Texas Northern District Court
Case #: 4:23-cr-00277
Case Filed:Oct 12, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Oct 19, 2023 2:41 AM CDT
Defendant
Juan Jose Molina (1)
Represented By
Cynthia Michelle Barbare
Law Offices Of Barbare & Associates, L.L.C.
contact info
Christopher James Weinbel-FPD
Federal Public Defender'S Office
contact info
Pia R Lederman - FPD
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Frank L Gatto-DOJ
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/19/2023 2:40 AM CDT
Monday, August 28, 2023
Arrest of Juan Jose Molina (mcrd) [4:23-mj-00623-BP]
Related: [-]
1 1 5 pgs COMPLAINT as to Juan Jose Molina (1). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. (mcrd) [4:23-mj-00623-BP]
Related: [-]
2 2 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Juan Jose Molina. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 8/28/2023) (mcrd) [4:23-mj-00623-BP]
Related: [-]
3 3 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr: Initial Appearance as to Juan Jose Molina held on 8/28/2023. Date of Arrest: 8/28/2023; Deft executed financial affidavit; O/appointing FPD entered;The judge issued the oral order required by Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f)(1). Written order to follow; o/setting detention and preliminary hearing entered; O/temporary detention pending hearings entered; Deft remanded to custody. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Levi Thomas for Frank Gatto; Defense - Chris Weinbel. (No exhibits) Time in Court - :06. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (USPO Munoz.) (mcrd) [4:23-mj-00623-BP]
Related: [-]
4 4 (Document Restricted) CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Juan Jose Molina (mcrd) [4:23-mj-00623-BP]
Related: [-]
5 5 ELECTRONIC ORDER As to Juan Jose Molina: This written order is entered pursuant to Rule 5(f)(1) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, and is entered by the court on the first scheduled court date when both the prosecutor and defense counsel are present. By this order -- issued to the prosecution and defense counsel -- the court confirms the disclosure obligations of the prosecutor under Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny, and the possible consequences of violating such order under applicable law. Failure to do so may result in consequences such as the dismissal of the indictment or information, dismissal of individual charges, exclusion of evidence or witnesses, adverse jury instructions, contempt proceedings, and/or sanctions by the court. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 8/28/2023) (mcrd) [4:23-mj-00623-BP]
Related: [-]
6 6 MOTION for Pretrial Detention filed by USA as to Juan Jose Molina. (mcrd) [4:23-mj-00623-BP]
Related: [-]
7 7 ELECTRONIC ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Juan Jose Molina. Defendant is ordered detained pending a Detention and Preliminary Hearing set for 8/31/2023 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray Jr. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 8/28/2023) (mcrd) [4:23-mj-00623-BP]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 29, 2023
8 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Pia R Lederman - FPD (Clerk to Set Designation as: Federal Public Defender Appointment) appearing for Juan Jose Molina (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (If sealed documents that you are authorized to see were previously filed by U.S. Pretrial Services or U.S. Probation, you will require assistance to gain access to them and any related filings. Please call the clerk at 214.753.2240 during business hours to request access.) (Lederman - FPD, Pia) [4:23-mj-00623-BP]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 30, 2023
9 9 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney, added attorney Cynthia Michelle Barbare,Cynthia Michelle Barbare for Juan Jose Molina,Cynthia Michelle Barbare for Juan Jose Molina. Motion filed by Juan Jose Molina as to Juan Jose MolinaAttorney Cynthia Michelle Barbare added to party Juan Jose Molina(pty:dft) (Barbare, Cynthia) [4:23-mj-00623-BP]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
10 10 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting9 Motion to Substitute Attorney as to Juan Jose Molina (1). The Federal Public Defender is relieved from further representation. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 8/30/2023) (mcrd) [4:23-mj-00623-BP]
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 31, 2023
11 11 Joint MOTION to Continue Time to Indict filed by USA as to Juan Jose Molina (Gatto-DOJ, Frank) [4:23-mj-00623-BP]
Related: [-]
12 12 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr: Detention and Preliminary Hearing as to Juan Jose Molina held on 8/31/2023 ; Deft waive detention; o/detention pending trial entered; Govt witness Dempsey Addy, sworn and testified; Court finds PC; Deft remanded to custody. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Frank Gatto; Defense - Robert Simmons for Cynthia Barbare. (No exhibits) Time in Court - :27. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (USPO Lee.) (mcrd) [4:23-mj-00623-BP]
Related: [-]
13 13 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL granting6 Motion for Detention as to Juan Jose Molina (1) (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 8/31/2023) (mcrd) [4:23-mj-00623-BP]
Related: [-]
14 14 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting11 Joint Motion to Continue Time to Indict as to Juan Jose Molina (1) until October 30, 2023 for the reasons stated in the joint motion and because the ends of justice served by the granting of such continuance outweigh the best interests of the public and the defendant in a speedy trial. [see 18 USC 3161 (h)(7)(A) and (h)(7)(B)(iv)] (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 8/31/2023) (mcrd) [4:23-mj-00623-BP]
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
15 15 3 pgs INDICTMENT with Forfeiture Notice as to Juan Jose Molina (1) count 1. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. (bdb)
Related: [-]
17 17 ELECTRONIC ORDER as to Juan Jose Molina: Arraignment set for 10/18/2023 09:30 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 2nd Floor, 501 W. 10th St. Fort Worth, TX 76102-3673 before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton. Attorneys and Defendant to be in the courtroom 15 minutes prior to the hearing start time. Waivers of arraignment are encouraged. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 10/12/2023) (mcrd)
Related: [-]