Georgia Southern District Court
Judge:J Randal Hall
Referred: Brian K Epps
Case #: 6:23-cv-00059
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Oct 13, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Apr 11, 2024 5:19 AM EDT
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By
Grant Edward Lavelle Schnell
Jones Day
contact info
Plaintiff
Laura Lane Newton
Represented By
Jenna Dakroub
Consumer Attorneys PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 81 minutes ago
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
44 44 notice Notice (Other) Wed 01/08 11:04 AM
NOTICE by Laura Lane Newton of Change of Firm Name and Contact Information (Dakroub, Jenna)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
43 43 misc Transcript Filed Notification Thu 10/03 3:50 PM
Court Reporter Notification that Transcript re41 has been filed in the District Court on 10/3/2024. (Davenport, Lisa)
Related: [-]
42 42 misc Transcript Thu 10/03 3:48 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Teleconference Proceedings held on 1/10/2024, before Judge BKE. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Davenport, Telephone number 706-823-6468. Tape Number: FTR. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. (Transcript Redaction Policy Issued or Click here to view[LINK:Transcript Redaction Policy] ) Redaction Request due 10/24/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/4/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/2/2025. (Davenport, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
41 41 misc Court Reporter Acknowledgement Wed 09/04 1:22 PM
Court Reporter Acknowledgement Form filed re40 that payment arrangements have been made on 9/4/2024. (Davenport, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
40 40 misc Transcript Request Thu 08/22 11:46 AM
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Laura Lane Newton for proceedings held on 01/10/2024 before Judge Brian K. Epps.. (Dakroub, Jenna)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
utility Case Stayed Tue 08/13 10:57 AM
Case Stayed (pts)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
39 39 notice Notice (Other) Mon 08/12 12:26 PM
NOTICE by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. re34 Notice of Appeal of Automatic Stay (Schnell, Grant)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
38 38 1 pgs order Order Thu 08/08 12:03 PM
ORDER directing the parties to conduct a conference and file a joint 26(f) Report by the close of business Monday, August 19, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 8/4/2024. (maa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Rule 26(f) Report
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
37 37 misc Transcript Request Wed 08/07 2:40 PM
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST Per 11th Cir. R. 10-1 by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. No Hearing. (Schnell, Grant) (csr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (8/7/2024) Flattened PDF
Monday, August 05, 2024
36 36 appeal USCA Case Number Mon 08/05 11:57 AM
USCA Case Number 24-12398 G for34 Notice of Appeal filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (cmr)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
35 35 appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA Mon 07/22 12:40 PM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to U.S. Court of Appeals re:34 Notice of Appeal. Other Appeals: No. Judge Appealed: J. Randal Hall. Court Reporter: Lisa Davenport. Fee Paid: Yes. Pending COA/IFP: N/A. (csr)
Related: [-]
appeal FRAP Certificate of Readiness Mon 07/22 12:41 PM
F.R.A.P. Certificate of Readiness re34 Notice of Appeal. The entire record on appeal is available electronically . (csr)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
34 34 appeal Notice of Appeal Fri 07/19 6:28 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Filing fee $ 605, receipt number AGASDC-3866807. (Schnell, Grant)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
33 33 17 pgs order Order on Motion to Compel Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Thu 07/18 3:06 PM
ORDER denying re17 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part re21 MOTION to Exclude the Declaration of Dan Smith. This case SHALL proceed to trial at a date set by the Court on the issue of whether an arbitration agreement exists. Furthermore, the Court LIFTS the stay of discovery and DIRECTS the Parties to file an updated Rule 26(f) report within SEVEN (7) DAYS of this Order in compliance with the Court's February 20, 2024 Order. Signed by District Judge J. Randal Hall on 7/18/24. (loh)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
32 32 notice Notice (Other) Fri 05/31 4:02 AM
NOTICE by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. re17 MOTION to Compel Arbitration of Supplemental Authority(Schnell, Grant)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Myers v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Friday, May 03, 2024
31 31 respoth Response Fri 05/03 3:22 AM
RESPONSE to30 Notice (Other) filed by Laura Lane Newton filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Schnell, Grant)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
30 30 notice Notice (Other) Fri 04/26 8:19 PM
NOTICE by Laura Lane Newton re19 Response in Opposition to Motion,, of Supplemental Authority(Dakroub, Jenna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A. Lamonaco Order
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
