Texas Western District Court
Case #: 6:23-mj-00251
Case Filed:Oct 11, 2023
Terminated:Oct 11, 2023
Last checked: Friday Oct 13, 2023 2:22 AM CDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Mark Frazier
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Cory Andrew Quinones (1)
Terminated: 10/11/2023
Represented By
Duty Pub. Defender-Waco
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/13/2023 4:00 AM CDT
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
1 1 Arrest (Rule 32.1) of Cory Andrew Quinones (ad3)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
Proceedings complete in arresting Division as to Cory Andrew Quinones. Documents have been sent to Northern District of Texas ABILENE DIVISION (ad3)
Related: [-]
2 2 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Derek T. Gilliland:Initial Appearance in Rule 5(c)(3)/ Rule 32.1 Proceedings as to Cory Andrew Quinones held on 10/11/2023- Appearance entered by Duty Pub. Defender-Waco for Cory Andrew Quinones on behalf of defendant. Defendant HAS NOT completed the CJA23 financial affidavit but FPD Ashley Askari is appointed to oversee the removal of the Defendant. The Defendant waives Rule 5/32.1 and is detained pending removal to the Northern District of Texas. Detention hearing is to be held in that district. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter FTR.) (ad3)
Related: [-]
3 3 WAIVER - Rule 32.1 as to Cory Andrew Quinones. (ad3)
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Cory Andrew Quinones. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (ad3)
Related: [-]
5 5 COMMITMENT TO ANOTHER DISTRICT/DIVISION as to Cory Andrew Quinones. Defendant committed to Northern District of Texas, Abilene DIVISION. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (ad3)
Related: [-]
6 6 Notice to Northern District of Texas of a Rule 32 Appearance as to Cory Andrew Quinones. Your case number is: 1:23-CR-032-H(01). Docket sheet and documents attached. (If you require certified copies of any documents, please send a request to TXWD_ECF_help@txwd.uscourts.gov. If you wish to designate a different email address for future transfers, send your request to InterDistrictTransfer_TXND@txnd.uscourts.gov.) (ad3)
Related: [-]