Original Case: 5:22-cv-00186

Sixth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-cv-05890
Typecivil / private / civil rights - title vii
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Case Filed:Oct 11, 2023
Terminated:Oct 11, 2024
Last checked: Monday Oct 14, 2024 4:56 AM CDT
Defendant - Appellee
UNIVERSITY OF KENTUCKY BOARD OF TRUSTEES
Represented By
William Eugene Thro
University of Kentucky
contact info
Bryan Howard Beauman
Sturgill, Turner, Barker & Moloney
contact info
Savannah Grace Baker
Sturgill, Turner, Barker & Moloney
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
LAURIE ANN DEVORE
Represented By
Anthony James Bucher
Gatlin Voelker
contact info

GPO Oct 11 2024
OPINION and JUDGMENT filed : AFFIRMED. Mandate to issue. Decision for publication. Helene N. White, Jane Branstetter Stranch (AUTHORING), and Stephanie Dawkins Davis, Circuit Judges.

Docket last updated: 10/14/2024 4:56 AM CDT
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
The case manager for this case is: Antoinette Macon (ASM)
Related: [-]
TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - transcript is unnecessary for appeal purposes. Filed by Mr. Anthony James Bucher for Ms. Laurie Ann DeVore. Certificate of Service: 10/11/2023. 23-5890 (AJB)
Related: [-]
3 pgs Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Ms. Laurie Ann DeVore. Transcript needed: n. (ASM)
Related: [-]
6 pgs BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 11/20/2023, appellee brief due 12/20/2023. (ASM)
Related: [-]
1 pgs APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Ms. Laurie Ann DeVore by Anthony James Bucher. Certificate of Service: 10/11/2023. 23-5890 (AJB)
Related: [-]
1 pgs CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Anthony James Bucher for Appellant Ms. Laurie Ann DeVore.. Certificate of Service: 10/11/2023. 23-5890 (AJB)
Related: [-]
2 pgs CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Anthony James Bucher for Appellant Ms. Laurie Ann DeVore Certificate of Service: 10/11/2023. 23-5890 (AJB)
Related: [-]