California Northern District Court
Judge:Rita F Lin
Referred: Laurel Beeler
Case #: 3:23-cv-05261
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause15:1126 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Oct 13, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Apr 11, 2024 2:15 AM PDT
Counter-claimant
Motive Technologies, Inc.
Represented By
Angela Campbell Tarasi
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Brent P. Ray
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Thomas J. Friel, Jr.
King And Spalding LLP
contact info
David Shane Brun
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Counter-defendant
Omnitracs, LLC
Represented By
Jiaxiao Zhang
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Adam R. Alper
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Michael Woodrow De Vries
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Akshay Sunil Deoras
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Leslie M Schmidt
Kirkland And Ellis LLP
contact info
Counter-defendant
SmartDrive Systems, Inc.
Represented By
Jiaxiao Zhang
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Adam R. Alper
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Michael Woodrow De Vries
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Akshay Sunil Deoras
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Leslie M Schmidt
Kirkland And Ellis LLP
contact info
Counter-defendant
XRS Corporation
Represented By
Jiaxiao Zhang
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Adam R. Alper
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Michael Woodrow De Vries
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Akshay Sunil Deoras
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Leslie M Schmidt
Kirkland And Ellis LLP
contact info
Defendant
Motive Technologies, Inc.
Represented By
Angela Campbell Tarasi
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Brent P. Ray
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Thomas J. Friel, Jr.
King And Spalding LLP
contact info
David Shane Brun
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Omnitracs, LLC
Represented By
Jiaxiao Zhang
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Adam R. Alper
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Michael Woodrow De Vries
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Akshay Sunil Deoras
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Leslie M Schmidt
Kirkland And Ellis LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
SmartDrive Systems, Inc.
Represented By
Jiaxiao Zhang
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Adam R. Alper
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Michael Woodrow De Vries
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Akshay Sunil Deoras
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Leslie M Schmidt
Kirkland And Ellis LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
XRS Corporation
Represented By
Jiaxiao Zhang
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Adam R. Alper
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Michael Woodrow De Vries
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Akshay Sunil Deoras
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Leslie M Schmidt
Kirkland And Ellis LLP
contact info

GPO Oct 23 2023
Order by Magistrate Judge Lisa J. Cisneros granting 12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Leslie M. Schmidt.(bns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2023)
GPO May 12 2024
Discovery Order For the pending discovery dispute, the parties must comply with the dispute-resolution procedures in the attached order, which has a joint-brief process to resolve disputes. Please be sure to file the letter brief in the manner reflected in the standing order: the process sets a flag that alerts the court in a way that a regular filing does not. (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 5/12/2024)
GPO Oct 29 2024
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL SHOULD NOT BE DENIED. Signed by Judge Rita F. Lin on 10/29/2024. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2024)
GPO Apr 07 2025
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL SHOULD NOT BE DENIED. Show Cause Response due by 5/5/2025. Signed by Judge Rita F. Lin on 4/7/2025. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2025)
GPO Apr 21 2025
AMENDED PROPOSED FINAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Judge Rita F. Lin on April 21, 2025. (rfllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2025)

Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Sunday, April 27, 2025
484 484 misc Transcript Sun 04/27 2:55 PM
Transcript of Jury Trial Proceedings, Volume 10, held on 4 24-2025 before Judge Rita F. Lin. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/28/2025. (Pas, Debra)
Related: [-]
483 483 misc Transcript Sun 04/27 2:52 PM
Transcript of Jury Trial Proceedings, Volume 9, held on 4 23-2025 before Judge Rita F. Lin. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/28/2025. (Pas, Debra)
Related: [-]
482 482 misc Transcript Sun 04/27 2:51 PM
Transcript of Jury Trial Proceedings, Volume 8, held on 4 22-2025 before Judge Rita F. Lin. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/28/2025. (Pas, Debra)
Related: [-]
481 481 misc Sealed Transcript Sun 04/27 2:50 PM
Sealed Transcript of Jury Trial Proceedings, contains proceedings held under seal by Order of Court, held on 4 21-2022 before Judge Rita F. Lin. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra Pas, CRR, Telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy,any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Pas, Debra)
Related: [-]
480 480 misc Transcript Sun 04/27 2:47 PM
Transcript of Jury Trial Proceedings, Volume 7 -- Sealed Proceedings contained therein redacted -- held on 4 21-2022 before Judge Rita F. Lin. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/28/2025. (Pas, Debra)
Related: [-]
479 479 misc Transcript Sun 04/27 2:37 PM
Transcript of Jury Trial Proceedings, Volume 6, held on 4 18-2025 before Judge Rita F. Lin. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/28/2025. (Pas, Debra)
Related: [-]
478 478 misc Transcript Sun 04/27 2:35 PM
Transcript of Jury Trial Proceedings, Volume 5, held on 4 17-2025 before Judge Rita F. Lin. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/28/2025. (Pas, Debra)
Related: [-]
477 477 misc Transcript Sun 04/27 2:34 PM
Transcript of Jury Trial Proceedings, Volume 4, held on 4 16-2025 before Judge Rita F. Lin. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/28/2025. (Pas, Debra)
Related: [-]
476 476 misc Transcript Sun 04/27 2:33 PM
Transcript of Jury Trial Proceedings, Volume 3, held on 4 15-2025 before Judge Rita F. Lin. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/28/2025. (Pas, Debra)
Related: [-]
475 475 misc Transcript Sun 04/27 2:31 PM
Transcript of Jury Trial Proceedings, Volume 2, held on 4 14-2025 before Judge Rita F. Lin. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/28/2025. (Pas, Debra)
Related: [-]
474 474 misc Transcript Sun 04/27 2:30 PM
Transcript of Jury Trial Proceedings, Volume 1, held on 4 11-2025 before Judge Rita F. Lin. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Related [+] Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/28/2025. (Pas, Debra)
Related: [-] 396 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts,394 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts (s)396 ,394
Att: 1 Master Index
Thursday, April 24, 2025
473 473 trial Jury Verdict Thu 04/24 4:09 PM
JURY VERDICT. (mkl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
472 472 trial Jury Notes Thu 04/24 4:08 PM
Jury Notes. (mkl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
471 471 minutes Jury Trial - Completed Thu 04/24 4:06 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rita F. Lin: Jury Trial (Day 10) completed on 4/24/2025. Deadline to file exhibits pursuant to Civil Local Rule 5-1(g) is 5/5/2025. Total Time in Court: 16 minutes. Court Reporter: Debra Pas. Attorneys for Plaintiffs: Akshay Deoras, Leslie Schmidt, Adam Alper, Mike De Vries, Yvonne Beeler, and Kyle Calhoun. Attorneys for Defendant: Brent Ray, Angela Tarasi, Jeff Mills, Katherine Vessels, Mikaela Stone, Roy Falik, Zachary Coots, Andrew Whittaker, Ellen Min, Mark Zambarda, and Eric Valuyev. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/24/2025) Modified on 4/24/2025 (mkl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
470 470 minutes Jury Trial - Held Thu 04/24 9:46 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rita F. Lin: Jury Trial (Day 9) held on 4/23/2025. Further Jury Trial set for 4/24/2025 at 9:00 AM. Total Time in Court: 3 hours, 44 minutes. Court Reporter: Debra Pas. Attorneys for Plaintiffs: Akshay Deoras, Leslie Schmidt, Adam Alper, Mike DeVries, Yvonne Beeler, and Kyle Calhoun. Defendant Attorney: Brent Ray, Angela Tarasi, Jeff Mills, Katherine Vessels, Mikaela Stone, Roy Falik, Zachary Coots, Andrew Whittaker, Ellen Min, Mark Zambarda, and Eric Valuyev. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/23/2025)