29 29 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 02/28 5:11 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re21 MOTION to Exclude the Declaration of Dan Smith filed in Support of Experian Information Solutions, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Arbitration re17 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Laura Lane Newton. (Dakroub, Jenna)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2024
28 28 notice Notice of Intent Thu 02/22 4:43 PM
NOTICE of Intent to File Reply Pursuant to Local Rule 7.3 by Laura Lane Newton re21 MOTION to Exclude the Declaration of Dan Smith filed in Support of Experian Information Solutions, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Arbitration re17 MOTION to Compel Arbitration ,25 Response,, Response in Opposition to Motion,. (Dakroub, Jenna)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
27 27 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Order on Motion for Extension of Time Order on Motion for Protective Order Tue 02/20 12:47 PM
ORDER granting re18 Motion to Stay Discovery; denying as moot re23 Motion for Extension of Time; denying as moot re24 Motion for Protective Order. The Court STAYS all discovery in this action pending resolution of Defendant's re17 motion to compel arbitration. Should any portion of the case remain after resolution of the motion, the parties shall confer and submit a Rule 26(f) Report, with proposed case deadlines, within seven days of the presiding District Judge's ruling. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 2/20/24. (loh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
26 26 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 02/14 2:54 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re18 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Schnell, Grant)
Related: [-]
25 25 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 02/14 12:51 PM
RESPONSE, RESPONSE in Opposition re21 MOTION to Exclude the Declaration of Dan Smith filed in Support of Experian Information Solutions, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Arbitration re17 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Schnell, Grant)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Referred Wed 02/14 9:29 AM
MOTIONS REFERRED:23 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Furnish Plaintiff's Expert Witness Report,24 MOTION for Protective Order. (csr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
24 24 misc Stipulation Tue 02/13 6:16 PM
STIPULATION for Entry of Protective Order by Laura Lane Newton. (Dakroub, Jenna)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Extension of Time Tue 02/13 6:08 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Furnish Plaintiff's Expert Witness Report , by Laura Lane Newton. Responses due by 2/27/2024.(Dakroub, Jenna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Wed 02/14 9:28 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to24 MOTION for Protective Order. Responses due by 2/27/2024. (csr)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
22 22 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 02/12 1:09 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re17 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Schnell, Grant)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Reply Declaration of Dan Smith
Friday, February 02, 2024
21 21 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 02/02 6:35 PM
MOTION to Exclude the Declaration of Dan Smith filed in Support of Experian Information Solutions, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Arbitration re17 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Laura Lane Newton. Responses due by 2/16/2024. (Dakroub, Jenna)
Related: [-]
20 20 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 02/02 6:12 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re18 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Laura Lane Newton. (Dakroub, Jenna)
Related: [-]
19 19 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 02/02 6:10 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re17 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Laura Lane Newton.(Dakroub, Jenna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A. Yates v. Experian - Experian's Objection Letter,
Att: 2 Exhibit B. Declaration of Plaintiff Laura Newton,
Att: 3 Exhibit C. Austin v. Experian - Memo Opinion of Senior District Judge Robert E. Payne,
Att: 4 Exhibit D. Austin v. Experian - Declaration of David Williams,
Att: 5 Exhibit E. Declaration of Jenna Dakroub,
Att: 6 Exhibit F. Kinkle v. Experian - Declaration of Dan Smith,
Att: 7 Exhibit G. Stagger v. Experian - Memo Opinion and Order of Magistrate Judge Jeffrey Cole
Monday, January 22, 2024
utility Motions Referred Mon 01/22 9:41 AM
MOTIONS REFERRED:18 MOTION to Stay Discovery; 17 MOTION to Compel Arbitration. (csr)
Related: [-]
utility Motions No Longer Referred Mon 01/22 11:05 AM
Motions No Longer Referred:17 MOTION to Compel Arbitration (pts)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
18 18 motion Stay Fri 01/19 6:43 PM
MOTION to Stay Discovery by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Responses due by 2/2/2024.(Schnell, Grant)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Ferrell v. AppFolio, Inc. (C.D. Cal),
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Stephens v. Experian Info. Solutions, Inc. (D. Haw.),
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Wilmers v. Experian Info. Solutions, Inc. (D. Minn.)
