Texas Western District Court
Case #: 5:23-mj-01436
Case Filed:Oct 12, 2023
Terminated:Oct 12, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Oct 15, 2023 2:23 AM CDT
Plaintiff
USA
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Ronald Joseph Edwards (1)
Terminated: 10/12/2023
Represented By
Duty Pub. Defender-San Antonio
Federal Public Defender
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/15/2023 3:39 AM CDT
Thursday, October 12, 2023
1 1 Arrest - Within District as to Ronald Joseph Edwards for case number DR:11-cr-94 in our district. (bt)
Related: [-]
2 2 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney:Initial Appearance on Revocation Proceedings as to Ronald Joseph Edwards held on 10/12/2023. Defendant requests appointment of counsel. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter FTR Gold.) (bt)
Related: [-]
3 3 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Ronald Joseph Edwards (SEALED pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002). (bt)
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Ronald Joseph Edwards Duty Pub. Defender-San Antonio for Ronald Joseph Edwards appointed.. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (bt)
Related: [-]
5 5 COMMITMENT TO ANOTHER DISTRICT/DIVISION as to Ronald Joseph Edwards. Defendant committed to WD/TX, Del Rio Division.. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (bt)
Related: [-]