Delaware District Court
Judge:Maryellen Noreika
Case #: 1:23-cv-01144
Nature of Suit835 Property Rights - Patent – Abbreviated New Drug Application
Cause35:1 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Oct 12, 2023
Terminated:Mar 11, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 09, 2024 4:31 AM EDT
Defendant
Caplin Steriles Ltd.
Defendant
Caplin Steriles USA Inc.
Plaintiff
Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH
Represented By
Ayyan S. Zubair
contact info
Shaobo Zhu
contact info
Michael J. Farnan
Farnan LLP
contact info
John Bennett
contact info
Brian E. Farnan
Farnan LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Fresenius Kabi USA, LLC
Represented By
Ayyan S. Zubair
contact info
Shaobo Zhu
contact info
Michael J. Farnan
Farnan LLP
contact info
John Bennett
contact info
Brian E. Farnan
Farnan LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
11 11 misc Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner of Patents Tue 03/12 2:19 PM
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s).(mdb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Monday, March 11, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 03/11 3:46 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH, Fresenius Kabi USA, LLC (Farnan, Michael)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Case - Civil Mon 03/11 4:15 PM
CASE CLOSED (dlw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
utility Add Attorneys - PHV only Wed 02/21 7:58 AM
Pro Hac Vice Attorney John Bennett for Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH and Fresenius Kabi USA, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 15, 2024
utility Add Attorneys - PHV only Thu 02/15 8:04 AM
Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Ayyan S. Zubair and Shaobo Zhu for Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH and Fresenius Kabi USA, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
order SO ORDERED Wed 02/14 8:27 AM
SO ORDERED re8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John Bennett, Shaobo Zhu, and Ayyan Zubair filed by Fresenius Kabi USA, LLC, Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 2/14/2024. (dlw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
9 9 misc -District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 03 Attorneys Credit Card Payment Tue 02/13 4:56 PM
Pro Hac Vice Fee - Credit Card Payment received for John Bennett, Shaobo Zhu, and Ayyan Zubair. ( re8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John Bennett, Shaobo Zhu, and Ayyan Zubair )( Payment of $ 150, receipt number ADEDC-4337777).(Farnan, Brian)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 02/13 4:54 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John Bennett, Shaobo Zhu, and Ayyan Zubair - filed by Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH, Fresenius Kabi USA, LLC. (Farnan, Brian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
7 7 motion Extension of Time to - Wed 02/07 11:03 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Complaint - filed by Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH, Fresenius Kabi USA, LLC.(Farnan, Michael) Modified on 2/7/2024 (dlw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
order SO ORDERED Wed 02/07 2:50 PM
SO ORDERED re7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Complaint - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the unopposed motion is GRANTED. The deadline to serve the complaint is extended until 3/11/2024. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 2/7/2024. (dlw)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
order SO ORDERED Fri 01/05 10:45 AM
SO ORDERED re6 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Complaint - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the unopposed motion is GRANTED. The deadline to serve the complaint is extended until 2/9/2024. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 1/5/2024. (dlw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2024
6 6 motion Extension of Time to - Thu 01/04 4:23 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Complaint [UNOPPOSED] - filed by Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH, Fresenius Kabi USA, LLC.(Farnan, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 10/18 10:39 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (nms)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
5 5 misc Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1 Fri 10/13 8:21 AM
Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Fresenius Kabi AG for Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH; Corporate Parent Fresenius Kabi Pharmaceuticals Holding, LLC for Fresenius Kabi USA, LLC. Fresenius Kabi Pharmaceuticals Holding, LLC is wholly-owned by Fresenius Kabi AG; and Fresenius Kabi AG is wholly-owned by Fresenius SE & Co. KGaA - filed by Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH, Fresenius Kabi USA, LLC. (vfm)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner of Patents Fri 10/13 8:16 AM
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 7,828,787 B2 ;US 7,857,802 B2. (vfm)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc ANDA Form Fri 10/13 8:15 AM
Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 09/01/2023. Date of Expiration of Patent: See Attached.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 3/1/2026. (vfm)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Magistrate Consent Forms Fri 10/13 8:13 AM
Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (vfm)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 10/13 8:12 AM
COMPLAINT for ANDA/PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed against Caplin Steriles Ltd., Caplin Steriles USA Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-4247290.) - filed by Fresenius Kabi USA, LLC, Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH. (vfm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet
service No Summons Issued Fri 10/13 8:23 AM
No Summons Issued. (vfm)
Related: [-]