Florida Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Karen K Specie
Case #: 4:23-bk-40398
Case Filed:Oct 12, 2023

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors100-199
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Health Care Business
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Miracle Hill Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc.
1329 Abraham St
Tallahassee, FL 32304-1907
Represented By
Scott A. Stichter
Stichter, Riedel, Blain & Postler, P.A.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
110 E. Park Avenue Suite 128
Tallahassee, FL 32301
Represented By
Conor McLaughlin
Doj-Ust
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 6:08 PM EDT
Monday, April 14, 2025
327 327 misc Certificate of Service/Mailing Mon 04/14 10:20 AM
Certificate of Service/Mailing Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Miracle Hill Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc. [Re:326 Order Fixing Time to Submit Ballots on Plan & Sched Confirmation Hearing]. (Stichter, Scott)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
326 326 1 pgs order Order Fixing Time for Ballots on (Amd) Plan & Sched (Cont) Conf Hrg (PDF / Form) Fri 04/11 8:53 AM
Order Fixing Time for Filing Acceptances or Rejections of Plan and Rescheduling Continued Confirmation Hearing Confirmation hearing to be held on 5/28/2025 at 01:30 PM Central Time at/via Pensacola (Courtroom 1, Winston E. Arnow Fed. Bldg., 100 N. Palafox St.). Parties may appear at the following alternate location: via Zoom (See FLNB Zoom video and telephone instructions at www.flnb.uscourts.gov/zoom ). Last day to Object to Confirmation 5/21/2025. Related [+] SERVICE: Scott Stichter shall serve this document pursuant to the applicable Rules and file a certificate of service within three (3) days. (Weems-Cainion, Janet)
Related: [-] 307 Amended Chapter 11 Plan.
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
325 325 misc Supplement Tue 04/08 3:55 PM
Supplement /Notice of Filing Self-Report Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Miracle Hill Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc. [Re:134 Order on Motion for Order Determining that a Patient Care Ombudsman is Not Necessary]. (Stichter, Scott)
Related: [-]