Idaho District Court
Judge:Amanda K Brailsford
Case #: 4:23-cv-00439
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Case Filed:Oct 09, 2023
Case in other court:Bonneville County District Court, CV10-23-02908
Last checked: Saturday Apr 06, 2024 3:17 AM MDT
Defendant
Portocale Projects, Inc.
Represented By
Jed W Manwaring
Evans Keane
contact info
Aaron Robert Bell
Evans Keane LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Joy Ward
Represented By
Jason Wood
Wood Law Group, PC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Amazon.Com Services, LLC
Terminated: 02/22/2024
Represented By
Jed W Manwaring
Evans Keane
contact info
Aaron Robert Bell
Evans Keane LLP
contact info
David T Krueck
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Defendant
Amazon.com, Inc.
Terminated: 02/22/2024
Represented By
Jed W Manwaring
Evans Keane
contact info
Aaron Robert Bell
Evans Keane LLP
contact info
Defendant
John Does I-X
Terminated: 02/22/2024


Docket last updated: 7 minutes ago
Friday, November 22, 2024
24 24 order Scheduling Order Fri 11/22 1:08 PM
SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER TRACK: (Standard) - All dispositive motions and motions for punitive damages must be filed by August 29, 2025. Motions to amend the pleadings, except for allegations of punitive damages, and motions to join parties must be filed on or before January 24, 2025. ADR must be held by May 23, 2025. All fact discovery must be completed by July 30, 2025. Signed by Judge Amanda K Brailsford. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
23 23 misc Amended Document (NOT Motion) Thu 11/14 3:30 PM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by Portocale Projects, Inc.. Amendment to21 MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order and Re-Set Scheduling Deadlines Second Amended Joint Scheduling Plan . (Manwaring, Jed)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
22 22 misc Joinder Tue 11/05 10:23 AM
JOINDER by Plaintiff Joy Ward joining21 MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order and Re-Set Scheduling Deadlines . (Wood, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
21 21 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 10/23 4:59 PM
MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order and Re-Set Scheduling Deadlines Jed W Manwaring appearing for Defendant Portocale Projects, Inc.. Responses due by 11/13/2024(Manwaring, Jed)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Motion to Amend Scheduling Order
20 20 notice Notice of Substitution Wed 10/23 4:16 PM
NOTICE of Substitution - Attorney Jed W. Manwaring for Portocale Projects, Inc. added. by Attorney (Manwaring, Jed)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
19 19 notice Notice of Substitution Fri 10/18 4:10 PM
NOTICE of Substitution - Attorney Jed W. Manwaring for Portocale Projects, Inc. added. Attorney Aaron Robert Bell and Jed W Manwaring terminated. Request to Leave Noticing ON for this case by Attorney (Manwaring, Jed)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
18 18 order Scheduling Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Wed 04/10 1:12 PM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER TRACK: (Standard) - The telephonic scheduling conference set for April 17, 2024, is VACATED. All dispositive motions and motions for punitive damages, must be filed by September 20, 2024. Motions to amend the pleadings, except for allegations of punitive damages, and motions to join parties must be filed on or before March 20, 2024. ADR must be held by September 20, 2024. All fact discovery must be completed by November 1, 2024. Signed by Judge Amanda K Brailsford. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
17 17 misc Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form Tue 04/09 11:42 AM
SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by Portocale Projects, Inc.. (Manwaring, Jed)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Discovery Plan Tue 04/09 11:40 AM
DISCOVERY PLAN by Portocale Projects, Inc. . (Manwaring, Jed)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
15 15 order Litigation Order Wed 03/20 11:40 AM
LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 4/17/2024 02:15 PM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Chambers before Judge Amanda K Brailsford. On or before April 10, 2024, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Amanda K Brailsford. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (hs)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
14 14 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 03/08 2:10 PM
ANSWER to13 Amended Complaint by Portocale Projects, Inc..(Manwaring, Jed)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
13 13 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 02/21 12:50 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Portocale Projects, Inc., dba Medokare, filed by Joy Ward.(Wood, Jason)
