Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:23-bk-09139

Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Timothy A Barnes
Case #: 1:23-ap-00317
Nature of Suit68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
41 Bankruptcy - Objection / revocation of discharge - §727(c),(d),(e)
Case Filed:Oct 12, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Dalia Sigrio Manjarres Cohen
Represented By
Dalia Sigrio Manjarres Cohen
contact info
Plaintiff
RCI Realty, LLC
1725 S. Naperville Road Suite 205
Wheaton, IL 60189
Represented By
J. Matthew Pfeiffer
Pfeiffer Law Offices, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Emilia Crespo
1725 S. Naperville Road Suite 205
Wheaton, IL 60189
Represented By
J. Matthew Pfeiffer
Pfeiffer Law Offices, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:06 PM CDT
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
41 41 order Scheduling Thu 03/27 4:53 PM
Order Modifying Discovery Schedule Related [+]. Issuance of written discovery Cutoff 4/25/2025. Responses to written discovery due by 5/26/2025. Beginning lay witness depositions due by 6/25/2025. Completion of lay witness depositions due by 8/25/2025. Plaintiff expert witness disclosure due by 9/24/2025. Plaintiff expert witness deposition completion due by 11/25/2025. Defendant expert witness disclosure due by 12/25/2025. Defendant expert witness deposition completion due by 2/26/2026. Signed on 3/26/2025 (Green, Ron)
Related: [-] 38 Agreed Order
40 40 utility U - Corrective Entry Wed 03/26 3:33 PM
CORRECTIVE ENTRY: PDF/Event Error, Filer Notified Related [+]. (Gomez, Denise)
Related: [-] 38 Agreed Order
39 39 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Wed 03/26 12:39 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 06/18/2025 at 09:30 AM at Appear in Courtroom 744, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604, or Using Zoom - Judge Barnes. (McClendon, Annette)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
38 38 motion Agreed Order Tue 03/25 3:35 PM
Notice of Motion and Second Motion for Agreed Order to Modify Discovery Schedule Filed by Peter C. Nabhani on behalf of Dalia Sigrio Manjarres Cohen. Hearing scheduled for 3/26/2025 at 09:30 AM at Appear In Courtroom 744, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604 or Using Zoom- Judge Barnes. (Nabhani, Peter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, January 30, 2025
37 37 order Scheduling Thu 01/30 2:49 PM
Order Modifying Discovery Schedule Related [+]. A. Issuance of written discovery due by 2/24/2025. B. Response to written discovery due by 3/24/2025. C. Beginning lay witness depositions due by 4/21/2025. D. Completion of lay witness deposition due by 6/16/2025. E. Plaintiff expert witness disclosure due by 7/14/2025. F. Plaintiff expert witness deposition completion due by 8/11/2025. G. Defendant expert witness disclosure due by 9/8/2025. Defendant expert witness deposition completion due by 10/6/2025. Signed on 1/30/2025 (Green, Ron)
Related: [-] 29 Motion to Extend Time
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
36 36 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Wed 01/15 1:58 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 03/26/2025 at 09:30 AM at Appear in Courtroom 744, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604, or Using Zoom - Judge Barnes. (McClendon, Annette)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
35 35 utility U - Draft Order Wed 01/15 1:42 PM
Draft Scheduling Order Related [+]. due by 1/29/2025. (McClendon, Annette)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
34 34 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Wed 11/06 12:49 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 01/15/2025 at 09:30 AM at Appear in Courtroom 744, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604, or Using Zoom - Judge Barnes. (McClendon, Annette)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
33 33 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Wed 09/11 12:10 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 11/06/2024 at 09:30 AM at Appear in Courtroom 744, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604, or Using Zoom - Judge Barnes. (McClendon, Annette)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
32 32 utility U - Corrective Entry Wed 07/10 1:06 PM
CORRECTIVE ENTRY: Incorrect Notice of Motion, filer notified to refile Related [+]. (Mendoza, Catherine)
Related: [-] 29 Motion to Extend Time
31 31 order Scheduling Wed 07/10 12:58 PM
Order Scheduling Related [+]
Related: [-] 29 Motion to Extend Time
30 30 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Wed 07/10 12:58 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 09/11/2024 at 09:30 AM at Appear in Courtroom 744, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604, or Using Zoom - Judge Barnes, , , . (McClendon, Annette)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
29 29 motion Extend Time Tue 07/09 7:22 PM
Notice of Motion and Agreed Motion to Extend Time Modify Discovery Schedule Filed by Peter C. Nabhani on behalf of Dalia Sigrio Manjarres Cohen. Hearing scheduled for 7/10/2024 at 09:30 AM at Appear In Courtroom 744, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604 or Using Zoom- Judge Barnes. (Nabhani, Peter) Modified on 7/10/2024 Incorrect Notice of Motion, filer notified to refile (Mendoza, Catherine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
28 28 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Wed 05/15 12:42 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 07/10/2024 at 09:30 AM at Appear in Courtroom 744, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604, or Using Zoom - Judge Barnes. (McClendon, Annette)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
27 27 order Scheduling Wed 05/15 12:13 PM
Rule 7026(F) Conference Report and Order Related [+]. Discovery Cutoff 5/17/2024. Response due by 6/19/2024. Witness List due by 7/17/2024. Signed on 5/15/2024 (Roman, Felipe)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Saturday, April 27, 2024
26 26 misc Proposed Order Sat 04/27 6:32 PM
Proposed Order - Joint Rule 7026 Report and Discovery Plan Filed by J. Matthew Pfeiffer on behalf of Emilia Crespo, RCI Realty, LLC Related [+]. (Pfeiffer, J.)
