Texas Western District Court
Judge:James R Nowlin
Case #: 1:23-cv-01248
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:504 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Oct 17, 2023
Terminated:Nov 11, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Apr 14, 2024 5:19 AM CDT
Defendant
Enilsa Brown
5404 Golden Gate Drive
Killeen, TX 76549
Defendant
The Spa Mart
2590 Shell Road Suite E
Georgetown, TX 78628
Represented By
Jacob Scheick
Pilothouse Litigation PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
DermaplanePro Inc.
Represented By
Darin M. Klemchuk
Klemchuk PLLC
contact info
Brian Casper
Klemchuk LLP
contact info
Mandi Phillips
Klemchuk PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 43 minutes ago
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
32 32 misc Report on Copyright (AO-121) Wed 11/13 3:57 PM
Report on Copyright sent to Register of Copyrights. (pg)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 11, 2024
31 31 order Judgment Tue 11/12 8:35 AM
FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge James R. Nowlin. (pg)
Related: [-]
30 30 2 pgs order Order Tue 11/12 8:33 AM
ORDER, it is ORDERED that DermaplanePro's motion for voluntary dismissal with prejudice (Dkt.28 ) is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that all claims between DermaplanePro and The Spa Mart are dismissed WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge James R. Nowlin. (pg)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
29 29 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Mon 10/28 8:46 AM
ORDER. Signed by Judge James R. Nowlin. (pg)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
28 28 motion Dismiss Fri 10/25 11:44 AM
Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss The Spa Mart with Prejudice by DermaplanePro Inc..(Casper, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice
27 27 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 10/25 11:15 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by DermaplanePro Inc. (Casper, Brian)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
26 26 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 08/05 1:49 PM
ORDER RESETTING JURY SELECTION AND TRIAL( Jury Selection/Trial reset for 7/28/2025 09:30AM before Judge James R. Nowlin). Signed by Judge James R. Nowlin. (pg)
Related: [-]
25 25 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Mon 08/05 8:09 AM
ORDER, IT IS ORDERED all deadlines set forth in the scheduling order will remain in effect unless otherwise ordered by this court. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that the jury trial set for July 28, 2025, is hereby CANCELLED pending a new order resetting the trial date. Signed by Judge James R. Nowlin. (pg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 07/23 9:01 AM
CORRECTED : Case reassigned to Judge James R. Nowlin. Judge Robert Pitman no longer assigned to the case. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (jg3)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
24 24 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Mon 07/22 3:47 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Robert Pitman for all proceedings. Judge Docket II - Austin no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (bot1)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
23 23 order Scheduling Order Tue 03/26 8:59 AM
AGREED SCHEDULING ORDER: Consent to Trial by Magistrate due by 2/29/2024, Jury Trial set for 7/28/2025 09:30 AM before Judge Docket II - Austin, ADR Report Deadline due by 5/23/2025, Amended Pleadings or Joinder of Parties due on or before 6/28/2024, Discovery due on or before 12/20/2024, Dispositive Motions due on or before 3/28/2025. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (pg)
Related: [-]
22 22 minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Mon 03/25 4:35 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dustin M. Howell: Initial Pretrial Conference held by Telephone on 3/25/2024. Written Order Forthcoming. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter AT&T Conf Line.)(pg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
21 21 2 pgs order Order Setting/Resetting Initial Pretrial Conference Wed 03/13 9:33 AM
ORDER Setting Initial Pretrial Conference. Initial Pretrial Conference set by Phone for 3/25/2024 03:30 PM before Judge Dustin M. Howell. Signed by Judge Dustin M. Howell. (pg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
20 20 notice Notice Tue 03/05 10:33 AM
NOTICE Concerning Reference to United States Magistrate Judge by DermaplanePro Inc. (Casper, Brian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
19 19 notice Notice Thu 02/29 2:26 PM
NOTICE CONCERNING REFERENCE TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE by The Spa Mart (Scheick, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 19, 2024
18 18 misc Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order Mon 02/19 2:55 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order (Agreed) by DermaplanePro Inc.. (Casper, Brian)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan Mon 02/19 2:51 PM
Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan by DermaplanePro Inc.. (Casper, Brian)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
16 16 1 pgs order Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Sched Order Mon 02/05 4:35 PM
Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order due to the Court within sixty (60) days after the appearance of any defendant. Joint Proposed Scheduling Order due by 2/19/2024. Signed by Judge Dustin M. Howell. (pg)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2024
15 15 4 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Mon 01/22 10:21 AM
ORDER DENYING Brown's13 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (pg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
14 14 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 01/02 3:15 PM
Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by DermaplanePro Inc., re13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Enilsa Brown (Casper, Brian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
13 13 motion Dismiss Wed 12/27 4:58 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Enilsa Brown. (pg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2023
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 11/22 2:14 PM
The Spa Mart Holdings, LLC's ANSWER to1 Complaint . Attorney Jacob Scheick added to party The Spa Mart(pty:dft) by The Spa Mart.(Scheick, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 17, 2023
11 11 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Fri 11/17 9:25 AM
ORDER DENYING Brown's10 Motion for Extension. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (pg) (Order mailed as indicated)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 09, 2023
10 10 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 11/09 3:19 PM
MOTION for Extension by Enilsa Brown. (pg)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 06, 2023
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 11/06 4:01 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by DermaplanePro Inc.. The Spa Mart served on 11/2/2023, answer due 11/24/2023. (Casper, Brian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 26, 2023
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 10/26 4:39 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by DermaplanePro Inc.. Enilsa Brown served on 10/23/2023, answer due 11/13/2023. (Casper, Brian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
7 7 service Summons Issued Wed 10/18 4:40 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (jv2)
Related: [-]
notice Deficiency Notice Wed 10/18 3:55 PM
Please disregard. Entered by the clerk in error. DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re 4 Supplement. Your document is deficient because it is not in proper pleading format pursuant to FRCP 10 (to include case style, number and summary of the pleading) and Rule 11 (to include a signature block). Please refile in full pleading form, attach the document(s), and link to the appropriate original pleading. (jv2) Modified on 10/18/2023 (jv2)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
6 6 misc Report on Copyright (AO-121) Wed 10/18 3:53 PM
Report on Copyright sent to Register of Copyrights with copy of Complaint and Exhibits. (jv2)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Supplement to Tue 10/17 1:34 PM
SUPPLEMENT to1 Complaint by DermaplanePro Inc..(Casper, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 56 pgs Exhibit A2,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 2 pgs Exhibit D,
Att: 5 3 pgs Exhibit E,
Att: 6 4 pgs Exhibit F,
Att: 7 2 pgs Exhibit G,
Att: 8 2 pgs Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Exhibit J,
Att: 11 4 pgs Exhibit K
4 4 misc Supplement to Tue 10/17 11:33 AM
SUPPLEMENT to1 Complaint by DermaplanePro Inc.. (Casper, Brian)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Supplement to Tue 10/17 11:27 AM
SUPPLEMENT to1 Complaint by DermaplanePro Inc..(Casper, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A2,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit I,
Att: 9 Exhibit J,
Att: 10 Exhibit K
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 10/17 10:49 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by DermaplanePro Inc.. (Casper, Brian)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 10/17 10:27 AM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-17994085), filed by DermaplanePro Inc..(Casper, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 10/18 3:27 PM
Case assigned to Judge Docket II - Austin. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (jv2)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to AU Mag Judge Wed 10/18 3:28 PM
If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Howell (jv2)
Related: [-]
misc Jury Demand Wed 10/18 3:59 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by DermaplanePro Inc. (jv2)
Related: [-]