California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:23-cr-02106
Case Filed:Oct 12, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Oct 15, 2023 12:25 AM PDT
Defendant
Juan Ramon Marin Mercado (1)
Represented By
Nora L. Stephens
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Federal Defenders
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info
Ashley Kaino-Allen
Doj-Usao
contact info

GPO Mar 29 2024
JUDGMENT as to Juan Ramon Marin Mercado (1), Count(s) 1, Custody BOP for 15 months. Three (3) years supervised release. Special assessment of $100.00 is remitted by government. No fine. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo (ddf)

Docket last updated: 01/24/2024 9:27 PM PST
Saturday, September 16, 2023
Arrest of Juan Ramon Marin Mercado (no document attached) (acc) [3:23-mj-03394-SBC]
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
1 1 4 pgs COMPLAINT as to Juan Ramon Marin Mercado.(acc) [3:23-mj-03394-SBC]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Info Sheet
2 2 Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Juan Ramon Marin Mercado: Initial Appearance set for 9/18/2023 before Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu. (no document attached) (fjp) [3:23-mj-03394-SBC]
Related: [-]
6 6 3 pgs ORDER OF DETENTION as to Juan Ramon Marin Mercado. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu on 9/18/2023. (cxl) [3:23-mj-03394-SBC]
Related: [-]
7 7 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Juan Ramon Marin Mercado (cxl) [3:23-mj-03394-SBC]
Related: [-]
8 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu: Initial Appearance as to Juan Ramon Marin Mercado held on 9/18/2023. Appointed Attorney Federal Defenders for Juan Ramon Marin Mercado. Detention Hearing as to Juan Ramon Marin Mercado held on 9/18/2023. USA oral motion for detention(Flight); motion granted as to Juan Ramon Marin Mercado. Defendant ordered detained without prejudice. Order of detention to be filed by Court. Bond set as to Juan Ramon Marin Mercado (1) No Bail. Rule 5 advisement provided. ( Preliminary Hearing set for 9/28/23 at 1:30pm before Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu. Arraignment set for 10/12/23 at 1:30pm before Magistrate Judge Steven B. Chu.) (Interpreter Edith Monroy). (CD# 9/18/2023 SBC 23-1:2:04-2:49). (Plaintiff Attorney Aaron McElhose, Joel Doolin AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Marc Levinson FD-S/A). (aje) [3:23-mj-03394-SBC]
Related: [-]
9 9 ***Spanish Interpreter needed as to Juan Ramon Marin Mercado (no document attached) (aje) [3:23-mj-03394-SBC]
Related: [-]
10 10 2 pgs ORDER as to Juan Ramon Marin Mercado: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu on 9/18/23. (aje) [3:23-mj-03394-SBC]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
3 3 1 pgs NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Nora L. Stephens appearing for Juan Ramon Marin Mercado (Stephens, Nora)Attorney Nora L. Stephens added to party Juan Ramon Marin Mercado(pty:dft)(stn). [3:23-mj-03394-SBC]
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs Notice of Assertion of Rights by Juan Ramon Marin Mercado (Stephens, Nora)(stn). [3:23-mj-03394-SBC]
Related: [-]
5 5 2 pgs NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Ashley Kaino-Allen appearing for USA. (Kaino-Allen, Ashley)Attorney Ashley Kaino-Allen added to party USA(pty:pla)(stn). [3:23-mj-03394-SBC]
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
11 11 1 pgs Order on Stipulated Continuance of a Preliminary Hearing as to Juan Ramon Marin Mercado. Preliminary Hearing continued to 10/12/2023 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu on 9/25/2023. (dls) [3:23-mj-03394-SBC]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
12 12 1 pgs NOTICE of Lodgment of Information by USA (Kaino-Allen, Ashley) (rxc). [3:23-mj-03394-SBC]
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
13 13 1 pgs INFORMATION as to Juan Ramon Marin Mercado (1) count(s) 1. (nbp)
Related: [-]
14 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu: Arraignment on Information as to Juan Ramon Marin Mercado (1) Count 1 held on 10/12/2023. Not Guilty plea entered. Defendant waived Indictment in open court. Motion Hearing/Trial Setting set for 11/20/2023 10:30 AM before Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo. (Interpreter Gabriela Sosa). (CD# 10/12/2023 SBC 200-215). (Plaintiff Attorney Joel Doolin, AUSA s/a). (Defendant Attorney Nora Stephens, FD). (dls)
Related: [-]