Related: [-] 25 Order Scheduling
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
25 25 order Scheduling Wed 04/10 1:14 PM
Order Scheduling Related [+]. Planning Conference due by 4/24/2024. Discovery Plan due by 5/1/2024. Status hearing to be held on 5/15/2024 at 09:30 AM at Appear In Courtroom 744, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604 or Using Zoom- Judge Barnes. Signed on 4/10/2024 (Sirmons, Dornesa)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
24 24 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Wed 04/10 12:24 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 05/15/2024 at 09:30 AM at Appear in Courtroom 744, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604, or Using Zoom - Judge Barnes. (McClendon, Annette)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
23 23 misc Certificate of Service (Do Not Use for Service of Summons or Rule 3002.1 Events) Wed 03/06 10:56 PM
Certificate of Service (Adv. Pl. Rule 7026 Initial Disclosures) Filed by J. Matthew Pfeiffer on behalf of Emilia Crespo, RCI Realty, LLC. (Pfeiffer, J.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
22 22 order Scheduling Thu 02/29 8:40 AM
Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Affirmative Defense(s) for reason stated on the record Related [+]. Amended Answer due by: 4/1/2024. Continued Status hearing to be held on 4/10/2024 at 09:30 AM at Appear In Courtroom 744, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604 or Using Zoom- Judge Barnes. Signed on 2/28/2024 (Boyd, Shante)
Related: [-] 8 Motion to Strike
21 21 order Extend Time Thu 02/29 8:37 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time Related [+]. Written Discovery Cutoff 3/13/2024. Rule 7026 Disclosures due by 3/6/2024. Signed on 2/28/2024. (Roman, Felipe)
Related: [-] 18
20 20 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Wed 02/28 2:52 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 04/10/2024 at 09:30 AM at Appear in Courtroom 744, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604, or Using Zoom - Judge Barnes, , , . (McClendon, Annette)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Monday, February 19, 2024
19 19 misc Proposed Order Mon 02/19 2:52 PM
Proposed Order - Granting Enlargement of Time (Discovery) Filed by J. Matthew Pfeiffer on behalf of Emilia Crespo, RCI Realty, LLC Related [+]. (Pfeiffer, J.)
Related: [-] 18 Motion to Extend Time
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
18 18 motion Extend Time Wed 02/14 11:40 PM
Notice of Motion and Uncontested Motion to Extend Time Issue Written Discovery and Submit Rule 7026 Disclosures Filed by J. Matthew Pfeiffer on behalf of Emilia Crespo, RCI Realty, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 2/28/2024 at 09:30 AM at Appear In Courtroom 744, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604 or Using Zoom- Judge Barnes. (Pfeiffer, J.)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Certificate of Service (Do Not Use for Service of Summons or Rule 3002.1 Events) Wed 02/14 6:26 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by J. Matthew Pfeiffer on behalf of Emilia Crespo, RCI Realty, LLC Related [+]. (Pfeiffer, J.)
Related: [-] 16 Reply
16 16 answer Reply Wed 02/14 6:23 PM
Reply in Support to Related [+] Filed by J. Matthew Pfeiffer on behalf of Emilia Crespo, RCI Realty, LLC (Pfeiffer, J.)
Related: [-] 8 Motion to Strike
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
15 15 answer Response Wed 02/07 5:43 PM
Response to Related [+] Filed by Peter C. Nabhani on behalf of Dalia Sigrio Manjarres Cohen (Nabhani, Peter)
Related: [-] 8 Motion to Strike
Friday, January 12, 2024
14 14 misc Proposed Order Fri 01/12 3:57 PM
Proposed Order - Scheduling Order for pending motion to strike Filed by J. Matthew Pfeiffer on behalf of Emilia Crespo, RCI Realty, LLC Related [+]. (Pfeiffer, J.)
Related: [-] 8 Motion to Strike,12 Order Scheduling
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
13 13 order Scheduling Wed 01/10 2:08 PM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference Related [+]. Discovery Cutoff 2/21/2024. Rule 7026 due by 2/14/2024. Status hearing to be held on 2/28/2024 at 09:30 AM at Appear In Courtroom 744, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604 or Using Zoom- Judge Barnes. Signed on 1/10/2024 (Molina, Nilsa)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
12 12 order Scheduling Wed 01/10 2:01 PM
Order Scheduling Related [+]. Response due by 2/7/2024.Reply due by: 2/14/2024.Hearing continued on 2/28/2024 at 10:00AM at Appear In Courtroom 744, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604 or Using Zoom- Judge Barnes. Signed on 1/10/2024 (Molina, Nilsa)
Related: [-] 8 Motion to Strike
11 11 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Wed 01/10 2:00 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 02/28/2024 at 10:00 AM at Appear in Courtroom 744, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604, or Using Zoom - Judge Barnes, , , . (McClendon, Annette)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
10 10 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Wed 01/10 1:32 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. hearing scheduled for 02/28/2024 at 10:00 AM at Appear in Courtroom 744, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604, or Using Zoom - Judge Barnes. (McClendon, Annette)
Related: [-] 8 Strike
9 9 court Hearing Stricken (Other) Wed 01/10 1:31 PM
Hearing Scheduled for 1/24/2024 at 09:00 AM Stricken Related [+]
Related: [-] 8 Motion to Strike (related document(s): 7 Answer to Complaint). (McClendon, Annette
8 8 motion Strike Wed 01/10 1:30 AM
Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike Related [+] Filed by J. Matthew Pfeiffer on behalf of Emilia Crespo, RCI Realty, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 1/24/2024 at 09:00 AM at Appear In Courtroom 744, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604 or Using Zoom- Judge Barnes. (Pfeiffer, J.)
Related: [-] 7 Answer to Complaint
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Thursday, November 30, 2023
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 11/30 4:22 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Peter C. Nabhani on behalf of Dalia Sigrio Manjarres Cohen. (Nabhani, Peter)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
6 6 order Extend Time Thu 11/30 9:42 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time Related [+]. Answer And Affirmative Defenses are due by 11/30/2023. Signed on 11/29/2023. (Cabrales, Claudia)
Related: [-] 4
5 5 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Wed 11/29 12:59 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 01/10/2024 at 09:30 AM at Appear in Courtroom 744, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604, or Using Zoom - Judge Barnes.. Signed on 11/29/2023. (McClendon, Annette)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Monday, November 13, 2023
4 4 motion Extend Time Mon 11/13 7:37 PM
Notice of Motion and Motion to Extend Time File Answer and Affirmative Defenses Filed by Peter C. Nabhani on behalf of Dalia Sigrio Manjarres Cohen. Hearing scheduled for 11/29/2023 at 09:00 AM at Appear In Courtroom 744, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604 or Using Zoom- Judge Barnes. (Nabhani, Peter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, October 12, 2023
3 3 crditcrd none Thu 10/12 10:38 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 23-00317 ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A47037934. Fee Amount $ 350.00 (Pfeiffer, J.) Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Thu 10/12 10:31 PM
Summons Issued on Dalia Sigrio Manjarres Cohen Answer Due 11/13/2023 (Admin)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 10/12 10:31 PM
Adversary case 23-00317 (68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)), (41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e))): Complaint by RCI Realty, LLC, Emilia Crespo against Dalia Sigrio Manjarres Cohen. Fee Amount $350. Status hearing to be held on 11/29/2023 at 09:00 AM at Appear In Courtroom 744, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604 or Using Zoom- Judge Barnes. (Pfeiffer, J.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - published statements