Related: [-]
12 12 1 pgs order Order Wed 02/21 9:43 AM
ORDER GRANTING LEAVE FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT - Signed by Judge Amanda K Brailsford. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
11 11 misc Stipulation Fri 02/16 1:55 PM
STIPULATION for Leave for Plaintiff to File First Amended Complaint by Amazon.Com Services, LLC, Amazon.com, Inc..(Manwaring, Jed)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 proposed First Amended Complaint
Thursday, December 14, 2023
10 10 order Scheduling Order Thu 12/14 2:49 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER TRACK: (Standard) - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following deadlines and procedures will govern this litigation: Dispositive Motion Deadline: due by 9/20/2024. Amendment of Pleadings and Joinder of Parties: due by 3/20/2024. Alternative Dispute Resolution: Mediation shall take place by 9/20/2024. Completion of Fact Discovery: due by 11/1/2024. Signed by Judge Amanda K Brailsford. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (hs)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Discovery Plan Thu 12/14 10:08 AM
DISCOVERY PLAN by Amazon.Com Services, LLC, Amazon.com, Inc. Joint . (Manwaring, Jed)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form Thu 12/14 10:07 AM
SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by Amazon.Com Services, LLC, Amazon.com, Inc.. (Manwaring, Jed)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
7 7 notice Notice of Substitution Wed 11/29 10:21 AM
NOTICE of Substitution - Attorney Jed W Manwaring,Aaron Robert Bell for Amazon.Com Services, LLC,Jed W Manwaring,Aaron Robert Bell for Amazon.com, Inc. added. Attorney David T Krueck terminated. by Attorney (Manwaring, Jed)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
6 6 order Order Reassigning Case Tue 11/28 11:22 AM
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER REASSIGNING CASE AND NOTICE OF CASE NUMBER CHANGE. Due to the appointment of United States District Judge Amanda K. Brailsford, this case is hereby reassigned to United States District Judge Amanda K. Brailsford. Judge David C. Nye is no longer assigned to case. Please use case number 4:23-cv-00439-AKB on all future pleadings. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (km)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
5 5 order Litigation Order Tue 11/07 4:45 PM
LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - On or before December 13, 2023, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 12/20/2023 10:00 AM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Chambers before Judge David C. Nye. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
notice Notice of Case Number Change Wed 10/18 10:58 AM
DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change, Case reassigned to Judge David C. Nye for all further proceedings. US Magistrate Judge Raymond Edward Patricco, Jr no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 4:23-cv-439-DCN (hs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
4 4 misc Request for Reassignment to a District Judge Wed 10/18 10:56 AM
A REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT TO A DISTRICT JUDGE HAS BEEN FILED IN THIS CASE (hs)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 16, 2023
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 10/16 11:56 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by Amazon.Com Services, LLC, Amazon.com, Inc..(Krueck, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
2 2 notice Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline Wed 10/11 8:35 AM
NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Amazon.Com Services, LLC, Amazon.com, Inc., Joy Ward re1 Notice of Removal, Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 12/11/2023. (hs)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation - Division Change Wed 10/11 8:24 AM
Notice of Case Number Change: Case was opened with incorrect division. Corrected to Eastern Division. Please use case number 4:23-cv-439-REP for all future filings. (hs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Amazon.Com Services, LLC, Amazon.com, Inc. from Seventh Judicial District, Bonneville County, case number CV10 23-2908 (Filing fee $402 receipt numberAIDDC-2640793.), filed by Amazon.Com Services, LLC, Amazon.com, Inc..(Krueck, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal - Complaint & Demand for Jury Trial,
Att: 2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal - State Court Docket,
Att: 3 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal - Summons,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement
service Return of Service/Process Assumed Wed 10/11 8:29 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED - Amazon.Com Services, LLC served on 10/10/2023; Amazon.com, Inc. served on 10/10/2023. (service assumed for internal reporting purpose only) (hs)
Related: [-]