Iconic Brands, Inc.
New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Alan S Trust |
Case #: | 8:23-bk-73829 |
Case Filed: | Oct 16, 2023 |
Creditor Meeting: | Apr 24, 2024 |
Claims Deadline: | May 22, 2024 |
Converted: | Jan 05, 2024 |
Discharge Objection Deadline: | Apr 08, 2024 |
Debtor
Iconic Brands, Inc.
44 Seabro Ave
Amityville, NY 11701-1202 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Petitioning Creditor
Arena Investors, LP
405 Lexington Ave. 59th Floor
New York, NY 10174 |
Represented By
|
Petitioning Creditor
Arena Finance Markets, LP
405 Lexington Ave. 59th Floor
New York, NY 10174 |
Represented By
|
Petitioning Creditor
Arena Special Opportunities Partners I, LP
405 Lexington Ave. 59th Floor
New York, NY 10174 |
Represented By
|
Trustee
Robert Pryor
Pryor & Mandelup LLP 675 Old Country Road
Westbury, NY 11590 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Long Island Federal Courthouse 560 Federal Plaza - Room 560
Central Islip, NY 11722 |
|
US Trustee Trial Attorney
Stan Y Yang
Office of the United States Trustee Central Islip Office Alfonse M D'Amato US Courthouse 560 Federal Plaza
Central Islip, NY 11722 |
Docket last updated: 04/08/2024 11:25 AM EDT |
Monday, October 16, 2023 | ||
crditcrd
Automatic docket of credit card/debit card
Mon 10/16 12:48 PM
Receipt of Involuntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:8 23-73829 ) [misc,ivol11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A22046304. Fee amount 1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
court
Prior Filings
Mon 10/16 2:57 PM
[LINK:Prior Filing] Case Number(s): 8 11-76814 reg Case closed on 3/6/2013 (hrm) |
||
court
Case Related to a Chapter 11
Mon 10/16 3:00 PM
The above case is related to Case Number(s) 8 23-72310 ast, TopPop LLC (hrm) |
||
1 | 1
4
pgs
misc
Involuntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Mon 10/16 12:45 PM
Chapter 11 Involuntary Petition Against a Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738 Re: Iconic Brands, Inc. Filed by Petitioning Creditor(s): Arena Investors, LP (attorney Keri Costello), Arena Finance Markets, LP (attorney Keri Costello), Arena Special Opportunities Partners I, LP (attorney Keri Costello). (Costello, Keri) |
|
2 | 2
2
pgs
court
Involuntary Summons Issued
Mon 10/16 3:04 PM
Involuntary Summons Issued on Debtor Iconic Brands, Inc. (hrm) |