California Central District Court
Judge:Stephen V Wilson
Referred: Rozella A Oliver
Case #: 2:23-cv-08654
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Oct 13, 2023
Terminated:Dec 20, 2023
Case in other court:Los Angeles Superior Court, 23STCV18993
Last checked: Thursday Apr 11, 2024 2:18 AM PDT
Defendant
Citibank N.A.
Represented By
Alexandra Costanza Whitworth
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP
contact info
Adam Andrew Vukovic
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP
contact info
Defendant
Jesse Nathan Tyre-Karp
Represented By
Alexandra Costanza Whitworth
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP
contact info
Adam Andrew Vukovic
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Steven A. Schuman
Represented By
Wendy Evelyn Giberti
Igeneral Counsel PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
28 28 misc Receipt Thu 01/04 4:43 PM
Receipt of LETTER OF TRANSMITTAL - REMAND TO SUPERIOR COURT. (aco)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 21, 2023
27 27 misc Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (G-17) - optional html form Thu 12/21 11:07 AM
TRANSMITTAL of documents to Superior Court for the State of California, Los Angeles. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Superior Court for the State of California, Los Angeles. (rolm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
26 26 order Remand Case to State Court Thu 12/21 11:00 AM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND AND DENYING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES15 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. The court GRANTS Plaintiff's motion ro remand to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles, Plaintiff's request for attorneys' fees is DENIED. All previously set dates are hereby vacated and off-calendar. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (rolm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 14, 2023
25 25 order Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only Thu 12/14 4:34 PM
CIVIL TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
Related: [-]
24 24 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Thu 12/14 4:28 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE IN CHAMBERS ORDER/TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: NEW CASE STATUS CONFERENCE;10 MOTION to Dismiss Case PLAINTIFF'S Verified Complaint filed by DEFENDANTS; and15 MOTION to Remand Case to LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT filed by PLAINTIFF - The Motion to Remand [15 is submitted. Order to issue. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file an opposition to Defendants motion to dismiss10 within 14 days, but no later than December 29, 2023. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file a reply one week afterwards by January 5, 2024. A court trial is set for April 2, 2024 at 9:00 a.m., with a pretrial conference on March 25, 2024 at 3:00 p.m. The initial status conference is off-calendar. The hearing on the motions scheduled for 12/18/2023 at 1:30 p.m. is vacated and off-calendar. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
23 23 order Leave to Appear Thu 12/07 8:53 AM
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR REMOTE APPEARANCE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: Mr. Vukovic may appear remotely via Zoom for the hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand and the Initial Status Conference, set concurrently for December 18, 2023.; granting22 REQUEST for Leave of Adam Vukovic to Appear for Remote Initial Status Conference. (aco)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
22 22 motion Appear Tue 12/05 3:58 PM
REQUEST for Leave of Adam Vukovic to Appear for Remote Initial Status Conference and Motion to Remand filed by Defendant Citibank N.A., Jesse Nathan Tyre-Karp. Request set for hearing on 12/18/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Vukovic, Adam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Adam Vukovic Supporting Request to Appear Remotely,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Request to Appear Remotely
Monday, December 04, 2023
21 21 order Leave to Appear Mon 12/04 4:29 PM
ORDER RE: REQUEST TO APPEAR REMOTELY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Ms. Giberti may appear remotely by Zoom for the hearings currently set for December 18, 2023.; granting19 REQUEST for Leave of WENDY EVELYN GIBERTI to Appear. (aco)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 01, 2023
20 20 respm Reply (Motion related) Fri 12/01 4:26 PM
REPLY IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT15 PLAINTIFF'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO REMAND filed by Plaintiff Steven A. Schuman. (Giberti, Wendy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 30, 2023
19 19 motion Appear Thu 11/30 4:29 PM
REQUEST for Leave of WENDY EVELYN GIBERTI to Appear for INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND MOTION TO REMAND filed by PLAINTIFF Steven A. Schuman. Request set for hearing on 12/18/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Giberti, Wendy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration DECLARATION OF WENDY EVELYN GIBERTI IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST TO APPEAR REMOTELY,
Att: 2 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: REQUEST TO APPEAR REMOTELY
Monday, November 27, 2023
18 18 19 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Mon 11/27 4:23 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT15 Defendants filed by Defendants Citibank N.A., Jesse Nathan Tyre-Karp.(Vukovic, Adam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Jesse Tyre-Karp
Thursday, November 16, 2023
17 17 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Thu 11/16 1:18 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE-IN CHAMBERS ORDER/TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The Stipulation to Continue16 is DENIED. The initial status conference and the Motion for Remand15 remain set for 12/18/2023 at 1:30 p.m. The Court defers ruling on Motion to Dismiss10 until such time that the Court has ruled on the Motion to Remand15 . The hearing on the Motion to Dismiss10 is vacated and off-calendar. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