17 17 motion Compel Fri 01/19 6:31 PM
MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Responses due by 2/2/2024.(Schnell, Grant)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of Dan Smith
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
16 16 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Compel Order on Motion for Sanctions Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 01/10 3:55 PM
Revised Scheduling ORDER finding as moot12 Motion to Compel and Motion for Sanctions; granting 15 Motion to revise the Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 01/10/2024. (jlh)
Related: [-]
14 14 minutes Motion Hearing Wed 01/10 2:34 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held by telephone before Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps: Motion Hearing by telephone held on 1/10/2024 re12 MOTION to Compel FRCP 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures MOTION for Sanctions filed by Laura Lane Newton. Plaintiffs Motion to Compel (doc. no. 12) is MOOT because Defendant agreed to serve initial disclosures by this Friday and Plaintiff agreed to abandon all other relief requested. The Court will enter an order granting Plaintiff's oral motion to extend all deadlines by one month. (Court Reporter FTR.) (cjc)
Related: [-]
motion Extension of Time Wed 01/10 2:40 PM
ORAL MOTION to extend all deadlines by one month, by Laura Lane Newton. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(cjc)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 01/10 3:59 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 2/16/2024; Discovery due by 6/27/2024; Expert Witness Report (Plaintiff) due by 3/18/2024; Expert Witness Report (Defendant) due by 5/28/2024; Motions due by 7/29/2024; and Status Report due by 6/27/2024. (jlh)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
utility Motions Referred Mon 01/08 8:52 AM
MOTIONS REFERRED:12 MOTION to Compel FRCP 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures MOTION for Sanctions (thb)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Hearing on Motion Mon 01/08 1:10 PM
NOTICE of Hearing by telephone on Motion12 MOTION to Compel FRCP 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures MOTION for Sanctions : Motion Hearing by telephone set for 1/10/2024 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps. Please dial 877-336-1829, enter code 5508163 and enter password 0059 to access the teleconference.(cjc)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
12 12 motion Compel Sanctions Fri 01/05 9:05 PM
******* MOTION to Compel FRCP 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures , MOTION for Sanctions by Laura Lane Newton. Responses due by 1/19/2024.(Dakroub, Jenna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A. Email Communications,
Att: 2 Exhibit B. Alvarado v. W. Range Ass'n Order,
Att: 3 Exhibit C. Myers v. Experian Dispute,
Att: 4 Exhibit D. Myers v. Experian Order
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
11 11 order Scheduling Order Wed 01/03 4:05 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 1/26/2024. Discovery due by 5/28/2024. Motions due by 6/27/2024. Expert Witness Report (Plaintiff) due by 2/16/2024. Expert Witness Report (defendant) due by 3/18/2024. Status Report due by 5/28/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 1/3/24. (loh)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Referred Wed 01/03 9:06 AM
MOTIONS REFERRED:10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (csr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
10 10 motion Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Tue 01/02 7:41 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting.(Dakroub, Jenna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Addendum to Joint Report
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
9 9 misc Litigants' Bill of Rights Wed 11/29 9:26 AM
Litigants' Bill of Rights by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Schnell, Grant)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 11/27 11:09 AM
ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Schnell, Grant)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Clerk's Extension of Time (LR 6.1) Tue 11/07 2:31 PM
ORDER granting consent5 Motion for Clerk's Extension of Time (LR 6.1) to Respond to Plaintiff's1 Complaint. Experian's Information Solutions, Inc., Answer is due through and including November 27, 2023. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 11/7/2023. (csr)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.1) Tue 11/07 12:53 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.1) by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Schnell, Grant)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Clerks Extension of Time (LR 6.1) Tue 11/07 12:50 PM
Consent Motion for Clerks Extension of Time (LR 6.1) to Respond to Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Responses due by 11/21/2023.(Schnell, Grant)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 11/07 2:32 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., answer due 11/27/2023. (csr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 26, 2023
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 10/26 8:31 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Laura Lane Newton. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 10/20/2023, answer due 11/13/2023. (Dakroub, Jenna)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 16, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 10/16 8:55 AM
Summons Issued as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (loh)
Related: [-]
2 2 7 pgs order Order Mon 10/16 8:55 AM
RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 10/16/23. (loh)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 13, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 10/16 8:51 AM
COMPLAINT against Experian Information Solutions, Inc., filed by Laura Lane Newton.(loh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
misc Filing Fee Received Mon 10/16 8:52 AM
Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number AGASDC-3681920. (loh)
Related: [-]