California Central District Court
Judge:Fernando M Olguin
Referred: A Joel Richlin
Case #: 2:23-cv-08750
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(b) Civil Action to Protect Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Oct 17, 2023
Terminated:Jan 31, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Apr 14, 2024 2:52 AM PDT
Consol Defendant
AI Oasis, Inc.
Represented By
Paul S Chan
Bird Marella Rhow Lincenberg Drooks And Nessim LLP
contact info
Fanxi Wang
Bird Marella Rhow Lincenberg Drooks And Nessim LLP
contact info
Aparna Singh Mathur
Bird Marella Rhow Lincenberg Drooks And Nessim LLP
contact info
Terry W Bird
Bird Marella Rhow Lincenberg Drooks And Nessim LLP
contact info
Consol Defendant
GlobalVision Systems, Inc.
Represented By
Paul S Chan
Bird Marella Rhow Lincenberg Drooks And Nessim LLP
contact info
Fanxi Wang
Bird Marella Rhow Lincenberg Drooks And Nessim LLP
contact info
Aparna Singh Mathur
Bird Marella Rhow Lincenberg Drooks And Nessim LLP
contact info
Terry W Bird
Bird Marella Rhow Lincenberg Drooks And Nessim LLP
contact info
Consol Plaintiff
Cadence Bank
Represented By
Kristina Marie Fernandez Mabrie
Dla Piper LLP
contact info
David Rockwell Bower
Dla Piper Llp Us
contact info
Christine E Ellice
Dla Piper Llp Us
contact info
Defendant
Cadence Bank
Represented By
Kristina Marie Fernandez Mabrie
Dla Piper LLP
contact info
David Rockwell Bower
Dla Piper Llp Us
contact info
Christine E Ellice
Dla Piper Llp Us
contact info
Plaintiff
AI Oasis, Inc.
Represented By
Paul S Chan
Bird Marella Rhow Lincenberg Drooks And Nessim LLP
contact info
Fanxi Wang
Bird Marella Rhow Lincenberg Drooks And Nessim LLP
contact info
Aparna Singh Mathur
Bird Marella Rhow Lincenberg Drooks And Nessim LLP
contact info
Terry W Bird
Bird Marella Rhow Lincenberg Drooks And Nessim LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Globalvision Systems, Inc.
Represented By
Paul S Chan
Bird Marella Rhow Lincenberg Drooks And Nessim LLP
contact info
Fanxi Wang
Bird Marella Rhow Lincenberg Drooks And Nessim LLP
contact info
Aparna Singh Mathur
Bird Marella Rhow Lincenberg Drooks And Nessim LLP
contact info
Terry W Bird
Bird Marella Rhow Lincenberg Drooks And Nessim LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
39 39 2 pgs order Order Tue 11/19 11:20 AM
ORDER ON STIPULATION38 TO DISMISS ACTION WITH PREJUDICE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The GVS Action and Cadence Action are hereby dismissed with prejudice, with the parties to bear their own costs of action and attorney's fees. (iv)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
38 38 stip Dismiss Case Mon 11/18 3:03 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Settled filed by Plaintiffs Globalvision Systems, Inc..(Mathur, Aparna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, February 16, 2024
37 37 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Fri 02/16 2:37 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney David Rockwell Bower counsel for Defendant Cadence Bank, Consol Plaintiff Cadence Bank. D. Rockwell Bower is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Cadence Bank f/k/a Bancorpsouth Bank. (Bower, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
36 36 attorney Notice of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information (G-06) Thu 02/01 3:36 PM
NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Aparna Singh Mathur counsel for Consol Defendants AI Oasis, Inc., GlobalVision Systems, Inc., Plaintiffs AI Oasis, Inc., Globalvision Systems, Inc.. Changing firm name to Bird, Marella, Rhow, Lincenberg, Drooks & Nessim, LLP. Filed by Consol Defendants AI Oasis, Inc., GlobalVision Systems, Inc., Plaintiffs AI Oasis, Inc., Globalvision Systems, Inc.. (Mathur, Aparna)
Related: [-]
35 35 attorney Notice of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information (G-06) Thu 02/01 3:16 PM
NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Terry W Bird counsel for Consol Defendants AI Oasis, Inc., GlobalVision Systems, Inc., Plaintiffs AI Oasis, Inc., Globalvision Systems, Inc.. Changing firm name to Bird, Marella, Rhow, Lincenberg, Drooks & Nessim, LLP. Filed by Consol Defendants AI Oasis, Inc., GlobalVision Systems, Inc., Plaintiffs AI Oasis, Inc., Globalvision Systems, Inc.. (Bird, Terry)
Related: [-]
34 34 attorney Notice of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information (G-06) Thu 02/01 3:09 PM
NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Fanxi Wang counsel for Consol Defendants AI Oasis, Inc., GlobalVision Systems, Inc., Plaintiffs AI Oasis, Inc., Globalvision Systems, Inc.. Changing firm name to Bird, Marella, Rhow, Lincenberg, Drooks & Nessim, LLP. Filed by Consol Defendants AI Oasis, Inc., GlobalVision Systems, Inc., Plaintiffs AI Oasis, Inc., Globalvision Systems, Inc.. (Wang, Fanxi)
Related: [-]
33 33 attorney Notice of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information (G-06) Thu 02/01 3:01 PM
NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Paul S Chan counsel for Consol Defendants AI Oasis, Inc., GlobalVision Systems, Inc., Plaintiffs AI Oasis, Inc., Globalvision Systems, Inc.. Changing firm name to Bird, Marella, Rhow, Lincenberg, Drooks & Nessim, LLP. Filed by Consol Defendants AI Oasis, Inc., GlobalVision Systems, Inc., Plaintiffs AI Oasis, Inc., Globalvision Systems, Inc.. (Chan, Paul)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
32 32 misc Report of Determination of Copyright Action (CLOSE) (AO 121) Thu 02/01 9:18 AM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) (iv)
Related: [-]
31 31 order Staying Case Wed 01/31 4:55 PM
ORDER GRANTING STAY OF CONSOLIDATED ACTION26 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This consolidated action is temporarily stayed through November 19, 2024. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated) (iv)
Related: [-]
30 30 5 pgs order Order Wed 01/31 4:52 PM
CONSENT ORDER27 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See Order for Details.* (iv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
29 29 notice Notice of Lodging Wed 01/24 4:02 PM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form,28(Chan, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Consent Order
28 28 notice Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Wed 01/24 2:47 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Stipulation27 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed document was not submitted or was not submitted as a separate attachment. Pursuant to Local Rule 5-4.4.1- Proposed orders not lodged with a main document shall be electronically lodged as an attachment to a Notice of Lodging. If counsel does not correct this deficiency within two business days, the court may strike the document. (iv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
27 27 11 pgs stip Order Tue 01/23 4:57 PM
STIPULATION for Order [Proposed] Consent Order filed by Plaintiffs / Counter-Defendants AI Oasis, Inc., AI Oasis, Inc., GlobalVision Systems, Inc., Globalvision Systems, Inc..(Chan, Paul)
Related: [-]
26 26 stip Stay Case Tue 01/23 4:48 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Complete Terms of Confidential Release and Settlement Agreement filed by Plaintiffs / Counter-Defendants AI Oasis, Inc., AI Oasis, Inc., GlobalVision Systems, Inc., Globalvision Systems, Inc..(Chan, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, January 12, 2024
25 25 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Fri 01/12 3:06 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Fernando M. Olguin, Re: Stipulation24 . The Stipulation is granted. A consolidated complaint shall be filed by 2/2/2024. (vdr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
24 24 stip Extension of Time to Amend Wed 01/10 3:29 PM
Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiffs AI Oasis, Inc., Globalvision Systems, Inc..(Chan, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Stipulation Re Filing of Amended Complaints
Thursday, December 21, 2023
23 23 order Extending Answer Due Deadline Thu 12/21 4:16 PM
ORDER GRANTING THIRD JOINT STIPULATION22 TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See Order for Details.* (rolm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
22 22 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Wed 12/20 6:53 PM
Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Cadence Bank answer now due 1/12/2024, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendant Cadence Bank.(Fernandez Mabrie, Kristina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, December 08, 2023
21 21 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Create Case Association Fri 12/08 4:50 PM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION RE CONSOLIDATION OF CASES AND FURTHER EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINTS20 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Globalvision Systems, Inc., et al, v. Cadence Bank, Case No. 2:23-cv- 08750-FMO-AJR; and Cadence Bank v. GlobalVision Systems, Inc. et al, Case No. 2:23-cv-09281-FMO-AJR shall be consolidated. Cadence Bank shall respond to GVS and AIOs Complaint, including by filing any Motion to Dismiss and/or Strike or any other responsive pleading or motion, on or before December 22, 2023. (iv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
20 20 stip Consolidate Cases Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Wed 12/06 5:53 PM
STIPULATION to Consolidate Cases as to 2:23-cv-09281-FMO-AJR, 2:23-cv-08750-FMO-AJR, STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Plaintiffs, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held19 filed by Plaintiffs Globalvision Systems, Inc., AI Oasis, Inc..(Chan, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, December 04, 2023
19 19 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Mon 12/04 4:12 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS RE: CONSOLIDATION by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. No later than 12/13/2023, each party shall file a Memorandum Re: Consolidation. If the parties agree re consolidation, they should file a stipulation by 12/11/2023. (vdr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 16, 2023
