Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:Marilyn J Horan
Case #: 2:23-cv-01752
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Oct 09, 2023
Terminated:Dec 18, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Apr 06, 2024 5:53 AM EDT
Defendant
TRIBAR MANUFACTURING, LLC.
Plaintiff
IPEG, INC.
Represented By
Gregory W. Hauswirth
Carothers & Hauswirth LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Monday, December 18, 2023
7 7 order Order Mon 12/18 12:35 PM
TEXT ORDER Following review of the parties' Notice of Settlement6 , it is hereby ordered that on or before January 18, 2024, the parties shall file a stipulation of dismissal or a joint status report indicating a timeline for the filing of the same. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 12/18/2023. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bjl)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 15, 2023
6 6 notice Notice of Settlement Fri 12/15 6:47 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by IPEG, INC. (Hauswirth, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2023
5 5 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Fri 12/08 3:33 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND NOW, this 8th day of December 2023, the Complaint in the above-captioned case was filed on October 9, 2023. (ECF No.1 ). On October 26, 2023, a Return of Service was filed on the docket indicating the Complaint was served on October 13, 2023. (ECF No.4 ). The Defendant's Answer was due on November 2, 2023. As of the date of this order, the docket does not reflect that Defendant has filed an Answer and no further action has been taken in the case. Therefore, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall show cause by December 15, 2023, why this case should not be dismissed for Plaintiff's failure to prosecute. IT IS FUTHER ORDERED that failure to file a response will be construed by the Court as Plaintiffs consent to the dismissal of the Complaint for failure to prosecute. Show Cause Response due by 12/15/2023. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 12/8/2023. (bjl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 26, 2023
4 4 service Summons/Return of Service Returned Executed Thu 10/26 2:23 PM
SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by IPEG, INC.. TRIBAR MANUFACTURING, LLC. served on 10/12/2023, answer due 11/2/2023. (Hauswirth, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 16, 2023
3 3 order Order Mon 10/16 3:53 PM
STANDING ORDER AND PROCEDURES ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE available[LINK:Here] . Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 10/16/2023. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bjl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 10/11 9:52 AM
Summons Issued as to TRIBAR MANUFACTURING, LLC. (sdp)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 09, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint (for Clerk of Court personnel only) Wed 10/11 9:50 AM
COMPLAINT against TRIBAR MANUFACTURING, LLC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-7919834), filed by IPEG, INC.. (sdp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet