New Jersey District Court
Judge:Claire C Cecchi
Referred: Cathy L Waldor
Case #: 2:23-cv-21212
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Case Filed:Oct 17, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Apr 14, 2024 6:03 AM EDT
Defendant
BRISTOL MEYERS SQUIBB COMPANY MEDICAL PLAN
Represented By
BENJAMIN MCCOY
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Defendant
JOHN DOE (1-100)
Defendant
XYZ CORP. (1-100)
Plaintiff
LUIS MOTTA
Represented By
JEFFREY M HALKOVICH
Halkovich Law, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 79 minutes ago
Thursday, April 24, 2025
21 21 order Text Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 04/24 10:49 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Court will reschedule the 5/7 settlement conference to 6/5/25 at 10 a.m. in Courtroom 4D. All persons, including trial counsel and clients with settlement authority, must be present. Parties are also required to submit a five (5) page confidential settlement memorandum to chambers via email to CLW_Orders@njd.uscourts.gov at least five (5) business days prior to conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 4/24/2025. (qa, )
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
20 20 order Scheduling Order Mon 12/09 3:56 PM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 12/9/2024. (dam)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
19 19 1 pgs misc Letter Fri 12/06 11:07 AM
Letter re 18 Text Order,,.(HALKOVICH, JEFFREY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed pretrial scheduling order
Thursday, December 05, 2024
18 18 order Text Order Thu 12/05 12:44 PM
TEXT ORDER: Parties to docket a revised scheduling order. The Court will hold an In-Person Settlement Conference on 5/7/25 at 11:30am in Courtroom 4D. All persons, including trial counsel and clients with settlement authority, must be present. Parties are also required to submit a five (5) page confidential settlement memorandum to chambers via email to CLW_Orders@njd.uscourts.gov at least five (5) business days prior to conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 12/5/24. (tjg, )
Related: [-]
minutes Telephone Conference Thu 12/05 12:42 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Telephone Conference held on 12/5/2024. (tjg, )
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
17 17 order Text Order Mon 12/02 2:41 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold the next teleconference in this matter using the Webex platform. Parties are to use the teleconference dial-in: 855-244-8681 and Access Code: 23021816037. An attendee ID # is not needed.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 12/2/24. (tjg, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
16 16 order Text Order Tue 09/24 12:32 PM
TEXT ORDER: Administrative record turned over for review. Parties will meet and confer and submit a revised scheduling order. The Court will hold a telephone conference, on 12/5/24 at 12:30pm. Parties are to use the Court's teleconference dial-in: 888-808-6929 and Access Code is 9464201.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 9/24/24. (tjg, )
Related: [-]
15 15 minutes Telephone Conference Tue 09/24 12:30 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Telephone Conference held on 9/24/2024. (tjg, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
14 14 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 06/05 3:05 PM
TEXT ORDER: Parties active in discovery. The Court will hold a telephone conference, on 9/24/24 at 12pm. Parties are to use the Court's teleconference dial-in: 888-808-6929 and Access Code is 9464201.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 6/5/24. (tjg, )
Related: [-]
minutes Telephone Conference Wed 06/05 3:03 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Telephone Conference held on 6/5/2024. (tjg, )
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
13 13 order Order Mon 03/04 1:38 PM
TEXT ORDER: Scheduling order adopted, plaintiff has leave to file a motion to compel and requested discovery outside of the administrative record. The Court will hold a telephone conference, on 6/5/24 at 1:30pm. Parties are to use the Courts teleconference dial-in: 888-808-6929 and Access Code is 9464201.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 3/4/24. (tjg, )
Related: [-]
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Mon 03/04 1:36 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 3/4/2024. (tjg, )
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
misc Pro Hac Vice Fee Received Fri 02/16 3:48 PM
Pro Hac Vice fee: $150.00, receipt number NEW49736 as to SHANNON L. OMALLEY. (ps)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
12 12 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 02/08 2:16 PM
ORDER granting11 Consent Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to SHANNON L. O'MALLEY, ESQ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 2/8/2024. (dam)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 02/08 10:00 AM
Set Deadlines as to11 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Shannon L. O'Malley . Motion set for 3/4/2024 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (lag, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
11 11 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 02/07 2:23 PM
Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Shannon L. O'Malley by BRISTOL MEYERS SQUIBB COMPANY MEDICAL PLAN.(MCCOY, BENJAMIN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification of B. McCoy,
Att: 2 Declaration of S. O'Malley,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, January 22, 2024
10 10 order Order Mon 01/22 9:56 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold an initial conference (rule 16) before U.S.M.J. C. Waldor by telephone on 3/4/24 at 10am. Parties are to use the Courts teleconference dial-in: 888-808-6929 and Access Code is 9464201. Local counsel for any/all parties must participate. Parties are to submit a completed Pretrial Scheduling Order (for Judge Salas cases, please use her dedicated PTSO found in the same location) found in the Notice of Judicial Preferences link to chambers via email at CLW_Orders@njd.uscourts.gov no later than 3 days before the scheduled conference.. Please contact chambers with any questions or concerns at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 1/22/24. (tjg, )
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Judicial Preferences Mon 01/22 9:56 AM
Notice of Judicial Preferences.[LINK:Click here] for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (tjg, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
qc QC - Document Filed in Incorrect Case Wed 01/17 3:12 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The9 Letter filed by BENJAMIN MCCOY on 1/16/2024 appears to be filed in the incorrect case. Please disregard. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. This message is for informational purposes only. (lag, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
9 9 misc Letter Tue 01/16 5:57 PM
Letter from Benjamin H. McCoy Requesting Extension of Deadline.(MCCOY, BENJAMIN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
8 8 12 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Tue 01/16 5:07 PM
ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by BRISTOL MEYERS SQUIBB COMPANY MEDICAL PLAN.(MCCOY, BENJAMIN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 14, 2023
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Thu 12/14 3:19 PM
ORDER granting6 Consent Motion for an Extension of Time for Defendant Bristol Meyers Squibb Company Medical Plan to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint through 1/15/2024 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 12/14/2023. (dam)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Document Wed 12/13 10:18 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by BRISTOL MEYERS SQUIBB COMPANY MEDICAL PLAN.(MCCOY, BENJAMIN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, December 08, 2023
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Fri 12/08 4:42 PM
Clerk`s Text Order - The document4 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by BRISTOL MEYERS SQUIBB COMPANY MEDICAL PLAN has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 12/18/2023. (lag, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
5 5 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Tue 12/05 11:32 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by BRISTOL MEYERS SQUIBB COMPANY MEDICAL PLAN identifying Bristol-Myers Squibb Company as Corporate Parent.. (MCCOY, BENJAMIN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
4 4 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Wed 11/29 11:29 AM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Plaintiff's Complaint.. (MCCOY, BENJAMIN)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 11/29 11:25 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by BENJAMIN MCCOY on behalf of BRISTOL MEYERS SQUIBB COMPANY MEDICAL PLAN (MCCOY, BENJAMIN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 10/17 4:00 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to BRISTOL MEYERS SQUIBB COMPANY MEDICAL PLAN. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (qa, )
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 10/17 12:35 PM
COMPLAINT against BRISTOL MEYERS SQUIBB COMPANY MEDICAL PLAN ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14797041), filed by Luis Motta.(HALKOVICH, JEFFREY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet JS-44
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 10/17 1:01 PM
Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor added. (ps)
Related: [-]