Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:22-bk-80000

Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Bankruptcy Jud Stacey G Jernigan
Case #: 8:23-ap-08000
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Oct 12, 2023
Terminated:Apr 09, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
EMR Elevator Inc.
Represented By
EMR Elevator Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
GlassRatner Advisory & Capital Group, LLC d/b/a B. Riley Advisory Services, as Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator
Represented By
Kyle Woodard
Kane Russell Coleman Logan PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 1:10 PM CDT
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of dismissal or stipulated dismissal in an adversary proceeding Tue 04/09 8:43 AM
Notice of stipulated dismissal in an adversary proceeding filed by Plaintiff GlassRatner Advisory & Capital Group, LLC d/b/a B. Riley Advisory Services, as Plan Administrator. (Woodard, Kyle)
Related: [-]
court Close adversary case Tue 04/09 11:13 AM
Adversary case 8:23-ap-8000 closed (Kerr, S.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 14, 2023
8 8 court BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document Thu 12/14 11:21 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 12/14/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Order granting motion to appear pro hac vice adding Ida Danielle Mashburn-Myrick for EMR Elevator Inc. (related document6 ) Entered on 12/11/2023.
Monday, December 11, 2023
7 7 order Appear pro hac vice Mon 12/11 5:40 PM
Order granting motion to appear pro hac vice adding Ida Danielle Mashburn-Myrick for EMR Elevator Inc. Related [+] Entered on 12/11/2023. (Rielly, Bill)
Related: [-] 6
Friday, December 08, 2023
6 6 motion Appear pro hac vice Fri 12/08 4:36 PM
Motion to appear pro hac vice for Danielle Mashburn-Myrick. Fee Amount $100 filed by Defendant EMR Elevator Inc. (Kilmer, Brian)
Related: [-]
5 5 answer Answer to complaint Fri 12/08 4:31 PM
Answer to complaint filed by EMR Elevator Inc.. (Kilmer, Brian)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Fri 12/08 4:37 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Motion to Appear pro hac vice([LINK 23-08000 sgj] ) [motion,mprohac] ( 100.00). Receipt number A30965568, amount $ 100.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#6
Thursday, October 26, 2023
4 4 cmp Summons service executed Thu 10/26 10:26 AM
Summons service executed on GlassRatner Advisory & Capital Group, LLC d/b/a B. Riley Advisory Services, as Plan Administrator 10/13/2023 (Woodard, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 13, 2023
3 3 order Standing scheduling order in an adversary proceeding Fri 10/13 10:28 AM
Scheduling order setting deadlines. Discovery and all exhibits except impeachment documents: 45 days prior to Docket Call, pre-trial order: 7 calendar days prior to Docket Call, proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law: 7 days prior to first scheduled docket call Related [+]. Trial Docket Call date set for 4/8/2024 at 01:30 PM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/jerniga. Trial will be held during the week of 4/15/2024. Entered on 10/13/2023 (Edmond, Michael)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff GlassRatner Advisory & Capital Group, LLC d/b/a B. Riley Advisory Services, as Plan Administrator
2 2 court Summons issued Fri 10/13 10:26 AM
Summons issued on EMR Elevator Inc., Answer Due 11/13/2023, (Edmond, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 10/12 2:27 PM
Adversary case 23-08000 Complaint by GlassRatner Advisory & Capital Group, LLC d/b/a B. Riley Advisory Services, as Plan Administrator against EMR Elevator Inc.. Fee Amount $350. Nature(s) of suit: 12 Related [+]. 13. (Woodard, Kyle)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preferencecovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet
Att: 3 Summons