Utah District Court
Judge:David Nuffer
Referred: Paul Kohler
Case #: 4:23-cv-00089
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause21:331 Federal Food, Drug & Cosmetic Act - Prohibited Acts
Case Filed:Oct 11, 2023
Terminated:Nov 15, 2023
Last checked: Monday Apr 08, 2024 2:42 AM MDT
Defendant
Evig
Represented By
Kurt Harris
Harris Law Office
contact info
William R. Levi
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Scott A. Kaplan
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Rebecca K. Wood
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Defendant
Douglas Lex Howard
Represented By
Kurt Harris
Harris Law Office
contact info
William R. Levi
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Scott A. Kaplan
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Rebecca K. Wood
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Sarah Williams
Doj-Civ
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Friday, December 22, 2023
19 19 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel Fri 12/22 10:09 AM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL of Scott A. Kaplan filed by Scott A. Kaplan on behalf of Evig, Douglas Lex Howard (Kaplan, Scott )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
18 18 15 pgs order Permanent Injunction ~Util - Terminate Motions Wed 11/15 3:20 PM
CONSENT DECREE FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION, granting 3 Joint Motion for Entry of Judgment. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 11/15/23 (alt)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Wed 11/15 3:34 PM
Civil Case Terminated per18 Permanent Injunction - CASE CLOSED. Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler no longer assigned to case (alt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Wed 11/08 3:15 PM
ORDER granting 16 Motion to Stay Preparation of a Case Schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 11/8/23 (alt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
16 16 motion Stay Tue 11/07 4:14 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay Preparation of a Case Schedule filed by Defendants Evig, Douglas Lex Howard. Motions referred to Paul Kohler.(Levi, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, October 20, 2023
order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Fri 10/20 9:17 AM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate Judge to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 10/20/2023. (pjd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
10 10 4 pgs order Order to Propose Schedule Wed 10/18 11:42 AM
ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - See order for details. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 10/17/23 (alt)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Deficiency Wed 10/18 12:25 PM
NOTICE OF ERRORS re5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kurt Harris,6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of William Levi,7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Scott Kaplan. The documents were filed with only one party selected as the filer which meant filing atty was only added as counsel for the selected party. Also, the first motion entry identifies the filing atty as the pro hac atty. The clerk will correct the name of the pro hac atty in the first entry and correct all entries so that they show that they are filed by both dft parties and add local counsel as representing the second dft party as well. (alt)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Wed 10/18 12:48 PM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting 5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Rebecca K. Wood for Evig, Douglas Lex Howard. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.A Pro Hac Vice Attorney who fails to register for CM/ECF access will not receive notifications of electronic filings. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. So ordered by Judge David Nuffer on 10/18/23 (docket text only - no attached document) (alt)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Wed 10/18 1:10 PM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting 6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney William R. Levi for Evig, Douglas Lex Howard. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.A Pro Hac Vice Attorney who fails to register for CM/ECF access will not receive notifications of electronic filings. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. So ordered by Judge David Nuffer on 10/18/23 (docket text only - no attached document) (alt)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Wed 10/18 1:14 PM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting 7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Scott A. Kaplan for Evig, Douglas Lex Howard. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.A Pro Hac Vice Attorney who fails to register for CM/ECF access will not receive notifications of electronic filings. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. So ordered by Judge David Nuffer on 10/18/23 (docket text only - no attached document) (alt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
8 8 notice Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Tue 10/17 1:33 PM
NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY TO PRESIDE OVER CASE- Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, and DUCivR 72-4, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return the form. To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail at the address on the form. Please do not efile the Consent Form in the case. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Evig. Form due by 11/7/2023. (alf)
Related: [-]
notice Notice From the Court Tue 10/17 2:25 PM
NOTICE FROM THE COURT This case is assigned to the Southern Region of the Central Division of the District of Utah. More information is on the court's[LINK:Southern Region web page. Related: [-]
Saturday, October 14, 2023
7 7 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry) Sat 10/14 5:09 PM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Scott Kaplan , Registration fee $ 50, receipt number AUTDC-4841063, Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at[LINK:https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html] . Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at[LINK:https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing] . filed by Defendant Evig.(Harris, Kurt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Application,
Att: 2 Exhibit Proposed Order
6 6 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry) Sat 10/14 4:51 PM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of William Levi , Registration fee $ 50, receipt number AUTDC-4841062, Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at[LINK:https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html] . Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at[LINK:https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing] . filed by Defendant Evig.(Harris, Kurt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Application,
Att: 2 Exhibit Proposed Order
5 5 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry) Sat 10/14 4:22 PM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kurt Harris , Registration fee $ 50, receipt number AUTDC-4841060, Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at[LINK:https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html] . Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at[LINK:https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing] . filed by Defendant Evig. Attorney Kurt Harris added to party Evig (pty:dft)(Harris, Kurt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Pro Hac Vice Application,
Att: 2 Exhibit Proposed Order
Thursday, October 12, 2023
4 4 notice Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Thu 10/12 8:47 AM
NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY TO PRESIDE OVER CASE- Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, and DUCivR 72-4, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return the form. To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail at the address on the form. Please do not efile the Consent Form in the case. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff United States of America. (Notice generated by Clerk's office) Form due by 11/2/2023. (kec)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Entry of Judgment Thu 10/12 8:45 AM
Joint MOTION for Entry of Judgment Consent Decree for Permanent Injunction filed by Plaintiff United States of America.(Williams, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
2 2 cmp Complaint (Atty) Wed 10/11 4:46 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants No Fee Required - US Government filed by United States of America. (Williams, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
1 1 misc Remark - New Case Wed 10/11 2:59 PM
Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge David Nuffer. Plaintiff United States of America is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) by the end of the business day. Filing Fee waived (Filing on Behalf of the United States) NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts[LINK:PDF version] and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (sg)
Related: [-]