Puerto Rico District Court
Judge:Silvia L Carreno-Coll
Referred: Marcos E Lopez
Case #: 3:23-cv-01521
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Oct 16, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Apr 13, 2024 4:43 AM AST
Defendant
Glen Acevedo
Represented By
Jose R. Olmo-Rodriguez
contact info
Defendant
AIP Holdings LLC
Represented By
Luis Fernando Llach-Zuniga
Casillas, Santiago & Torres, LLC
contact info
Julian R. Rodriguez-Munoz
Dmr Law
contact info
Javier Micheo-Marcial
Dmr Law LLC
contact info
Juan J. Casillas-Ayala
Casillas, Santiago & Torres, LLC
contact info
Maria A. Dominguez-Victoriano
Dmr Law LLC
contact info
Defendant
ACE LLC
221 Ponce de Leon Avenue 5th Floor
San Juan, PR 00917
Defendant
Farah Vayani
Represented By
Jorge Martinez-Luciano
Martinez-Luciano & Rodriguez-Escudero Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
Tygate Pte. Ltd.
Represented By
Bamily Lopez-Ortiz
Lopez Toro, Estudio De Derecho & Notaria
contact info
Francisco A. Feliu-Nigaglioni, I
Business Law Pr, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Thinking Ahead LLC
221 Ponce de Leon Avenue 5th Floor
San Juan, PR 00917
Represented By
Daniel Branower
Russo PLLC
contact info
Robert Sidorsky
Russo PLLC
contact info
Martin P Russo
Russo PLLC
contact info
Rimma Ayzen
Russo PLLC
contact info
Harold D. Vicente-Colon
Vicente & Cuebas
contact info
Defendant
Syber Group LLC
300 Avenida La Sierra Del Rio, Q-10 Apartment 176, Calle 6
San Juan, PR 00926
Represented By
Jorge Martinez-Luciano
Martinez-Luciano & Rodriguez-Escudero Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
Saira Ghaffar
Defendant
Fahad Ghaffar
Represented By
Jose A. Andreu-Fuentes
Andreu & Sagardia Law Office
contact info
Daniel Branower
Russo PLLC
contact info
Robert Sidorsky
Russo PLLC
contact info
Alfredo M Umpierre-Soler
contact info
Martin P Russo
Russo PLLC
contact info
Howard Foster
Foster PC
contact info
Rimma Ayzen
Russo PLLC
contact info
Harold D. Vicente-Colon
Vicente & Cuebas
contact info
Defendant
GGSG LLC
221 Ponce de Leon Avenue, 5th Floor
San Juan, PR 00917
Represented By
Manuel San-Juan-DeMartino
Manuel San Juan Law Office
contact info
Defendant
Glendaliz Acevedo-Martinez
Represented By
Manuel San-Juan-DeMartino
Manuel San Juan Law Office
contact info
Defendant
Nerissa Aponte
Represented By
Thomas Trebilcock-Horan
Trebilcock & Rovira, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Coverisq LLC
Represented By
Bamily Lopez-Ortiz
Lopez Toro, Estudio De Derecho & Notaria
contact info
Francisco A. Feliu-Nigaglioni, I
Business Law Pr, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Amir Ghaffar
Represented By
Bamily Lopez-Ortiz
Lopez Toro, Estudio De Derecho & Notaria
contact info
Francisco A. Feliu-Nigaglioni, I
Business Law Pr, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
SJ Beach PR LLC
250 Munoz Rivera Avenue Floor 6
San Juan, PR 00918
Represented By
Luis Fernando Llach-Zuniga
Casillas, Santiago & Torres, LLC
contact info
Julian R. Rodriguez-Munoz
Dmr Law
contact info
Javier Micheo-Marcial
Dmr Law LLC
contact info
Juan J. Casillas-Ayala
Casillas, Santiago & Torres, LLC
contact info
Maria A. Dominguez-Victoriano
Dmr Law LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Duo Condado JV Holdings LLC
Popular Center, Floor 19 208 Ponce de Leon Avenue
San Juan, PR 00918
Represented By
Luis Fernando Llach-Zuniga
Casillas, Santiago & Torres, LLC
contact info
Julian R. Rodriguez-Munoz
Dmr Law
contact info
Javier Micheo-Marcial
Dmr Law LLC
contact info
Juan J. Casillas-Ayala
Casillas, Santiago & Torres, LLC
contact info
Maria A. Dominguez-Victoriano
Dmr Law LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Regency Acquisition LLC
Popular Center, Floor 19 208 Ponce de Leon Avenue
San Juan, PR 00918
Represented By
Luis Fernando Llach-Zuniga
Casillas, Santiago & Torres, LLC
contact info
Julian R. Rodriguez-Munoz
Dmr Law
contact info
Javier Micheo-Marcial
Dmr Law LLC
contact info
Juan J. Casillas-Ayala
Casillas, Santiago & Torres, LLC
contact info
Maria A. Dominguez-Victoriano
Dmr Law LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Bahia Beach Holding Company LLC
251 Little Falls Drive
New Castle, DE 19808
Represented By
Luis Fernando Llach-Zuniga
Casillas, Santiago & Torres, LLC
contact info
Julian R. Rodriguez-Munoz
Dmr Law
contact info
Javier Micheo-Marcial
Dmr Law LLC
contact info
Juan J. Casillas-Ayala
Casillas, Santiago & Torres, LLC
contact info
Maria A. Dominguez-Victoriano
