California Eastern District Court
Judge:Jennifer L Thurston
Referred: Christopher D Baker
Case #: 1:23-cv-01470
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Oct 13, 2023
Terminated:Jan 10, 2024
Case in other court:Kern County Superior Court, BCV-23-103066
Last checked: Thursday Apr 11, 2024 2:13 AM PDT
Defendant
Dragados USA, Inc.
Represented By
Barbara A. Cotter
Cook Brown, LLP
contact info
Alexis M. Gabrielson
Cook Brown, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Flatiron Construction Corp.
Represented By
Cindy Ariel Kaoud
Fisher & Phillips
contact info
Lonnie D. Giamela
Fisher & Phillips
contact info
Defendant
Flatiron West, Inc.
Represented By
Cindy Ariel Kaoud
Fisher & Phillips
contact info
Lonnie D. Giamela
Fisher & Phillips
contact info
Defendant
Sukut Construction Inc.
Represented By
Mia Angelina Lomedico
Atkinson, Adelson, Loya, Ruud & Romo
contact info
Plaintiff
James Gaefcke
Represented By
David Harmik Yeremian
David Yeremian & Associates, Inc.
contact info
Emil Davtyan
D.Law, Inc.
contact info
Roman Shkodnik
D.Law, Inc.
contact info

GPO Oct 26 2023
Order on Stipulation Extending Defendant Sukut Construction LLC's Deadline to File a Responsive Pleading (Doc. 12) signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker on 10/25/2023. Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's complaint due by 11/9/2023. (Yang, Pa Gnia)
GPO Nov 06 2023
ORDER on 14 Stipulation Extending Defendants Flatiron West, Inc. and Sukut Construction LLC's Deadline to File a Responsive Pleading, signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker on 11/6/2023. (Hall, S)
GPO Dec 19 2023
STIPULATION and ORDER 19 Extending Time for Parties to File Dispositional Documents As Modiifed, signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker on 12/19/2023. Dispositional docs due by 1/8/2024. (Hall, S)
GPO Jan 10 2024
ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Close Case Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; Clerk of Court to Assign District Judge signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker on 1/9/2024. CASE CLOSED.(Xiong, J.)

Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
23 23 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Wed 01/10 12:14 PM
ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Close Case Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; Clerk of Court to Assign District Judge signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker on 1/9/2024. CASE CLOSED.(Xiong, J.)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case Wed 01/10 12:03 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. The new case number is: 1:23-cv-01470-JLT-CDB. (Xiong, J.)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
21 21 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Mon 01/08 4:20 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal of Action by James Gaefcke.(Shkodnik, Roman)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
20 20 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Tue 12/19 11:07 AM
STIPULATION and ORDER19 Extending Time for Parties to File Dispositional Documents As Modiifed , signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker on 12/19/2023. Dispositional docs due by 1/8/2024. (Hall, S)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
19 19 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Mon 12/18 4:41 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to File for Dismissal re 17 Minute Order,,, Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings,, by James Gaefcke.(Shkodnik, Roman)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Friday, December 01, 2023
18 18 2 pgs misc Order Reassigning No District Court Judge (NODJ) Fri 12/01 2:56 PM
ORDER by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: Due to the elevation of U.S. District Judge Ana I. de Alba to the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals, the court finds it necessary to temporarily reassign this case to No District Court Judge (NODJ) until a new district judge is appointed. (Nguyen, J)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 17, 2023
17 17 order Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Fri 11/17 2:26 PM
MINUTE ORDER (Text Only Entry), signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker on 11/17/2023: Following the filing of the parties' Notice of Settlement on November 16, 2023 (Doc.16 ), all discovery dates, hearings, filing requirements and conferences are HEREBY VACATED. The parties are DIRECTED to file dispositional documents by no later than December 18, 2023, or, on or before that date, show cause to extend the time for filing dispositional documents. See Local Rule 160(b). Absent extraordinary circumstances, the Court disfavors retaining jurisdiction over the terms of performance under a settlement agreement. (Hall, S)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 16, 2023
16 16 notice Notice of Settlement Thu 11/16 4:10 PM
NOTICE of SETTLEMENT by Flatiron West, Inc.. Dispositional Docs due by 1/16/2024. (Kaoud, Cindy)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 06, 2023
15 15 2 pgs order Order Mon 11/06 12:55 PM
ORDER on14 Stipulation Extending Defendants Flatiron West, Inc. and Sukut Construction LLC's Deadline to File a Responsive Pleading, signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker on 11/6/2023. (Hall, S)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 02, 2023
14 14 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Thu 11/02 4:41 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for FURTHER EXTENDING DEFENDANTS FLATIRON WEST, INC. AND SUKUT CONSTUCTION LLCS DEADLINE TO FILE A RESPONSIVE PLEADING re12 Stipulation and Proposed Order,11 Stipulation by Flatiron West, Inc..(Kaoud, Cindy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order to Further Extend Defendants Flatiron West, Inc. and Sukut Construction, LLC's Deadline to File a Responsive Pleading
Thursday, October 26, 2023
13 13 1 pgs order Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - 1 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Thu 10/26 1:50 PM
Order on Stipulation Extending Defendant Sukut Construction LLC's Deadline to File a Responsive Pleading (Doc.12 ) signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker on 10/25/2023. Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's complaint due by 11/9/2023. (Yang, Pa Gnia)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 24, 2023
12 12 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 10/24 12:24 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extend Defendant Sukut Construction LLC's Deadline to File a Responsive Pleading by Sukut Construction Inc.. Attorney Lomedico, Mia Angelina added.(Lomedico, Mia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, October 20, 2023
11 11 misc Stipulation Fri 10/20 4:36 PM
STIPULATION to Extend Defendant Flatiron West, Inc.'s Deadline to File a Responsive Pleading by Flatiron West, Inc.. (Giamela, Lonnie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2023
10 10 notice Notice of Interested Parties Thu 10/19 12:12 PM
NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by James Gaefcke. (Shkodnik, Roman)
Related: [-]
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 10/19 11:43 AM
ANSWER by Dragados USA, Inc..(Cotter, Barbara)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Consent/Decline of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Thu 10/19 11:41 AM
CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Cotter, Barbara)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Interested Parties Thu 10/19 11:40 AM
NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Dragados USA, Inc.. (Cotter, Barbara)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Thu 10/19 11:38 AM
NOTICE of Joinder by Dragados USA, Inc. re1 Notice of Removal,. Attorney Cotter, Barbara A. added. (Cotter, Barbara)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 16, 2023
5 5 misc Consent/Decline of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Mon 10/16 1:00 PM
CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Shkodnik, Roman)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Civil New Case Documents for ADA Mon 10/16 10:23 AM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/12/2024 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield (CDB) before Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker. (Xiong, J.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Standing Order,
Att: 2 Worksheet,
Att: 3 Consent Form,
Att: 4 VDRP
Friday, October 13, 2023
3 3 NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) by Flatiron Construction Corp.. (Giamela, Lonnie)
Related: [-]
2 2 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Flatiron Construction Corp.. (Giamela, Lonnie)
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Kern, case number BCV-23-103066 by James Gaefcke. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-11130451)(Giamela, Lonnie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Declaration Declaration of Lonnie D. Giamela,
Att: 3 Declaration Declaration of Jessica Knight