Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:J P Boulee
Referred: Regina D Cannon
Case #: 1:23-cv-04657
Nature of Suit230 Real Property - Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Oct 12, 2023
Terminated:Nov 02, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 09, 2024 4:33 AM EDT
Defendant
Kenyan Richardson
4520 Pine Street 4168
Smyrna, GA 30080
Defendant
and All Other Occupants
4520 Pine Street 4168
Smyrna, GA 30080
Plaintiff
IMP Elevate West Village LLC
Represented By
Ashley Stafford
Renters Reference Services, Inc.
contact info


Docket last updated: 43 minutes ago
Thursday, November 02, 2023
7 7 misc Letter Thu 11/02 12:03 PM
Remand Letter to the Magistrate Court of Cobb County. (tas)
Related: [-]
6 6 2 pgs order Order on Final Report and Recommendation Thu 11/02 11:32 AM
ORDER APPROVING AND ADOPTING3 Final Report and Recommendation. This action is REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of Cobb County, Georgia. The Clerk is DIRECTED to close this case. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 11/2/2023. (jkl)
Related: [-]
utility Submission to District Judge Thu 11/02 10:10 AM
Submission of3 Final Report and Recommendation to District Judge J. P. Boulee. (jkl)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Thu 11/02 11:40 AM
Civil Case Terminated. (jkl)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Thu 11/02 12:01 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Certified Mailing re Certified Copy of6 Order on Final Report and Recommendation to the Magistrate Court of Cobb County. USPS# 91 7199 9991 7032 5718 8780. (tas)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Thu 11/02 12:02 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Kenyan Richardson, and All Other Occupants re6 Order on Final Report and Recommendation. (tas)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 16, 2023
5 5 misc Letter re:83.1 Mon 10/16 11:13 AM
Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Attorney Admission requirements sent to Ashley Stafford. Clerk to follow-up by 10/26/2023. (djs)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 13, 2023
4 4 2 pgs order Order for Service of Report and Recommendation Fri 10/13 10:56 AM
ORDER for Service of3 Final Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 10/13/2023. (nmb)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Report and Recommendation - Final Order ruling on IFP Fri 10/13 10:54 AM
FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that the2 Notice of Removal, filed by Kenyan Richardson be REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of Cobb County, Georgia. ORDER GRANTING In Forma Pauperis for purposes of jurisdictional review only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 10/13/2023. c:Financial Office(nmb)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 10/13 10:40 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Kenyan Richardson.(nmb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Fri 10/13 10:58 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Kenyan Richardson, and All Other Occupants re3 Final Report and Recommendation, Order ruling on IFP,4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. (nmb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
1 1 motion Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 10/12 3:38 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kenyan Richardson.(jkb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Removal,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Thu 10/12 3:50 PM
Submission of1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon. (jkb)
Related: [-]