New York Southern District Court
Judge:Jennifer H Rearden
Case #: 1:23-cv-08973
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332bc Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Oct 12, 2023
Terminated:Oct 19, 2023
Case in other court:SupremeCourt State of New York, County of New York, 654956/2023
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 09, 2024 4:34 AM EDT
Defendant
Vincent Muehter
Represented By
Stuart P. Slotnick
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC
contact info
Plaintiff
WebMD Health Corp.
Represented By
Kelly Anne Librera
Winston & Strawn Llp (ny)
contact info
Plaintiff
WebMD LLC
Represented By
Kelly Anne Librera
Winston & Strawn Llp (ny)
contact info
Plaintiff
MH Sub I, LLC
Represented By
Kelly Anne Librera
Winston & Strawn Llp (ny)
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, October 19, 2023
9 9 order Order Thu 10/19 3:08 PM
ORDER TO REMAND: On October 17, 2023, the Parties to the above-referenced action filed a Stipulation to Remand Removed Action. The Court, having reviewed that stipulation and good cause appearing, orders as follows: The Parties' stipulation is approved; and The above-captioned action docketed in the Southern District of New York at Case No. 1:23-cv-08973-JHR., is hereby remanded to the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jennifer H. Rearden on 10/18/2023) (ama)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Stipulation and Order Thu 10/19 3:06 PM
STIPULATION TO REMAND REMOVED ACTION: The Parties have conferred on this issue and, based on the representations herein and in Exhibit A, file this stipulation requesting remand. The Parties further stipulate that each party shall bear its own attorneys' fees and costs with respect to the removal and subsequent remand of the Action pursuant to this stipulation and order. and as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jennifer H. Rearden on 10/18/2023) (ama)
Related: [-]
transfer Case Remanded Out - State Court Mon 10/23 2:33 PM
CASE REMANDED OUT from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the State Court - Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York. Sent certified copy of docket entries and remand order. Mailed via UPS Tracking Number 1Z E22 E53 37 876 5 on 10/23/2023. (ama)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
7 7 misc Proposed Stipulation and Order Tue 10/17 5:34 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by MH Sub I, LLC, WebMD Health Corp., WebMD LLC..(Librera, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Lynn Walsh
6 6 misc Letter Tue 10/17 5:17 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Jennifer H. Rearden from Kelly A. Librera dated October 17, 2023 re: Submission of Proposed Stipulation and Order to Remand Case. Document filed by MH Sub I, LLC, WebMD Health Corp., WebMD LLC..(Librera, Kelly)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Proposed Stipulation and Order Tue 10/17 4:57 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by MH Sub I, LLC, WebMD Health Corp., WebMD LLC..(Librera, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 16, 2023
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 10/16 10:59 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kelly Anne Librera on behalf of MH Sub I, LLC, WebMD Health Corp., WebMD LLC..(Librera, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 13, 2023
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Fri 10/13 9:32 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jennifer H. Rearden. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Fri 10/13 9:33 AM
Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Fri 10/13 9:33 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Fri 10/13 9:33 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Stuart P. Slotnick. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: VINCENT MUEHTER, MH Sub I, LLC d/b/a Internet Brands. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; alias party name was omitted;. (pc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
3 3 service Certificate of Service Other Thu 10/12 3:14 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal and Supporting Papers served on MH SUB I, LLC d/b/a INTERNET BRANDS, WEBMD HEALTH CORP., and WEBMD LLC f/k/a WEBMD, INC. via their attorneys on October 12, 2023. Service was made by Mail and Email. Document filed by VINCENT MUEHTER..(Slotnick, Stuart)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 10/12 2:55 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Slotnick, Stuart)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs notice Notice of Removal Thu 10/12 1:51 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York. Case Number: 654956/2023. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28416036).Document filed by VINCENT MUEHTER..(Slotnick, Stuart)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 125 pgs Exhibit A - Copies of all pleadings and other filed documents to date in the State Court Action,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Copy of the Supreme Court New York County Action docket as of October 11, 2023,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Copy of the email from Plaintiffs counsel to Defendant,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Copy of the State Court Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal,
Att: 5 3 pgs Exhibit E - Copy of the Declaration of Vincent Muehter