16 16 stip Continue Wed 11/08 3:42 PM
STIPULATION to Continue INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS from DECEMBER 18, 2023 filed by PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANTS Steven A. Schuman.(Giberti, Wendy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration DECLARATION OF WENDY EVELYN GIBERTI IN SUPPORT OF STIPULATION TO ADJOURN INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS,
Att: 2 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER ADJOURNING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND HEARING RE: DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
15 15 motion Remand Case to State Court Tue 11/07 12:08 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT filed by PLAINTIFF Steven A. Schuman. Motion set for hearing on 12/18/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Giberti, Wendy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration DECLARATION OF WENDY EVELYN GIBERTI IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR REMAND,
Att: 2 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR REMAND
Monday, November 06, 2023
14 14 notice Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Mon 11/06 6:21 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123),13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Section IV incomplete; name missing. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 02, 2023
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Thu 11/02 7:30 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Wendy Evelyn Giberti counsel for Plaintiff Steven A. Schuman. Adding Wendy Evelyn Giberti as counsel of record for Steve Schuman for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Steve Schuman. (Giberti, Wendy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 24, 2023
12 12 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 10/24 10:21 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The Initial Status Conference previously scheduled for 11/13/2023 at 3:00 p.m. has been rescheduled to 12/18/2023 at 1:30 PM. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 23, 2023
11 11 notice Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Mon 10/23 10:22 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case PLAINTIFF'S Verified Complaint 10 . The following error(s) was/were found: Judge Stephen V. Wilson's name is spelled incorrectly on the Proposed Order In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (aco)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 20, 2023
10 10 motion Dismiss Case Fri 10/20 12:34 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case PLAINTIFF'S Verified Complaint filed by DEFENDANTS Citibank N.A., Jesse Nathan Tyre-Karp. Motion set for hearing on 12/18/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Whitworth, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, October 19, 2023
9 9 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Thu 10/19 11:05 AM
ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE for 11/13/2023 at 3:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Thu 10/19 11:03 AM
NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
7 7 cs_rasgn Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV-89) Wed 10/18 3:00 PM
ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 23-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Consuelo B. Marshall to Judge Stephen V. Wilson for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:23-cv-08654 SVW(RAOx). (rn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Tue 10/17 3:19 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 10/17 3:19 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 13, 2023
4 4 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Fri 10/13 2:45 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by DEFENDANTS Citibank N.A., Jesse Nathan Tyre-Karp, re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Corporate Disclosure Statement3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 served on October 13, 2023. (Whitworth, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 10/13 2:38 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Citibank N.A., Jesse Nathan Tyre-Karp identifying Citigroup Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Whitworth, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 10/13 2:35 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Citibank N.A., Jesse Nathan Tyre-Karp. (Whitworth, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 10/13 2:31 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 23STCV18993 Receipt No: ACACDC-36220725 - Fee: $402, filed by DEFENDANTS Jesse Nathan Tyre-Karp, Citibank N.A.. (Attorney Alexandra Costanza Whitworth added to party Citibank N.A.(pty:dft), Attorney Alexandra Costanza Whitworth added to party Jesse Nathan Tyre-Karp(pty:dft))(Whitworth, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Tue 10/17 3:24 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Citibank N.A., Does 1 through 100, inclusive, Jesse Nathan Tyre-Karp., filed by plaintiff Steven A. Schuman. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 8/9/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 1) (ghap)
Related: [-]
service Notice and Acknowledgment of Service (CV-21) Executed Tue 10/17 3:29 PM
NON CONFORM COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Steven A. Schuman, upon Defendant Citibank N.A. acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 8/14/2023, answer due 9/5/2023. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Alexandra Costanza Whitworth, Attorney for Defendant Citibank, N.A. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 3) (ghap)
Related: [-]
service Notice and Acknowledgment of Service (CV-21) Executed Tue 10/17 3:31 PM
NON CONFORM COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Steven A. Schuman, upon Defendant Jesse Nathan Tyre-Karp acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 8/14/2023, answer due 9/5/2023. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Alexandra Costanza Whitworth, Attorney for Defendant Jesse Nathan Tyre-Karp. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 3) (ghap)
Related: [-]