Hawaii District Court
Judge:Shanlyn AS Park
Referred: Wes Reber Porter
Case #: 1:23-cv-00423
Nature of Suit362 Torts - Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice
Cause28:2671 Federal Tort Claims Act
Case Filed:Oct 16, 2023
Terminated:May 05, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 12, 2024 10:34 PM HST
Defendant
United States of America
Represented By
Edric Ming-Kai Ching
Office Of The United States Attorney
contact info
Tracy Weinstein
Assistant U.S. Attorney
contact info
Defendant
Doe Defendants 1-10
Plaintiff
Emily K. Bermingham
Represented By
James Blaine Rogers, III
Davis Levin Livingston
contact info
Mark S. Davis
Davis Levin Livingston Grande
contact info
Michael K. Livingston
Davis Levin Livingston
contact info
Loretta A. Sheehan
Davis Levin Livingston
contact info
Plaintiff
David C. Bermingham
Represented By
James Blaine Rogers, III
Davis Levin Livingston
contact info
Mark S. Davis
Davis Levin Livingston Grande
contact info
Michael K. Livingston
Davis Levin Livingston
contact info
Loretta A. Sheehan
Davis Levin Livingston
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Craig R. Bottoni
Terminated: 10/24/2023
Defendant
Christian Cruz
Terminated: 10/24/2023


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
89 89 order Stipulation for Dismissal and Order Mon 05/05 11:24 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by United States of America - Signed by JUDGE SHANLYN A. S. PARK on 5/5/2025. (eta)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
88 88 minutes Link Fri 05/02 2:26 PM
EO: Counsel for the Government advised the Court that the settlement has been authorized and payment was issued. The Stipulation for Dismissal shall be submitted to park_orders@hid.uscourts.gov, copied to porter_orders@hid.uscourts.gov, no later than 6/2/2025. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER) (jo)
Related: [-]