New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Natasha C Merle
Referred: Vera M Scanlon
Case #: 1:23-cv-07656
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Oct 13, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Apr 11, 2024 5:20 AM EDT
Defendant
Daniel Beyda
Represented By
Lee Williams
Abrams Fensterman, LLP
contact info
Dana Parker
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Justin Tyler Kelton
Abrams, Fensterman, Fensterman, Eisman, Formato, Ferrara, Wo
contact info
Kodey Matthew Haddox
K & L Gates LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Parts Authority, LLC
Represented By
Daniel Gimmel
Kane Kessler, P.C.
contact info
Dana M. Susman
Kane Kessler, P.C.
contact info
David A. Gold
Kane Kessler, P.C.
contact info

GPO Jul 26 2024
MEMORANDUM & ORDER: Defendant's motion to dismiss 22 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The Court dismisses plaintiff's first cause of action for declaratory judgment with prejudice. ORDER ATTACHED. Ordered by Judge Natasha C. Merle on 7/26/2024. (AG)

Docket last updated: 83 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
55 55 misc Letter Wed 04/23 2:13 PM
Letter re: status update by Daniel Beyda (Kelton, Justin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
54 54 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 04/16 9:10 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re51 Letter MOTION to Compel with Defendant's Consent, discovery from Anchin Accountants and Advisory Firm filed by Parts Authority, LLC. (Gold, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C