Dmr Law LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Paulson PRV Holdings LLC
251 Little Falls Drive Wilmington
New Castle, DE 19808
Represented By
Luis Fernando Llach-Zuniga
Casillas, Santiago & Torres, LLC
contact info
Julian R. Rodriguez-Munoz
Dmr Law
contact info
Javier Micheo-Marcial
Dmr Law LLC
contact info
Juan J. Casillas-Ayala
Casillas, Santiago & Torres, LLC
contact info
Maria A. Dominguez-Victoriano
Dmr Law LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
AIP PR Holdings LLC
Popular Center, Floor 19 208 Ponce de Leon Avenue
San Juan, PR 00918
Represented By
Luis Fernando Llach-Zuniga
Casillas, Santiago & Torres, LLC
contact info
Julian R. Rodriguez-Munoz
Dmr Law
contact info
Javier Micheo-Marcial
Dmr Law LLC
contact info
Juan J. Casillas-Ayala
Casillas, Santiago & Torres, LLC
contact info
Maria A. Dominguez-Victoriano
Dmr Law LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Bahia Beach CH Development LLC
Villas de San Francisco Plaza I 89 De Diego Avenue, Suite 201
San Juan, PR 00927
Represented By
Luis Fernando Llach-Zuniga
Casillas, Santiago & Torres, LLC
contact info
Julian R. Rodriguez-Munoz
Dmr Law
contact info
Javier Micheo-Marcial
Dmr Law LLC
contact info
Juan J. Casillas-Ayala
Casillas, Santiago & Torres, LLC
contact info
Maria A. Dominguez-Victoriano
Dmr Law LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Bahia Beach Resort LLC
Villas de San Francisco Plaza I 89 De Diego Avenue
San Juan, PR 00927
Represented By
Luis Fernando Llach-Zuniga
Casillas, Santiago & Torres, LLC
contact info
Julian R. Rodriguez-Munoz
Dmr Law
contact info
Javier Micheo-Marcial
Dmr Law LLC
contact info
Juan J. Casillas-Ayala
Casillas, Santiago & Torres, LLC
contact info
Maria A. Dominguez-Victoriano
Dmr Law LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Condado Duo La Concha SPV LLC
208 Ponce de Leon Avenue
San Juan, PR 00918
Represented By
Luis Fernando Llach-Zuniga
Casillas, Santiago & Torres, LLC
contact info
Julian R. Rodriguez-Munoz
Dmr Law
contact info
Javier Micheo-Marcial
Dmr Law LLC
contact info
Juan J. Casillas-Ayala
Casillas, Santiago & Torres, LLC
contact info
Maria A. Dominguez-Victoriano
Dmr Law LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Condado Duo Vanderbilt Hotel Towers SPV, LLC
208 Ponce de Leon Avenue
San Juan, PR 00918
Represented By
Luis Fernando Llach-Zuniga
Casillas, Santiago & Torres, LLC
contact info
Julian R. Rodriguez-Munoz
Dmr Law
contact info
Javier Micheo-Marcial
Dmr Law LLC
contact info
Juan J. Casillas-Ayala
Casillas, Santiago & Torres, LLC
contact info
Maria A. Dominguez-Victoriano
Dmr Law LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Condado Duo Vanderbilt SPV, LLC
208 Ponce de Leon Avenue
San Juan, PR 00918
Represented By
Luis Fernando Llach-Zuniga
Casillas, Santiago & Torres, LLC
contact info
Julian R. Rodriguez-Munoz
Dmr Law
contact info
Javier Micheo-Marcial
Dmr Law LLC
contact info
Juan J. Casillas-Ayala
Casillas, Santiago & Torres, LLC
contact info
Maria A. Dominguez-Victoriano
Dmr Law LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Duo Condado Holding LLC
Represented By
Luis Fernando Llach-Zuniga
Casillas, Santiago & Torres, LLC
contact info
Julian R. Rodriguez-Munoz
Dmr Law
contact info
Javier Micheo-Marcial
Dmr Law LLC
contact info
Juan J. Casillas-Ayala
Casillas, Santiago & Torres, LLC
contact info
Maria A. Dominguez-Victoriano
Dmr Law LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Ocean Drive Development, LLC
208 Ponce de Leon Avenue Floor 19
San Juan, PR 00918
Represented By
Luis Fernando Llach-Zuniga
Casillas, Santiago & Torres, LLC
contact info
Julian R. Rodriguez-Munoz
Dmr Law
contact info
Javier Micheo-Marcial
Dmr Law LLC
contact info
Juan J. Casillas-Ayala
Casillas, Santiago & Torres, LLC
contact info
Maria A. Dominguez-Victoriano
Dmr Law LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM AST
Thursday, March 13, 2025
218 218 order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Thu 03/13 4:29 PM
ORDER granting217 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Bamily Lopez-Ortiz is deemed withdrawn from the case. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 3/13/2025. (mcv)
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 08, 2025
217 217 motion Withdraw as Attorney Sat 03/08 12:25 PM
MOTION to Withdraw Attorney as to Bamily Lopez-Ortiz filed by Bamily Lopez-Ortiz on behalf of Coverisq LLC, Amir Ghaffar, Tygate Pte. Ltd.. Responses due by 3/24/2025. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lopez-Ortiz, Bamily)
Related: [-]