Kentucky Western District Court
Case #: 3:23-cr-00112
Case Filed:Oct 11, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Oct 12, 2023 3:19 AM EDT
Defendant
Jairo Jaime Tinajero (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Erwin Roberts
U.S. Attorney'S Office - Louisville
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/12/2025 2:02 PM EST
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
1 1 1 pgs CRIMINAL COMPLAINT signed by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards as to Seal 1 (1). (SRH) [3:23-mj-00656-RSE]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit in Support of Criminal Complaint
2 2 MOTION to Seal Case by USA as to Seal 1. (SRH) [3:23-mj-00656-RSE]
Related: [-]
4 4 Sealed Document . (SRH) [3:23-mj-00656-RSE]
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 05, 2023
5 5 AMENDED CRIMINAL COMPLAINT signed by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards as to Seal 1. (SRH) [3:23-mj-00656-RSE]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit in Support of Criminal Complaint
6 6 Sealed Amended Document . (SRH) [3:23-mj-00656-RSE]
Related: [-]
7 7 MOTION to Unseal Case by USA as to Seal 1. (SRH) [3:23-mj-00656-RSE]
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
Case unsealed as to Seal 1. (SRH) [3:23-mj-00656-RSE]
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 10/4/2023 granting2 Motion to Seal Case as to Seal 1 (1). (SRH) [3:23-mj-00656-RSE]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 10/6/2023 granting7 Motion to Unseal Case as to Jairo Jaime Tinajero (1). cc: Counsel (SRH) [3:23-mj-00656-RSE]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
9 9 4 pgs INDICTMENT as to Jairo Jaime Tinajero (1) counts 1 and 2. (SRH)
Related: [-]
10 10 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson III. (SRH)
Related: [-]
11 11 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Erwin Roberts appearing for USA. (SRH)
Related: [-]
12 12 SEALED UNREDACTED INDICTMENT re9 Indictment. (SRH)
Related: [-]
13 13 Sealed Document . (SRH)
Related: [-]
14 14 Rule 5 Documents Received from Eastern District of Arkansas, Case Number 4:23-mj-206-JJV-1 as to Jairo Jaime Tinajero. (SRH)
Related: [-]