Related: [-]
469 469 2 pgs order Order Wed 04/23 8:03 PM
CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER RE: PREAMBLE OF CLAIM 1 OF THE 253 PATENT. Signed by Judge Rita F. Lin on April 23, 2025. (rfllc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
468 468 3 pgs order Order Wed 04/23 3:42 PM
ORDER REGARDING WHETHER OMNITRACS IS AN IMPLIED EXCLUSIVE LICENSEE. Signed by Judge Rita F. Lin on 4/23/2025. (mkl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
467 467 3 pgs order Order Wed 04/23 3:09 PM
**Filed in error. Wrong document attached. Please refer to Dkt. No. 468 .** ORDER REGARDING WHETHER OMNITRACS IS AN IMPLIED EXCLUSIVE LICENSEE. Signed by Judge Rita F. Lin on 4/23/2025. (mkl, COURT STAFF) Modified on 4/23/2025 (mkl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
466 466 minutes Jury Trial - Held Wed 04/23 9:41 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rita F. Lin: Jury Trial (Day 8) held on 4/22/2025. Further Jury Trial set for 4/23/2025 at 8:15 AM. Total Time in Court: 5 hours, 26 minutes. Court Reporter: Debra Pas. Attorneys for Plaintiffs: Akshay Deoras, Leslie Schmidt, Adam Alper, Mike DeVries, Yvonne Beeler, Kyle Calhoun, Ryan Melde, and Argie Mina. Attorneys for Defendant: Brent Ray, Angela Tarasi, Jeff Mills, Katherine Vessels, Mikaela Stone, Roy Falik, Zachary Coots, Andrew Whittaker, Ellen Min, Mark Zambarda, and Eric Valuyev. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/22/2025)
Related: [-]
465 465 1 pgs order Order Tue 04/22 9:54 PM
FINAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Judge Rita F. Lin on April 22, 2025.(rfllc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
464 464 1 pgs order Order Tue 04/22 7:31 PM
FINAL VERDICT FORMS. Signed by Judge Rita F. Lin on April 22, 2025.(rfllc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Phase 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit Phase 2
463 463 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Tue 04/22 7:49 AM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Argie Lagrimas Mina on behalf of Omnitracs, LLC, SmartDrive Systems, Inc., XRS Corporation (Mina, Argie)
Related: [-]
462 462 1 pgs order Order Tue 04/22 7:47 AM
ORDER FOR JURY MEALS DURING DELIBERATIONS. Signed by Judge Rita F. Lin on 4/22/2025. (mkl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
460 460 trial Proposed Jury Instructions Tue 04/22 7:39 AM
Proposed Jury Instructions by Omnitracs, LLC, SmartDrive Systems, Inc., XRS Corporation Joint Filing re Amended Proposed Final Jury Instructions [Dkt. 458] .(Beeler, N. Yvonne)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Monday, April 21, 2025
461 461 minutes Jury Trial - Held Tue 04/22 7:45 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rita F. Lin: Jury Trial (Day 7) held on 4/21/2025. Further Jury Trial set for 4/22/2025 at 8:15 AM. Total Time in Court: 5 hours, 10 minutes. Court Reporter: Debra Pas. Attorneys for Plaintiffs: Akshay Deoras, Leslie Schmidt, Adam Alper, Mike DeVries, Yvonne Beeler, and Kyle Calhoun. Attorneys for Defendant: Brent Ray, Angela Tarasi, Jeff Mills, Katherine Vessels, Mikaela Stone, Patrick Lafferty, Roy Falik, and Zachary Coots, Andrew Whittaker, Ellen Min, Mark Zambarda, and Eric Valuyev. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/21/2025)
Related: [-]
459 459 1 pgs order Order Mon 04/21 8:39 PM
AMENDED PROPOSED VERDICT FORM. Signed by Judge Rita F. Lin on April 21, 2025.(rfllc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Phase 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit Phase 2
458 458 24 pgs order Order Mon 04/21 8:21 PM
AMENDED PROPOSED FINAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Judge Rita F. Lin on April 21, 2025. (rfllc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
457 457 notice Notice (Other) Mon 04/21 1:16 PM
NOTICE by Motive Technologies, Inc. Motive's Notice of Claim Narrowing (Tarasi, Angela)
Related: [-]
455 455 trial Trial Brief Mon 04/21 7:00 AM
TRIAL BRIEF Motive's Brief on Wuestions Whether Omnitracs is an Exclusive Licensee by Motive Technologies, Inc.. (Tarasi, Angela)
Related: [-]
454 454 notice Notice (Other) Mon 04/21 6:40 AM
NOTICE by Omnitracs, LLC, SmartDrive Systems, Inc., XRS Corporation re450 Order Omnitracs' Response to the Court's Questions in Dkt. 450 re Omnitracs' Implied Exclusive License to the Asserted Patents (Schmidt, Leslie)
Related: [-]