New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Joan M Azrack
Referred: Steven I Locke
Case #: 2:23-cv-07650
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Case Filed:Oct 13, 2023
Terminated:Sep 23, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Apr 11, 2024 5:19 AM EDT
Defendant
Doreen Perretta
120 Edwards Street
North Massapequa, NY 11758
Represented By
Jonathan A. Dachs
Jonathan A. Dachs, Esq./shayne, Dachs
contact info
Defendant
Joseph Perretta
h/w 120 Edwards Street
North Massapequa, NY 11758
Represented By
Jonathan A. Dachs
Jonathan A. Dachs, Esq./shayne, Dachs
contact info
Defendant
Nicole Perretta
as an interested party 120 Edwards Street
North Massapequa, NY 11758
Represented By
Brett Silverberg
The Gucciardo Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Narragansett Bay Insurance Company
Represented By
Brian Thomas Noel
Wade Clark Mulcahy LLP
contact info
Robert James Cosgrove
Wade Clark Mulcahy
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
order Order(Other) Tue 10/15 10:44 AM
ORDER re23 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Narragansett Bay Insurance Company. The stipulation is So Ordered. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 10/15/2024. (LP)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 14, 2024
23 23 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 10/14 4:37 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Narragansett Bay Insurance Company (Noel, Brian)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
order Order Dismissing Case Mon 09/23 8:58 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: The Court having been advised that this matter has settled, the case is dismissed, subject to reinstatement at the request of any party within 60 days. The Court retains jurisdiction to So Order any settlement documents if they are submitted within this period. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 9/23/2024. (LP)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
22 22 misc Letter Fri 09/20 3:43 PM
Letter re Settlement by Narragansett Bay Insurance Company (Cosgrove, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
21 21 motion Substitute Attorney Mon 07/01 11:06 AM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Nicole Perretta. (Silverberg, Brett)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Mon 07/01 9:44 AM
Electronic ORDER granting DE20 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Brett Silverberg is terminated as counsel for Defendant Nicole Perretta. Attorney Lauren A. Henderson of LAH Law Firm, PLLC is substituted as counsel. Ms. Henderson is directed to promptly file a notice of appearance. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 7/1/2024. (JM)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Mon 07/01 11:26 AM
Electronic ORDER granting DE21 Motion to Substitute Attorney. By way of clarification, Attorney Brett Silverberg of LAH Law Firm, PLLC is substituted as counsel for Defendant Nicole Perretta. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 7/1/2024. (JM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
20 20 notice Notice of Consent to Change Attorney Thu 06/27 4:40 PM
NOTICE of Consent to Change Attorney by Brett Silverberg (Silverberg, Brett)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
19 19 minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 05/14 12:11 PM
Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke: Status Conference held on 5/14/2024. Discovery is ongoing. The Final Pretrial Conference is set for 12/5/2024 at 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 5/14/2024. (KG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2024
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 05/09 12:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brett Silverberg on behalf of Nicole Perretta (notification declined or already on case) (Silverberg, Brett)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
17 17 order Scheduling Order Thu 02/29 10:45 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery deadlines set; Next Status Conference set for 5/14/2024 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 820 before Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 2/29/2024. (KG)
Related: [-]
16 16 minutes Initial Conference Hearing Thu 02/29 10:40 AM
Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke:Initial Conference Hearing held on 2/29/2024. The court has adopted and So Ordered the joint proposed scheduling order15 submitted by the parties. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 2/29/2024. (KG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
15 15 misc Proposed Scheduling Order Tue 02/27 3:35 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order by Narragansett Bay Insurance Company (Cosgrove, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Tue 02/13 8:15 AM
Electronic ORDER granting DE14 Motion to Adjourn Conference. On consent, the initial conference previously scheduled for 2/14/2024 is adjourned to 2/29/2024 at 10:30 a.m. in courtroom 820 of the Central Islip courthouse. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 2/13/2024. (JM)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
14 14 motion Adjourn Conference Mon 02/12 4:49 PM
MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Nicole Perretta. (Silverberg, Brett)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Scheduling Order
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 01/31 11:16 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by Nicole Perretta. (Silverberg, Brett)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
12 12 order Scheduling Order Tue 01/23 10:54 AM
INITIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: An Initial Conference is set for 2/14/2024 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 820 before Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 1/23/2024. (KG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 SIL Individual Rules,
Att: 2 Scheduling Order Worksheet
Monday, January 22, 2024
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 01/22 3:36 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Doreen Perretta. (Dachs, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 01/22 3:33 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Joseph Perretta. (Dachs, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 01/22 3:00 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brett Silverberg on behalf of Nicole Perretta (aty to be noticed) (Silverberg, Brett)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 01/11 2:55 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Narragansett Bay Insurance Company. Nicole Perretta served on 12/15/2023, answer due 1/5/2024. (Cosgrove, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 28, 2023
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 12/28 3:13 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Thomas Noel on behalf of Narragansett Bay Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Noel, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, December 27, 2023
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 12/27 4:16 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan A. Dachs on behalf of Joseph Perretta (aty to be noticed) (Dachs, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 12/27 4:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan A. Dachs on behalf of Doreen Perretta (aty to be noticed) (Dachs, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 16, 2023
4 4 service Summons Issued Mon 10/16 2:14 PM
Summons Issued as to Doreen Perretta, Joseph Perretta. (LJ)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Mon 10/16 2:05 PM
Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf] (LJ)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Mon 10/16 1:59 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (LJ)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 10/16 2:03 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (LJ)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 13, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 10/13 10:04 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-17178788 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by Narragansett Bay Insurance Company. (Cosgrove, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 8 Proposed Summons,
Att: 9 Proposed Summons