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Thu 11/16 7:20 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney David Rockwell Bower counsel for Defendant Cadence Bank. Adding D. Rockwell Bower as counsel of record for Cadence Bank for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Cadence Bank. (Attorney David Rockwell Bower added to party Cadence Bank(pty:dft))(Bower, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 09, 2023
17 17 notice Related Case(s) Thu 11/09 2:24 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiffs AI Oasis, Inc., Globalvision Systems, Inc.. Related Case(s): 2:23-cv-09281 HDV (MARx) (Chan, Paul)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Wed 11/08 5:32 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Christine E Ellice counsel for Defendant Cadence Bank. Adding Christine E. Ellice as counsel of record for Cadence Bank f/k/a BancorpSouth Bank for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Cadence Bank f/k/a/ BancorpSouth Bank. (Attorney Christine E Ellice added to party Cadence Bank(pty:dft))(Ellice, Christine)
Related: [-]
15 15 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Wed 11/08 5:29 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Cadence Bank answer now due 12/8/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiffs Globalvision Systems, Inc.; AI Oasis, Inc..(Chan, Paul)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Wed 11/08 5:26 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kristina Marie Fernandez Mabrie counsel for Defendant Cadence Bank. Adding Kristina Fernandez Mabrie as counsel of record for Cadence Bank f/k/a BancorpSouth Bank for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Cadence Bank f/k/a BancorpSouth Bank. (Attorney Kristina Marie Fernandez Mabrie added to party Cadence Bank(pty:dft))(Fernandez Mabrie, Kristina)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 27, 2023
13 13 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Fri 10/27 2:39 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
12 12 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 10/25 10:49 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Globalvision Systems, Inc., AI Oasis, Inc., upon Defendant Cadence Bank served on 10/20/2023, answer due 11/13/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Payne Atkinson, Vice President and Associate General Counsel in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity (Chan, Paul)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
11 11 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 10/18 8:41 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant Cadence Bank. (lh)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Wed 10/18 8:39 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
Related: [-]
9 9 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 10/18 8:38 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 10/18 8:38 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge A. Joel Richlin. (lh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
7 7 notice Notice (Other) Tue 10/17 4:09 PM
Notice PENDENCY OF OTHER ACTIONS filed by Plaintiffs AI OASIS, INC. a California corporation, GLOBALVISION SYSTEMS, INC., a California corporation. (Chan, Paul)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) (AO-121) Tue 10/17 4:05 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by AI OASIS, INC. a California corporation, GLOBALVISION SYSTEMS, INC., a California corporation. (Chan, Paul)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 10/17 3:58 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiffs AI OASIS, INC. a California corporation, GLOBALVISION SYSTEMS, INC., a California corporation (Chan, Paul)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 10/17 3:55 PM
CERTIFICATE AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs AI OASIS, INC. a California corporation, GLOBALVISION SYSTEMS, INC., a California corporation, (Chan, Paul)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Tue 10/17 3:48 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs AI OASIS, INC. a California corporation, GLOBALVISION SYSTEMS, INC., a California corporation. (Chan, Paul)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Summons Request Tue 10/17 3:46 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiffs AI OASIS, INC. a California corporation, GLOBALVISION SYSTEMS, INC., a California corporation. (Chan, Paul)
Related: [-]
1 1 25 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 10/17 3:41 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-36239452 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff GLOBALVISION SYSTEMS, INC., a California corporation, AI OASIS, INC. a California corporation. (Attorney Paul S Chan added to party AI OASIS, INC. a California corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Paul S Chan added to party GLOBALVISION SYSTEMS, INC., a California corporation(pty:pla))(Chan, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E