions Inc. (Walker, Cooper)
Related: [-]
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Fri 12/01 11:58 AM
ORDER granting8 Motion to Waive Local Counsel Requirement. Defendant Bull City Financial, Inc. is permitted to waive the local counsel requirement in this matter. Signed by Judge David L. Russell on 12/01/2023. (km)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 30, 2023
8 8 motion Leave Thu 11/30 3:34 PM
MOTION for Leave to Waive Local Counsel Requirement by Bull City Financial Solutions Inc. (Walker, Cooper)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
7 7 1 pgs order Order Mon 11/13 11:19 AM
ORDER : It appears from the record that Bull City is represented by Cooper M. Walker, whose office is located in Dallas, Texas. Mr. Walker is granted until November 30, 2023, to show association with local counsel as required by LCvR83.3(a) or to seek relief from the rule pursuant to subsection (c). Signed by Judge David L. Russell on 11/13/2023. (km)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 10, 2023
6 6 motion Strike Fri 11/10 10:41 AM
MOTION to Strike by Lawauna Brown. (House, Nkem)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 09, 2023
5 5 misc Disclosure Statement - Corporate Thu 11/09 4:49 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Bull City Financial Solutions Inc . (Walker, Cooper)
Related: [-]
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer Thu 11/09 4:47 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Bull City Financial Solutions Inc.(Walker, Cooper)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
3 3 notice Entry of Appearance Thu 10/12 9:36 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by Nkem Amadi House, Sr on behalf of Lawauna Brown (House, Nkem)
Related: [-]
misc Payment for a Civil Case Thu 10/12 9:26 AM
PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-4270500. (House, Nkem)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 10/11 5:21 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Bull City Financial Solutions Inc. (ekw)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 10/11 5:20 PM
COMPLAINT against Bull City Financial Solutions Inc filed by Lawauna Brown.(ekw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet