Lokuge et al v. Mayorkas et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Karen Gren Scholer |
Case #: | 3:23-cv-02256 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 05:702 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Oct 12, 2023 |
Terminated: | Apr 15, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 09, 2024 3:55 AM CDT |
Defendant
Ur M Jaddou
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Alejandro Mayorkas
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Connie Nolan
Assoc. Director, USCIS Service Center Operations Directorate USCIS 20 Massachusetts Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20529 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Madusha Sewwandi Kuda Udage
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Roshan Thilanka Lokuge
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
![]() NOTICE of Dismissal filed by Madusha Sewwandi Kuda Udage, Roshan Thilanka Lokuge (Dobbs, Jered) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case (Optional)
Mon 04/15 4:36 PM
Civil Case Terminated per10 Notice of Dismissal. (kcr) |
||
Wednesday, December 06, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 12/06 12:40 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that7 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond, to and including April 16, 2024 , is GRANTED . (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 12/6/2023) (chmb) |
|
Monday, December 04, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
![]() CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ur M Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, Connie Nolan. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Hasday-DOJ, Lisa) |
|
7 | 7
![]() Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Response filed by Ur M Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, Connie Nolan (Hasday-DOJ, Lisa) |
|
6 | 6
![]() NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lisa Robin Hasday-DOJ on behalf of Ur M Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, Connie Nolan. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Hasday-DOJ, Lisa) |
|
Friday, October 13, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Court Request For Recusal
Mon 10/16 8:54 AM
Court Request for Recusal: Magistrate Judge David L. Horan recused pursuant to Special Order 3-346. Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver assigned for matters that may be referred in this case. (sxf) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Summons issued as to Ur M Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, Connie Nolan, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (ndt) |
|
Thursday, October 12, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
![]() New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt) |
|
2 | 2
![]() CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Madusha Sewwandi Kuda Udage, Roshan Thilanka Lokuge. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Dobbs, Jered) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against Ur M Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, Connie Nolan filed by Roshan Thilanka Lokuge, Madusha Sewwandi Kuda Udage. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number ATXNDC-14098196) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Dobbs, Jered) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |